Supreme Court

Case: 14-0013    
14-0013
01/06/2014
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
DANFORD MAINTENANCE SERVICE, INC. 
THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/05/2014Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Danford Maintenance Services, Inc.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/24/2014Case Stored  
04/24/2014Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
03/14/2014Petition for Review disposedDenied 
02/11/2014Response Waiver filed Corrected Response Waiver filed on behalf of The Dow Chemical Company.
02/11/2014Case forwarded to Court  
02/07/2014Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of The Dow Chemical Company.
02/05/2014Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Danford Maintenance Services, Inc.
01/06/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is Granted. Petition for Review is due February 5, 2014.
01/06/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Danford Maintenance Service, Inc.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/24/2014Case StoredCase stored.E-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Danford Maintenance Service, Inc.PetitionerMs. Nicole James Petrelli
Mr. Mike Howell
Mr. Michael D. Hudgins
The Dow Chemical CompanyRespondentMr. Stephen G. Tipps
Mr. Eric T. Furey
Mr. John R. Gilbert
Ms. Amy Pharr Hefley
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
___ SW3d ___, 11-21-13 
14th Court of Appeals 
Honorable John J. Donovan 
Trial Court Information
412th Distric Court 
Brazoria 
Honorable William Edwin Denman 
48875 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site