Supreme Court

Case: 13-0749
09/18/2013
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
IN THE INTEREST OF A.B. AND H.B., CHILDREN 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/30/2014Motion for Rehearing - FiledPetitioner's motion for rehearing of cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of D.B.
12/27/2013Reply brief filedPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of D.B.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/20/2013Brief filedIntervenorResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of G.H. and J.H.(HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/19/2013Brief filedRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Department of Family and Protective Services. (Hard Copies Received)
12/05/2013Brief filedPetitionerPetitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of D.B. (Hard Copies Received)
11/13/2013Reply filedPetitionerReply to Intervenor's Responses filed on behalf of D.B. (Hard Copies Received)
10/31/2013Response to Petition for Review filedRespondentResponse to Petition for Review. On behalf of Texas Department of Family & Protective Services.
(Hard Copies Recieved)
10/29/2013Response to Petition for Review filedIntervenorResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Intervenors G.H. & J.H.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/18/2013Petition for Review filedPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of D.B.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionRemarksDocument
08/22/2014Mandate issued  Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
08/22/2014Motion for Rehearing - DisposedCauseDenied 
05/30/2014Case forwarded to Court   
05/30/2014Motion for Rehearing - FiledPetitioner's motion for rehearing of cause filed Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of D.B.
05/19/2014Phone call from Clerk's Office  The Clerk called Mr. Gladstone to inform him of the call from D.B. Mr. Gladstone said that he would likely file a motion to withdraw from the case and indicated that he did not intend to file a motion for rehearing on behalf of D.B.
05/19/2014Call receivedPetitioner D.B. called to inform the Court that his appointed counsel refuses to file a motion for rehearing, stating that his obligation to represent D.B. pursuant to appointment by the Court does not extend to filing a motion for rehearing.
05/16/2014Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record Issued 
05/16/2014Opinion issuedCauseCourt of appeals' judgment affirmedThe Court affirms the court of appeals' judgment. Justice Guzman delivered the opinion of the Court.
(5/16/2014 12:16:24 PM) 130749.pdf, 13-0749.jmt.pdf
04/22/2014Oral argument   argued on behalf of petitioners by Richard A. Gladstone; argued on behalf of respondents by Christopher W. Ponder & M.A. "Mike" Windsor
03/25/2014Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedRespondent Oral Argument will be presented by Christopher Ponder and Mike Windsor on behalf of G.H., J.H., and the Texas Department of Family & Protective Services.
03/18/2014Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedPetitioner Oral Argument will be presented by Richard Gladstone on behalf of D.B.
02/14/2014Case set for oral argumentIndicates filing of Petition for ReviewCase set for oral argument[Note: This case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., April 22, 2014.]
02/14/2014Petition for Review disposed Filing granted 
02/14/2014Petition for Review granted   
12/27/2013Reply brief filedPetitioner Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of D.B.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/23/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.RespondentFiling grantedIntervenors' Motion to Extend Time to file Brief granted. Brief is due December 20, 2013. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
12/20/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief.Intervenor Intervenors, G.H. & J.H., Motion to Extend Time to file Brief on the Merits
12/20/2013Brief filedIntervenor Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of G.H. and J.H.(HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/19/2013Call receivedIntervenor Call received from intervenor attorney, Mike Windsor, informing the Court that they are having issues efiling their brief on the merits through electronic filing service provider File&Serve. It's going on two hours trying to get it efiled. Mr. Windsor will contact the Court if his brief is not efiled today.
12/19/2013Brief filedRespondent Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Department of Family and Protective Services. (Hard Copies Received)
12/05/2013Brief filedPetitioner Petitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of D.B. (Hard Copies Received)
11/25/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.PetitionerFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits granted. Pet's Brief due 12.09.13; Resp's Brief due 12.19.13; Pet's Reply Brief due 12.27.13. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored.
11/22/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief.Petitioner Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of D.B.
11/21/2013Case Record Filed   Clerk's record (2 V), supp clk's record (3 V), reporter's record (11 V - V 9 - 11 labeled as ORIGINAL EXHIBITS), ant's br, ape's br, ape (Intervenor)'s br, misc. folder (ape's post-sub br, ape (intervenor) br, intervenor's mo/re en banc, response to mo/re en banc, ape's mo/re en banc, order of 2-21-12), opinion & dissenting opinion on mo/re & mo/re en banc, judgment on ape's (interenor) mo/re & mo/re en banc  
11/18/2013Record Requested in Petition for Review   
11/15/2013Brief on the Merits RequestedExpedited Briefing Requested Expedited briefing requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than 12/2/13; Response brief due 12/12/13; Reply brief due 12/20/13.
11/13/2013Reply filedPetitioner Reply to Intervenor's Responses filed on behalf of D.B. (Hard Copies Received)
10/31/2013Response to Petition for Review filedRespondent Response to Petition for Review. On behalf of Texas Department of Family & Protective Services.
(Hard Copies Recieved)
10/29/2013Response to Petition for Review filedIntervenor Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Intervenors G.H. & J.H.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/23/2013Electronic communication received from PartyRespondent Verified with Mr. Ponder that he had received the response request notice.
10/21/2013Supreme Court of Texas Requested ResponseIndicates filing of Petition for Review Requested response to petition for review due no later than October 31, 2013.
09/24/2013Response to Petition for Review waivedRespondent Waiver of Response filed on behalf of The Department of Family and Protective Services.
09/23/2013Response to Petition for Review waivedIntervenor Response Waiver filed on behalf of intervenors, Gregory Owen Harp and Julie Clarice Harp.
09/19/2013Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court CostsPetitioner Affidavit of Inability to Pay filed on behalf of D.B., father.
09/18/2013Petition for Review filedPetitioner Petition for Review filed on behalf of D.B.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/22/2014StatusCase to be stored 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Dept. of Family & Protective Serv.RespondentMr. Charles M. Mallin
Ms. Melissa Lee Russell Paschall
Mr. Christopher William Ponder
Attorney ad LitemOther interested party Mr. Thomas Wayne McKenzie
B., D.PetitionerMr. Richard A. Gladstone
G.H. and J.H.RespondentMr. Jeffrey N. Kaitcer
Mr. Monroe Allen (Mike) Windsor
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
412 SW3d 588, 08-08-13 
2nd Court of Appeals 
Honorable Per Curiam 
Trial Court Information
322nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Nancy L. Berger 
322-437743-08 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site