Thirteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 13-16-00638-CR    
13-16-00638-CR
11/23/2016
Miscellaneous/Other Criminal including Misdemeanor or Felony
Joseph Andrew Diruzzo 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/04/2017Amended brief filedAppellant
10/25/2017Reply brief filedAppellant
10/05/2017Brief received - oral argument not requestedState
10/05/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
07/17/2017Amended brief receivedAppellant
07/17/2017Amended brief filedAppellant
07/13/2017Amended brief receivedAppellant
07/12/2017Amended brief receivedAppellant
07/06/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/26/2018Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsGrant motion
08/21/2018Sent to publisher 
07/23/2018Case forwarded to higher court 
07/20/2018Petition for discretionary review filed 
06/22/2018Motion for rehearing en banc disposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/29/2018Motion for en banc reconsideration filed 
05/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing enbanc disposedGrant motion
05/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing enbanc filed 
04/26/2018Opinion issuedAffirmed as Modified
12/07/2017Submitted 
12/04/2017Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
12/04/2017Amended brief filed 
12/01/2017Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
11/28/2017Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
10/30/2017Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
10/27/2017Set for submission on oral argument 
10/25/2017Reply brief filed 
10/25/2017Document filed 
10/05/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
10/05/2017Brief received - oral argument not requested 
09/12/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
09/11/2017Supplemental reporters record filed 
09/11/2017Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
09/01/2017Fax received 
08/31/2017Telephone call received 
07/24/2017Motion for leave disposedGrant motion
07/24/2017Motion to supplement record disposedGrant motion
07/17/2017Amended brief filed 
07/17/2017Amended brief received 
07/14/2017Motion to supplement record filed 
07/13/2017Motion for leave filed 
07/13/2017Amended brief received 
07/12/2017Amended brief received 
07/12/2017Notice filed 
07/06/2017Case ready to be set 
07/06/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/30/2017Notice filed 
06/29/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
06/22/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/31/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
05/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/19/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/20/2017Docketing statement filed 
04/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
04/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/10/2017Notice of late brief 
03/07/2017Exhibits filed 
03/07/2017Reporters record filed 
03/02/2017Clerks record filed 
11/23/2016Document filed 
11/23/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
11/22/2016Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
11/22/2016Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
11/04/2016Sentence imposed in the trial court 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/26/2018Appeal to Higher CourtPetition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasHon. Brendan W. Guy
Hon. Stephen B. Tyler
Diruzzo, Joseph AndrewCriminal - AppellantHon. Steven Lafuente
Hon. Jeremy McKey
Hon. Sean Kipp
Hon. Richard W. B. 'Rick' Davis
Trial Court Information
24th District Court 
Victoria 
Honorable Jack W. Marr 
14-05-27939-A 
Marnie Gabrysch 
C1-C16: 4 yrs TDCJ & $1500 fine; C1: $334 court costs 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site