Thirteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 13-12-00776-CR
12/21/2012
Engaging in Organized Criminal Activity
MARCELLUS LEWIS BROWN 
THE STATE OF TEXAS 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/09/2013Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
07/24/2013Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionDocument
07/25/2014Case stored  
07/23/2014Record checked in  
07/23/2014Case stored  
06/06/2014Letter issued by the courtPro Se 
06/05/2014Letter filedPro Se 
04/15/2014Letter issued by the courtPro Se 
04/14/2014Letter filedPro Se 
01/14/2014Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerkDistrict Clerk 
01/10/2014Letter issued by the courtPro Se 
01/10/2014Mandate issued  
12/23/2013Letter filedPro Se 
10/24/2013Memorandum opinion issued Affirmed
10/22/2013Submitted  
10/01/2013Set for submission on briefs  
08/22/2013Record checked in  
08/19/2013Record checked out  
08/09/2013Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState 
07/24/2013Case ready to be set  
07/24/2013Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant 
07/15/2013Order entered  
07/15/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedAppellantMotion or Writ Granted
07/09/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filedAppellant 
06/26/2013Notice of late briefAppellant 
05/10/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedAppellantMotion or Writ Granted
05/02/2013Additional copies of documents received after initial filingAppellant 
05/01/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filedAppellant 
04/25/2013Telephone call receivedAppellant 
03/20/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedAppellantMotion or Writ Granted
03/18/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filedAppellant 
02/05/2013Exhibits filed  
02/05/2013Reporters record filed  
01/14/2013Clerks record filed  
12/27/2012Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerkDistrict Clerk 
12/21/2012Trial court certification filedAppellant 
12/21/2012Notice of appeal filed in court of appealsAppellant 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/10/2014Case StoredCase stored
01/10/2014RetentionCriminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Brown, Marcellus LewisCriminal - AppellantMr. Marcellus Lewis Brown
Hon. Luis A. Martinez
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasHon. Brendan W. Guy
Hon. Stephen B. Tyler
Trial Court Information
24th District Court 
Victoria 
Honorable Stephen Williams 
11-8-26017-A 
 
60 yrs TDCJ, $10,000 Fine, Ct Costs 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site