Supreme Court

Case: 14-0141    
14-0141
02/21/2014
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE LONG ISLAND VILLAGE OWNERS’ ASSOCIATION, INC. F/K/A OUTDOOR RESORTS/SOUTH PADRE OWNERS’ ASSOCIATION, INC. AND PAST AND PRESENT BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF LONG ISLAND OWNERS’ ASSOCIATION, INC. F/K/A OUTDOOR RESORTS/SOUTH PADRE OWNERS’ ASSOCIATION, INC. 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/06/2014Supplement to Petition filedRelatorSupplement to Petition including January 24, 2014 order filed on behalf of Long Island Village Owners' Assoc'n.
02/21/2014Petition for Writ of MandamusRelatorPetition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Long Island Village Owners' Assoc., Inc., et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/07/2014Case Stored  
03/21/2014Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedDenied 
03/21/2014Motion to Stay DisposedDeniedMotion for Temporary Relief denied
03/06/2014Supplement to Petition filed Supplement to Petition including January 24, 2014 order filed on behalf of Long Island Village Owners' Assoc'n.
02/21/2014Motion to Stay Filed  Motion for Temporary Relief incorporated with Petition for Writ of Mandamus. On behalf of Long Island Village Owners' Assoc., et al.
02/21/2014Petition for Writ of Mandamus Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Long Island Village Owners' Assoc., Inc., et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/07/2014Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Long Island Village Owners’ Association, Inc.RelatorMr. Vaughan E. Waters
Smith, Charles E.Real Party in Interest Mr. Larry Warner
Court of Appeals Information:
Still Pending 
 
13th Court of Appeals 
 
Trial Court Information
445th District Court 
Cameron 
Honorable J. Rolando Olvera 
2008-03-1537-1 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site