Thirteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 13-15-00592-CR    
13-15-00592-CR
12/11/2015
Miscellaneous/Other Criminal including Misdemeanor or Felony
The State of Texas 
Juan Martinez Jr. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/20/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
04/21/2016Amended brief receivedAppellant
04/21/2016Brief received - oral argument not requestedAppellant
04/21/2016Amended brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/30/2018Sent to publisher 
01/24/2018Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsGrant motion
10/20/2017Case forwarded to higher court 
10/16/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsGrant motion
10/16/2017Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals 
09/14/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsGrant motion
08/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsGrant motion
07/13/2017Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/05/2017Submitted 
06/14/2017Set for submission on briefs 
08/12/2016Letter issued by the court 
08/12/2016Letter received 
08/01/2016Oral argument denied 
06/20/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/19/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
05/18/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/06/2016Motion for leave disposedGrant motion
04/27/2016Motion for leave filed 
04/21/2016Amended brief filed 
04/21/2016Case ready to be set 
04/21/2016Amended brief received 
04/21/2016Brief received - oral argument not requested 
04/18/2016Notice of late brief 
03/29/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
03/15/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/24/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
02/23/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/16/2016Notice of late brief 
01/20/2016Supplemental clerks record filed 
01/12/2016Reporters record filed 
01/04/2016Corrected document requested 
12/17/2015Clerks record filed 
12/11/2015Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
12/04/2015Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
11/24/2015Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/24/2018Appeal to Higher CourtPetition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Martinez, Jr., Juan AppelleeHon. Julie Michele Balovich
Hon. Heather Michelle Rice
The State of Texas Criminal - AppellantHon. Edward F. Shaughnessy III
Hon. Jose L. Aliseda
Trial Court Information
156th District Court 
Bee 
Honorable Patrick L. Flanigan 
B-14-2123-0-CR-B 
Lisa T. Riley 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site