Supreme Court

Case: 13-0670    
13-0670
08/29/2013
U.S. Certified Question accepted by Supreme Court
IN RE DEEPWATER HORIZON 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/22/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of The National Association of Manufacturers.
04/22/2015Motion for RehearingAppellant's motion for rehearing of a cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of BP, P.L.C., et al.
09/15/2014Exhibits in case/cause filedAppellee in caseExhibits for Oral Argument filed on behalf of Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.
08/29/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Allianz Global Corporate, et al.
08/08/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Lloyd's Market Association International Underwriting Association, Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, and American Institute of Marine Underwriters
07/31/2014Corrected BriefAppellant in caseAppellant's Corrected Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Deep Water Horizon.
05/21/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Brief on Amicus Curiae filed on behalf of  Aviation Insurance Association.  Submitted by Bruce M. Strikowsky.
05/19/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Brief of Amicus Curiae filed on behalf of B&G Risk Strategies LLC. Submitted by Bradley A. Jackson.
03/31/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Brief of Amicus Curiae filed on behalf of International Association of Drilling Contractors. Submitted by Kennenth G. Engerrand.
03/27/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief filed on behalf of United Policyholders.  Submitted by Meredith A. Welch. (Texas No. 24088617) REED SMITH LLP, 811 Main Street, Houston, TX 77002, Main: 713.469.7300
03/14/2014Fully hyperlinked brief filedAppellant in caseHyperlinked version of the Reply Brief that was filed on March 10, 2014. On behalf of BP P.L.C.
03/13/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of The National Association of Manufacturers.
03/10/2014Reply BriefAppellant in caseAppellant's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of BP L.L.C.
02/21/2014Fully hyperlinked brief filedRespondentHYPERLINKED COPY Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Triton Asset Leasing GMBH, et al.
02/21/2014Fully hyperlinked brief filedAppellee in caseFully hyperlinked courtesy copy of Response Brief on the Merits of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Certain Insurance Companies that was originally filed on Jan. 23, 2014.
01/23/2014Brief on the MeritsAppellee in caseResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Certain Insurance Companies.
01/23/2014Brief on the MeritsAppellee in caseResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of TransOcean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.
01/23/2014Brief on the MeritsAppellee in caseAppellee Ranger Insurance Limited's Brief on the Merits.
12/13/2013Fully hyperlinked brief filedAppellant in caseHyperlinked Copy of Appellant's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of BP P.L.C.,  et al.
11/20/2013Brief on the MeritsAppellant in caseAppellant's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of BP P.L.C.,  et al. (Hard Copies Received)
08/29/2013Certified Question filedU. S. Certified QuestionCertified Question filed by the Fifth Circuit of Appeals on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/11/2015Case Stored G02 Row 14 H-1
05/29/2015Motion for Rehearing - DisposedWithdrawn 
05/29/2015Motion to withdraw disposed ofFiling grantedAppellants' Motion to Withdraw Motion for Rehearing granted
05/27/2015Motion to Withdraw Filed Appellants, BP P.L.C., et al.'s Motion to Withdraw Motion for Rehearing.
05/15/2015Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to motion for rehearing due no later than June 1, 2015.
04/22/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of The National Association of Manufacturers.
04/22/2015Case forwarded to Court  
04/22/2015Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of BP, P.L.C., et al.
03/26/2015Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion of Rick Thompson in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christine G. England filed on behalf of Appellants BP Exploration, et al. has been granted.
03/26/2015Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christine G. England filed on behalf of Appellants BP Exploration & Production Incorporated, et al. has been granted.
03/26/2015Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion of Rick Thompson in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark D. Herman filed on behalf of Appellants BP Exploration, et al. has been granted.
03/26/2015Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark D. Herman filed on behalf of Appellants BP Exploration & Production Incorporated, et al. has been granted.
03/26/2015Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion of Rick Thompson in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of M. Alexia Depottere-Smith filed on behalf of Appellants BP Exploration, et al. has been granted.
03/26/2015Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of M. Alexia Depottere-Smith filed on behalf of Appellants BP Exploration & Production Incorporated, et al. has been granted.
03/25/2015Pro hac vice motion filed Unopposed Motion of Rick Thompson in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christine G. England filed on behalf of Appellants BP Exploration, et al.
03/25/2015Pro hac vice motion filed Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christine G. England filed on behalf of Appellants BP Exploration & Production Incorporated, et al.
03/25/2015Pro hac vice motion filed Unopposed Motion of Rick Thompson in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark D. Herman filed on behalf of Appellants BP Exploration, et al.
03/25/2015Pro hac vice motion filed Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark D. Herman filed on behalf of Appellants BP Exploration & Production Incorporated, et al.
03/25/2015Pro hac vice motion filed Unopposed Motion of Rick Thompson in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of M. Alexia Depottere-Smith filed on behalf of Appellants BP Exploration, et al.
03/25/2015Pro hac vice motion filed Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of M. Alexia Depottere-Smith filed on behalf of Appellants BP Exploration & Production Incorporated, et al.
03/24/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Appellants BP Exploration, et al. has been granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Motion for Rehearing is due April 22, 2015.
03/24/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Appellants BP Exploration, et al.
03/04/2015Phone call from Clerk's Office Spoke with Attorney Mark Herman regarding attorneys listed on Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing. Informed him that additional attorneys will need to be admitted pro hac vice since they are listed on the motion.
02/19/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Appellants BP Exploration et al. GRANTED. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Motion for Rehearing is due April 1, 2015.
02/19/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Appellants BP Exploration et al.
02/13/2015Dissenting opinion issued.IssuedJustice Johnson delivered a dissenting opinion.
02/13/2015Opinion issuedCertified question answered by the CourtThe Court answers the question certified by the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit.  Justice Guzman delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Chief Justice Hecht, Justice Green, Justice Willett, Justice Lehrmann, Justice Boyd, Justice Devine, and Justice Brown joined.
12/10/2014Notice from Counsel of a change in address Notice of Firm Address Change filed on behalf of Allan B. Moore and Thomas L. Cubbage III, of Covington & Burling LLP, counsel for BP P.L.C.
09/16/2014Oral argument  Argued on behalf of appellants by David B. Goodwin and Allan B. Moore; argued on behalf of appellees by Reagan W. Simpson
09/15/2014Exhibits in case/cause filed Exhibits for Oral Argument filed on behalf of Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.
08/29/2014Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Allianz Global Corporate, et al.
08/12/2014Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Reagan W. Simpson on behalf of Triton Asset Leasing.
08/08/2014Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Lloyd's Market Association International Underwriting Association, Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, and American Institute of Marine Underwriters
08/08/2014Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Appellants, BP Exploration & Production Inc., et al's Oral Argument Form. Submitted by David B. Goodwin and Allan B. Moore of Covington & Burling LLP of San Francisco, CA and Washington DC, respectively.
08/08/2014Motion for leave to file brief disposedFiling grantedMotion for Leave to File Corrected Brief is granted.
07/31/2014Motion for leave to file brief Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Opening Brief filed on behalf of Deepwater Horizon.
07/31/2014Corrected Brief Appellant's Corrected Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Deep Water Horizon.
07/31/2014Call received The Court will receive a corrected Appellant's Brief, along with a Motion for Leave to File the Corrected Appellant's Brief.
06/19/2014Notice from Counsel of a change in address Notice of Change of Address for George Hall, counsel for appellees, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. Updated in TAMES.
06/13/2014Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argument[Note: This cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., September 16, 2014.]  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/02/2014Letter Filed Ms. Kathleen Hopkins Alsina informed the Court that she no longer represents London Underwriters.
05/21/2014Amicus Curiae Brief received Brief on Amicus Curiae filed on behalf of  Aviation Insurance Association.  Submitted by Bruce M. Strikowsky.
05/19/2014Amicus Curiae Brief received Brief of Amicus Curiae filed on behalf of B&G Risk Strategies LLC. Submitted by Bradley A. Jackson.
05/02/2014Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedSherwood’s Motion in support of Unopposed Motion of Non Resident Attorney Bruce M. Strikowsky for Admission Pro Hac Vice is granted
05/02/2014Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion of Non Resident Attorney Bruce M. Strikowsky for Admission Pro Hac Vice is granted.
05/02/2014Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedSherwood’s Motion in support of Unopposed Motion of Non Resident Attorney Barry S. Alexander for Admission Pro Hac Vice is granted.
05/02/2014Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion of Non Resident Attorney Barry S. Alexander for Admission Pro Hac Vice is granted
04/29/2014Pro hac vice motion filed Motion in support of Unopposed Motion of Non Resident Attorney Bruce M. Strikowsky for Admission Pro Hac Vice. On behalf of Aviation Insurance Association.
04/29/2014Pro hac vice motion filed Unopposed Motion of Non Resident Attorney Bruce M. Strikowsky for Admission Pro Hac Vice. On behalf of Aviation Insurance Association.
04/29/2014Pro hac vice motion filed Motion in support of Unopposed Motion of Non Resident Attorney Barry S. Alexander for Admission Pro Hac Vice. On behalf of Aviation Insurance Association.
04/29/2014Pro hac vice motion filed Unopposed Motion of Non Resident Attorney Barry S. Alexander for Admission Pro Hac Vice. On behalf of Aviation Insurance Association.
04/15/2014Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedTexas Attorney Meredith Welch's Motion in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kevin Dreher is granted.
04/15/2014Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kevin Dreher is granted.
04/15/2014Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John Ellison is granted.
04/15/2014Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedTexas Attorney Meredith Welch's Motion in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John Shugrue is granted.
04/14/2014Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John Shugrue is granted.
04/14/2014Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedTexas Attorney Meredith Welch's Motion in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John Ellison is granted.
04/11/2014Pro hac vice motion filed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kevin Dreher.
04/11/2014Pro hac vice motion filed Texas Attorney Meredith Welch's Motion in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kevin Dreher.
04/11/2014Pro hac vice motion filed Texas Attorney Meredith Welch's Motion in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John Ellison.
04/11/2014Pro hac vice motion filed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John Ellison.
04/11/2014Pro hac vice motion filed Texas Attorney Meredith Welch's Motion in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John Shugrue.
04/11/2014Pro hac vice motion filed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John Shugrue.
03/31/2014Amicus Curiae Brief received Brief of Amicus Curiae filed on behalf of International Association of Drilling Contractors. Submitted by Kennenth G. Engerrand.
03/28/2014Electronic communication sent to Party Spoke with Ms. Welch's office.  Requested motions for pro hac vice for Amy Bach, John Shrugrue, Kevin Dreher, and John Ellison.
03/27/2014Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief filed on behalf of United Policyholders.  Submitted by Meredith A. Welch. (Texas No. 24088617) REED SMITH LLP, 811 Main Street, Houston, TX 77002, Main: 713.469.7300
03/14/2014Fully hyperlinked brief filed Hyperlinked version of the Reply Brief that was filed on March 10, 2014. On behalf of BP P.L.C.
03/13/2014Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of The National Association of Manufacturers.
03/10/2014Reply Brief Appellant's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of BP L.L.C.
02/21/2014Fully hyperlinked brief filed HYPERLINKED COPY Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Triton Asset Leasing GMBH, et al.
02/21/2014Fully hyperlinked brief filed Fully hyperlinked courtesy copy of Response Brief on the Merits of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Certain Insurance Companies that was originally filed on Jan. 23, 2014.
01/31/2014Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Appellant's Reply Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Reply brief is due March 10, 2014.
01/31/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Appellant's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of B.P.
01/23/2014Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Certain Insurance Companies.
01/23/2014Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of TransOcean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.
01/23/2014Brief on the Merits Appellee Ranger Insurance Limited's Brief on the Merits.
01/21/2014Designation of Lead Counsel  Notice of Appearance and Designation of Lead Counsel filed on behalf of Transocean.
12/30/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing granted2nd Motion for Extension of Time to file Appellees' Brief granted. Apes' Brief due January 23, 2014. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Ant's Brief due February 7, 2014.
12/30/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Appellee's Brief filed on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London.
12/13/2013Fully hyperlinked brief filed Hyperlinked Copy of Appellant's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of BP P.L.C.,  et al.
11/26/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Apellee's Brief is due January 9, 2014.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.  Appellant's Reply Brief is due January 24, 2014.
11/26/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Appellee's Brief filed on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London.
11/20/2013Brief on the Merits Appellant's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of BP P.L.C.,  et al. (Hard Copies Received)
10/30/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Appellant's Brief is due November 20, 2013.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED.  Appellee's Brief is due December 10, 2013.  Appellant's Brief is due December 27, 2013.
10/30/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Extension to file Brief filed on behalf of BP.
09/25/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion to Extend the Briefing Schedule is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Appellant's brief is due November 6, 2013; Appellee's brief is due November 26, 2013; and Reply brief is due December 11, 2013.
09/25/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion to Extend the Briefing Schedule filed on behalf of BP P.L.C., et al.
09/16/2013Designation of Lead Counsel  Notice of Designation of David B. Goodwin as Lead Counsel for BP p.l.c, et al.
09/13/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Richard N. Dicharry filed on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd’s London and Certain Insurance Companies has been granted.
09/13/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Richard N. Dicharry filed on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd’s London and Certain Insurance Companies.
09/13/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Richard N. Dicharry filed on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd’s London, et al. has been granted.
09/13/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Richard N. Dicharry filed on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd’s London, et al.
09/12/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedTexas Attorney, John Elsley, Motion in Support of Motion of Motion of Nonresident Atty Daniel B. Levin for Admission Pro Hac Vice granted.
09/12/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion of Nonresident Attorney Daniel B. Levin for Admission Pro Hac Vice granted
09/12/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedTexas Attorney, John Elsley, Motion in Support of Motion of Motion of Nonresident Atty Brad D. Brian for Admission Pro Hac Vice granted.
09/12/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion of Nonresident Attorney Brad D. Brian for Admission Pro Hac Vice granted.
09/11/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Texas Attorney, John M. Elsley, Motion in Support of Motion of Nonresident Attorney Daniel B. Levin for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., et al.
09/11/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Unopposed Motion of Nonresident Attorney Daniel B. Levin for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., et al.
09/11/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Texas Attorney, John M. Elsley, Motion in Support of Motion of Nonresident Attorney Brad D. Brian for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., et al.
09/11/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Unopposed Motion of Nonresident Attorney Brad D. Brian for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., et al.
09/09/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission for David B. Goodwin granted.
09/09/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion for Pro Hac Vice Admission for David B. Goodwin granted.
09/09/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission for David B. Goodwin filed on behalf of BP P.L.C., et al.
09/09/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission for David B. Goodwin filed on behalf of BP P.L.C., et al.
09/09/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Allan B. Moore granted.
09/09/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Allan B. Moore granted.
09/06/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Allan B. Moore filed on behalf of BP, P.L.C., et al.
09/06/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Allan B. Moore filed on behalf of BP, P.L.C., et al.
09/06/2013Brief on the Merits Requested Briefs requested:  Appellant's brief due no later than 10/7/13; Appellee's brief due 10/28/13; Reply brief due 11/12/13
09/06/2013Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance and Designation of Lead Counsel for Thomas L. Cubbage III on behalf of Appellants BP p.l.c., et al.
09/06/2013Certified Question accepted  
09/06/2013Certified Question disposedCertified Question acceptedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined
09/03/2013Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance and Designation of Lead Counsel for Michael J. Maloney on behalf of Ranger Insurance Limited.
09/03/2013Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance and Designation of Lead Counsel for John M. Elsley filed on behalf of Triton Asset Leasing GmbH, et al.
08/30/2013Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance and Designation of Lead Counsel of George B. Hall on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd’s London.
08/30/2013Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Kathleen Hopkins Alsina on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd’s London.
08/30/2013Notice requesting filing fee Fee request sent to both parties for Certified Question
08/29/2013Case Record Filed  Record filed by the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals on behalf of BP, PLC.
08/29/2013Phone call from Clerk's Office to Mr. Goodwin, Mr. Moore, Mr. Roberts and Mr. Dicharry to inform them that out-state attorneys must file with this court two motions pro hac vice and/or have a Texas Attorney to submit a Notice of Appearance. Left message.
08/29/2013Certified Question filed Certified Question filed by the Fifth Circuit of Appeals on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/11/2015Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 14 H-1
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BP P.L.C.AppellantMr. William Richard (Rick) Thompson II
Mr. David B. Goodwin
Mr. Allan B. Moore
Mark D. Herman
Christine G. England
M. Alexia Depottere-Smith
Ms. Deborah G. Hankinson
Mr. Thomas L. Cubbage III
Mark D. Herman
Allianz Global CorporateAmicus CuriaeMr. Jeffrey T. Bentch
Mr. J. Clifton Hall III
Mr. William P. Maines
International Association fo Drilling ContractorsAmicus CuriaeMr. Kenneth G. Engerrand
Certain Underwriters at Lloyds LondonAppelleeMr. Richard N. Dicharry
Ms. Kathleen Hopkins Alsina
Mr. George B. Hall Jr.
Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.AppelleeMr. Steven L. Roberts
Mr. Kent C. Sullivan
Mr. John M. Elsley  
Mr. Reagan W. Simpson
Mr. Brad D. Brian
Mr. Sean D. Jordan
Mr. Daniel B. Levin
Ms. Harriet O'Neill
Ms. Rachel Giesber Clingman
Mr. Daniel O. Goforth
Ranger Insurance LimitedAppelleeMr. Byron C. Keeling
Ms. Ruth B. Downes
Mr. Dwayne Richard Day
Mr. David W. Holman
Mr. Michael J. Maloney
B&G Risk Strategies LLCAmicus CuriaeMr. Bradley A. Jackson
Lloyd's Markt Association, International Underwriting Association, Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, and American Institute of Marine Underwriters Amicus CuriaeJacob Esparza
Ms. Karen Ann Conticello
Mr. Glenn Richard Legge
United PolicyholdersAmicus CuriaeMs. Meredith Welch Knudsen  
Aviation Insurance AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. William A. Sherwood
Mr. Bruce M. Strikowsky
Mr. Barry S. Alexander
National Association of ManufacturersAmicus CuriaeMs. Pamela Stanton Baron
Court of Appeals Information:
 
 
 
 
Trial Court Information
 
 
 
 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site