Thirteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 13-16-00400-CR    
13-16-00400-CR
07/15/2016
Tampering With or Fabricating Physical Evidence
Karl Dean Stahmann 
The State of Texas 
No 
3rd Court of Appeals 
07/15/2016 
03-16-00398-CR 
13th Court of Appeals - Corpus Christi 
07/15/2016 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/12/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedState
04/12/2017Amended brief filedAppellant
04/10/2017Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellant
03/23/2017Amended brief receivedAppellant
03/23/2017Amended brief receivedAppellant
03/16/2017Amended brief receivedAppellant
03/16/2017Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/10/2018Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsGrant motion
08/03/2018Sent to publisher 
07/10/2018Case forwarded to higher court 
07/06/2018Petition for discretionary review filed 
06/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals 
06/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsGrant motion
05/09/2018Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
05/07/2018Notice filed 
05/04/2018Motion for en banc reconsideration disposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/04/2018Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/15/2018Response filed 
03/05/2018Response requested by the court 
02/02/2018Motion for en banc reconsideration filed 
02/02/2018Motion for rehearing filed 
01/18/2018Motion for extension disposedGrant motion
01/18/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedGrant motion
01/17/2018Motion for extension filed 
01/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
01/04/2018Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
08/29/2017Submitted 
08/08/2017Set for submission on briefs 
06/21/2017Oral argument denied 
06/12/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/10/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
05/09/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/12/2017Case ready to be set 
04/12/2017Amended brief filed 
04/10/2017Brief received - oral argument requested 
03/29/2017Motion disposedGrant motion
03/23/2017Amended brief received 
03/23/2017Amended brief received 
03/16/2017Motion to exceed brief length filed 
03/16/2017Amended brief received 
03/16/2017Brief received - oral argument requested 
03/16/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
03/08/2017Supplemental clerks record filed 
03/08/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/08/2017Telephone call received 
03/08/2017Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
02/09/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
02/01/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/10/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
01/03/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/29/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
11/18/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/16/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/19/2016Docketing statement filed 
09/14/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
09/13/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/19/2016Exhibits filed 
08/18/2016Telephone call received 
08/17/2016Corrected document requested 
08/17/2016Reporters record filed 
08/11/2016Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGrant motion
08/11/2016Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
07/27/2016Motion to withdraw attorney disposedGrant motion
07/27/2016Motion to substitute attorney disposedGrant motion
07/22/2016Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
07/15/2016Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
07/15/2016Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals 
07/11/2016Motion to substitute attorney filed 
07/11/2016Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
07/08/2016Clerks record filed 
06/09/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
06/08/2016Trial court certification filed 
06/08/2016Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
05/12/2016Sentence imposed in the trial court 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/10/2018Appeal to Higher CourtPetition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Stahmann, Karl DeanCriminal - AppellantHon. Christopher P. Morgan
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasHon. Joshua D. Presley
Hon. Lisa Carol McMinn
Hon. Jennifer A. Tharp
Trial Court Information
207th District Court 
Comal 
Honorable Jack H. Robison 
CR2013-409 
Richard E. Roberts 
TEN (10) YEARS TDCJ – PROBATED, TEN (10) YEARS $5000 FINE 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site