Supreme Court

Case: 13-1027    
13-1027
12/27/2013
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
BAYLOR UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER AND BAYLOR HEALTH CARE SYSTEM 
SARAH LAWTON 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/02/2015Motion for RehearingPetitionerMotion for Rehearing, filed on behalf of Baylor University Medical Center, et al.
06/18/2015Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Baylor University Medical Center.
05/20/2015Brief on the MeritsPetitionerBrief on the Merits filed on behalf of Respondent Sarah Lawton.
03/27/2015Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Petitioners Baylor University Medical Center and Baylor Health Care System.
06/26/2014Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition filed on behalf of Sarah Lawton.
02/27/2014Supplement to Petition filedPetitionerSupplement to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Baylor University Medical Center, et al.
12/27/2013Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Baylor University Medical Center and Baylor Health Care System.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/06/2015Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
11/06/2015Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied 
10/06/2015Case forwarded to Court  
10/02/2015Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing, filed on behalf of Baylor University Medical Center, et al.
09/16/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Motion for Rehearing is due October 6, 2015.  Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored.
09/16/2015Electronic communication sent to Party Messaged Mr. Burlison.  Requested whether a response to the opposed motion will be electronically filed.
09/15/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Baylor University Medical Center.
09/04/2015Petition for Review disposedDenied 
06/18/2015Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Baylor University Medical Center.
06/03/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed First Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Baylor University Medical Center, et al. is Granted; Reply is due June 19, 2015. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
06/03/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed First Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Baylor University Medical Center, et al.
05/20/2015Brief on the Merits Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Respondent Sarah Lawton.
04/10/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Respondent Sarah Lawton has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Respondent's Brief is due May 20, 2015; Reply brief is due June 4, 2015.
04/10/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Respondent Sarah Lawton.
03/27/2015Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Additional Appeallate Counsel.  Don Martinson and Jennifer Kelly of Fanning, Harper, Martinson Brandt & Kutchin, P.C. are appearing as additional appellate counsel for Sarah Lawton.
03/27/2015Letter Filed Letter filed on behalf of Baylor University Medical Center and Baylor Healthcare System.
03/27/2015Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Petitioners Baylor University Medical Center and Baylor Health Care System.
02/27/2015Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner brief due no later than March 30, 2015; Response brief due April 20, 2015; Reply brief due May 5, 2015.
12/02/2014Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
11/17/2014Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 5th COA
06/27/2014Motion to withdraw disposed ofFiling grantedMotion to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Rebecca Roper, cousel for Respondent Sarah Lawton has been granted.
06/26/2014Response to Petition Response to Petition filed on behalf of Sarah Lawton.
06/23/2014Notice from Counsel of a change in address Change of Address filed on behalf of Rebecca Raper Mower.
06/23/2014Motion to Withdraw Filed Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as counsel filed by Rebecca Roper, cousel for Respondent Sarah Lawton.
05/23/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Response is due June 26, 2014.
05/22/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion to Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Sarah Lawton.
04/25/2014Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than May 27, 2014.
03/07/2014Document filed with Court struck (see remarks) Motion to Exceed Word Limit denied; Supplemental petition struck pursuant to Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 9.4(i)(D)
03/07/2014Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.DeniedUnopposed Motion to Exceed Word Limit denied.  Supplemental Petition struck.
03/04/2014Miscellaneous Motion Unopposed Motion to Exceed Word Limit filed on behalf of Baylor University Medical Center, et al.
02/28/2014Phone call from Clerk's Office to Mr. Perez, co-counsel for petitioner Baylor Univ., and he was informed that the word count of its Supplement to Petition goes with the word count of the Petition; therefore, per the rules, the word count exceeds the limits, and he must file a motion to exceed word count.
02/27/2014Supplement to Petition filed Supplement to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Baylor University Medical Center, et al.
01/14/2014Case forwarded to Court  
01/07/2014Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Sarah Lawton.
12/27/2013Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Baylor University Medical Center and Baylor Health Care System.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/06/2015Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Baylor University Medical CenterPetitionerMr. Gerard T. Fazio
Mr. R. Michael Perez
Brett Cornwell
Lawton, SarahRespondentMr. Dwayne J. Hermes  
Mr. Brett A. Burlison  
Mr. Don D. Martinson  
Ms. Jennifer L. Kelley
Ms. Jennifer Duncan Edgeworth  
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
442 SW3d 483, 11-25-13 
5th Court of Appeals 
Honorable David L. Bridges 
Trial Court Information
162nd District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Lorraine A. Raggio 
12-09816 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site