Supreme Court

Case: 13-1032    
13-1032
12/30/2013
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
CHRISTUS ST. ELIZABETH HOSPITAL 
DOROTHY GUILLORY 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/02/2015Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Christus St. Elizabeth Hospital.
05/18/2015Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Dorothy Guillory.
04/14/2015Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Christus St. Elizabeth Hospital.
02/11/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Brief of Amicus Curiae Texas Hospital Association in support of Petitioner Christus Hospital –St. Elizabeth. Submitted by Warren S. Huang of Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP of Houston, Texas and Charles W. Bailey of Tex. Hospital Assoc. of Austin, Texas
06/26/2014Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dorothy Guillory.
01/17/2014Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Christus St. Elizabeth Hospital.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/21/2015Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
07/06/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Motion for Rehearing is due July 21, 2015.
07/06/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Christus St. Elizabeth Hospital.
06/19/2015Petition for Review disposedDenied 
06/02/2015Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Christus St. Elizabeth Hospital.
05/18/2015Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Dorothy Guillory.
05/13/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Dorothy Guillory is Granted; Response Brief is due May 18, 2015; Reply Brief is due June 2, 2015. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
05/12/2015Call received Call received from legal assistant for the respondent informing the Clerk's Office that the corrected Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief will be resubmitted shortly.
05/12/2015Phone call from Clerk's Office Call made to Respondent's counsel regarding status of resubmission for Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits; left voicemail.
05/08/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Dorothy Guillory.
05/06/2015Call received From Ms. Laurie Farshad's office to inform the Court that they are going to efile a m/e/t to file their brief on the merits that was due on 5/4/15.
04/14/2015Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Christus St. Elizabeth Hospital.
03/25/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petitioner's brief is due April 14, 2015; Respondent's brief is due May 4, 2015; and Reply brief is due May 19, 2015.
03/24/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Christus St. Elizabeth Hospital.
02/27/2015Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner brief due no later than March 30, 2015; Response brief due April 20, 2015; Reply brief due May 5, 2015.
02/11/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Brief of Amicus Curiae Texas Hospital Association in support of Petitioner Christus Hospital –St. Elizabeth. Submitted by Warren S. Huang of Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP of Houston, Texas and Charles W. Bailey of Tex. Hospital Assoc. of Austin, Texas
02/11/2015Notice of Appearance Appearance of Co-Counsel for Petitioner - Dale Wainwright will appear as co-counsel for Christus St. Elizabeth Hospital.
11/18/2014Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
11/17/2014Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 9th COA
06/26/2014Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dorothy Guillory.
06/03/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Response is due June 27, 2014.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR T HIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
06/03/2014Phone call from Clerk's Office Informed Ms. Perozzo's office that the Motion for Extension of Time will be struck, if the corrected version is not resubmitted by the end of business day.
05/29/2014Phone call from Clerk's Office Spoke with Ms. Farshad's office.  Requested that the Motion be resubmitted so that it is not scanned.
05/28/2014Electronic communication sent to Party Messaged Ms. Perozzo.  Requested status of corrected motion.
05/22/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response filed on behalf of Dorothy Guillory.
04/25/2014Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than May 27, 2014.
02/11/2014Case forwarded to Court  
02/04/2014Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Dorothy Guillory.
01/17/2014Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Christus St. Elizabeth Hospital.
12/31/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition is due January 17, 2014
12/30/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to file Petition for Review. On behalf of Christus St. Elizabeth Hospital.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/21/2015Case StoredCase stored.Go2 Row 14 H-4
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Christus St. Elizabeth HospitalPetitionerThe Honorable Dale Wainwright
Ms. Lindsay E. Hagans
Ms. Erin E. Lunceford
Texas Hospital AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. Warren S. Huang  
Mr. Charles W. Bailey
Guillory, DorothyRespondentMs. Laurie Rene Farshad  
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
415 SW3d 900, 11-14-13 
9th Court of Appeals 
Honorable H. Hollis Horton 
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 1 
Jefferson 
Honorable Thomas F. Rugg 
119806 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site