Supreme Court

Case: 13-0705    
13-0705
09/09/2013
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
DOCTORS HOSPITAL AT RENAISSANCE, LTD. 
CLAUDIA MEJIA 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/22/2014Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Doctors Hospital at Renaissance, Ltd.
04/07/2014Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Claudia Mejia.
03/17/2014Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Doctors Hospital at Renaissance, Ltd.
12/17/2013Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Claudia Mejia.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/09/2013Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Doctor's Hospital at Renaissance, Ltd. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/14/2015Record returned to Court of Appeals Record returned to the 13th court of appeals
07/30/2015Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
06/19/2015Petition for Review disposedDenied 
04/22/2014Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Doctors Hospital at Renaissance, Ltd.
04/07/2014Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Claudia Mejia.
03/17/2014Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Doctors Hospital at Renaissance, Ltd.
02/24/2014Case Record Filed  Clerk's record, reporter's record, ant's br, ape's br, ant's reply br, judgment, opinion, dissenting opinion
02/14/2014Record Requested in Petition for Review  
02/14/2014Brief on the Merits Requested Petitioner brief due 03/17/14. Response brief due 04/07/14. Reply brief due 04/22/14.
12/17/2013Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Claudia Mejia.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/17/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response filed on behalf of Claudia Mejia has been granted.
12/17/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Motion for Extension of Time to file Response filed on behalf of Claudia Mejia.
11/15/2013Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than 12/16/13.
10/15/2013Case forwarded to Court  
10/08/2013Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Claudia Mejia.
09/09/2013Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Doctor's Hospital at Renaissance, Ltd. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/19/2015Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 14 G-2
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mejia, ClaudiaRespondentMr. Manuel L. Guerra III
Doctor's Hospital at Renaissance, Ltd.PetitionerMr. Frank Sabo
Mr. Ysmael D. Fonseca  
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
___ SW3d ___, 08-01-13 
13th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Rogelio Valdez 
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2 
Hidalgo 
Honorable Jaime J. Palacios 
CL-12-0594-B 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site