Supreme Court

Case: 13-0961    
13-0961
12/03/2013
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION 
JASON JENKINS 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/14/2015Response to Brief filedPetitionerPetitioner's Response to Post Submission Brief, filed on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation.
11/20/2015Post submission brief filedRespondentPost-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Jason Jenkins.
09/02/2015Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondentOral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Jason Jenkins.
08/31/2015Supplemental Letter BriefPetitionerResponse to Supplemental Letter Brief filed on  behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation.
08/25/2015Supplemental Letter BriefRespondentSupplemental Letter Brief filed on behalf of Jason Jenkins.
05/08/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Petitioner Occidental Chemical Corporation filed on behalf of Pacific Legal Foundation.
02/13/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, The National Association of Manufacturers, and The American Chemistry Council. Submitted by Richard Smith of Lynn Tillotson Pinker & Cox, LLP of Dallas, Texas.
02/12/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of The Texas Civil Justice League.
02/10/2015Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation.
11/26/2014Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent Jason Jenkins' Brief on the Merits
09/05/2014Brief on the MeritsPetitionerBrief on the merits filed on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation
04/24/2014Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of National Association of Manufacturers, et al.
04/23/2014Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter Brief of Texas Civil Justice League. Submitted by George S. Christian of Austin Texas.
04/22/2014Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America (the “U.S. Chamber”) and the American Chemistry Council (“ACC”). Submitted by Richard A. Smith of Lynn, Tillotson, Pinker & Cox, LLP, 2100 Ross Ave., Suite 2700, Dallas, TX, 75201.
04/22/2014Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corp.
04/21/2014Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of Texas Chemical Council (TCC). Submitted by General Counsel of TCC, Martha K. Landwehr, 1402 Nueces St., Austin, Texas 78701.
04/07/2014Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Jason Jenkins.
01/06/2014Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/18/2016Mandate issued Madate & Cost Bill Issued
01/08/2016Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
01/08/2016Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed & judgment renderedThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and renders judgment. Justice Devine delivered the opinion of the Court.
(1/8/2016 3:16:18 PM) 130961.pdf, 13-0961.jmt.pdf
12/14/2015Response to Brief filed Petitioner's Response to Post Submission Brief, filed on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation.
11/20/2015Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Jason Jenkins.
09/03/2015Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Deborah G. Hankinson; Argued on behalf of respondent by Russell S. Post
09/02/2015Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Jason Jenkins.
08/31/2015Supplemental Letter Brief Response to Supplemental Letter Brief filed on  behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation.
08/25/2015Supplemental Letter Brief Supplemental Letter Brief filed on behalf of Jason Jenkins.
08/05/2015Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Russell S. Post of Beck Redden LLP on behalf of Jason Jenkins.
07/15/2015Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Deborah G. Hankinson of Hankinson LLP on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation.
07/03/2015Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., September 3, 2015.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
05/08/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Petitioner Occidental Chemical Corporation filed on behalf of Pacific Legal Foundation.
03/13/2015Petition for Review disposedFiling granted[Note: The date and time for oral argument is yet to be determined.]
03/13/2015Petition for Review granted  
02/13/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, The National Association of Manufacturers, and The American Chemistry Council. Submitted by Richard Smith of Lynn Tillotson Pinker & Cox, LLP of Dallas, Texas.
02/12/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of The Texas Civil Justice League.
02/10/2015Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation.
01/08/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is Granted; Reply Brief is due February 11, 2015. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED.
01/07/2015Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation.
12/10/2014Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply brief due January 12, 2014.
12/05/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation.
11/26/2014Brief on the Merits Respondent Jason Jenkins' Brief on the Merits
10/27/2014Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondet's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jason Jenkins has been granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Respondent's Brief due November 26, 2014; Reply Brief due December 11, 2014.
10/27/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondet's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jason Jenkins.
09/25/2014Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondet's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jason Jenkins has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Respondent's brief is due October 27, 2014; Reply brief due November 12, 2014.
09/25/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondet's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jason Jenkins.
09/25/2014Designation of Lead Counsel  Notice of appearance of additional counsel and designation of lead counsel
09/05/2014Brief on the Merits Brief on the merits filed on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation
08/11/2014Motion to withdraw disposed ofFiling grantedMotion to Withdraw Thomas C. Kirby as pro hac vice for National Association of Manufactures, et al. granted
07/31/2014Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond motion to extension of time to file Petitioner's Brief is granted. No further extensions of time for this filing will be considered. Pet's Brief due September 5, 2014; Resp's Brief due September 25, 2014; Pet's Reply Brief due October 10, 2014.
07/31/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation
07/25/2014Motion to Withdraw Filed Motion for Withdrawal from Representation of Thomas C. Kirby for amicus National Association of Manufacturers.
07/02/2014Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petitioner's brief is due August 6, 2014; Respondent's brief is due August 26, 2014; and Reply brief is due September 10, 2014.
07/02/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation.
06/17/2014Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
06/12/2014Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 1st COA
06/06/2014Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief on the merits due no later than 7/7/14; Response brief due 7/28/14; Reply brief due 8/12/14.
04/25/2014Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas C. Kirby is granted.
04/25/2014Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas C. Kirby is granted.
04/24/2014Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of National Association of Manufacturers, et al.
04/23/2014Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter Brief of Texas Civil Justice League. Submitted by George S. Christian of Austin Texas.
04/23/2014Certification (various) in case received Certificate of Conference to Motion Pro Hac Vice of Thomas C. Kirby and Motion in support of Kirby's Motion Pro Hac Vice. On behalf of National Association of Manufacturers, et al.
04/22/2014Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Brief of the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America (the “U.S. Chamber”) and the American Chemistry Council (“ACC”). Submitted by Richard A. Smith of Lynn, Tillotson, Pinker & Cox, LLP, 2100 Ross Ave., Suite 2700, Dallas, TX, 75201.
04/22/2014Reply to Response Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corp.
04/21/2014Call received Spoke with Mr. Kirby.  Requested certificate of conference for Motions for Pro Hac Vice.
04/21/2014Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of Texas Chemical Council (TCC). Submitted by General Counsel of TCC, Martha K. Landwehr, 1402 Nueces St., Austin, Texas 78701.
04/18/2014Pro hac vice motion filed Motion in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas Kirby filed on behalf of the National Association of Manufacturers.
04/18/2014Pro hac vice motion filed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas C. Kirby on behalf of the National Association of Manufacturers, et al.
04/08/2014Case forwarded to Court  
04/07/2014Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Jason Jenkins.
03/06/2014Designation of Lead Counsel  Notice of Lead Counsel for Petitioner: Deborah Hankinson, 750 North St. Paul Street, Suite 1800 | Dallas, TX 75201 | T 214 754 9190.
03/05/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is Granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Response is due April 7, 2014.
03/05/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Jason Jenkins.
02/06/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Response is due March 7, 2014.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
02/06/2014Call received From petitioner's attorney stating that they are NOT OPPOSED to respondent's motion for extension of time to file response to pet/rev.
02/06/2014Electronic communication sent to Party Messaged Mr. Clinton.  Requested whether motion for extension is opposed or unopposed, and if a response will be filed.
02/05/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Motion for Extension of Time to file Response filed on behalf of Jason Jenkins.
01/06/2014Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/04/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition due 01/06/14.
12/03/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/03/2016Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Pacific Legal FoundationAmicus CuriaeWencong Fa
Chamber of Commerce of the United States of AmericaAmicus CuriaeChristopher Patton
Mr. Richard A. Smith
Texas Chemical CouncilAmicus CuriaeMartha Landwehr
Occidental Chemical CorporationPetitionerMr. Barry N. Beck
Mr. David W. Lauritzen
Mr. Joseph B. Morris  
Mr. William Richard Thompson II
Mr. Rick G. Strange
Ms. Deborah G. Hankinson
Jenkins, JasonRespondentMr. Russell S. Post
Mr. David M. Gunn
Mr. Cory D. Itkin  
Ms. Erin H. Huber
Mr. Wallace B. Jefferson  
Mr. Kurt Brynilde Arnold
Mr. Jason A. Itkin
Mr. Charles 'Chad' R. Flores
Mr. Douglas W. Alexander
The American Chemistry CouncilAmicus CuriaeMr. Richard A. Smith
Christopher Patton
National Association of ManufacturersAmicus CuriaeMr. Richard A. Smith
Christopher Patton
Texas Civil Justice LeagueAmicus CuriaeMr. George S. Christian
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
415 SW3d 14, 07-02-13 
1st Court of Appeals 
Honorable Harvey G. Brown 
Trial Court Information
295th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Caroline E. Baker 
0773468 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site