Supreme Court

Case: 13-0639
08/20/2013
U.S. Certified Question accepted by Supreme Court
STATE OFFICE OF RISK MANAGEMENT 
CHRISTY CARTY, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND FOR B.C., J.C. AND M.C., MINORS AND AS REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF JIMMY CARTY JR., DECEASED 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/12/2014Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus letter of Texas Mutual Insurance Co.
01/27/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Texas Mutual Insurance Company submitted by Mary A. Keeney, SB No. 11170300, GRAVES, DOUGHERTY, HEARON & MOODY PC, 401 Congress Ave., Suite 2200, Austin, Texas 78701, Telephone: (512) 480.5682
.
12/23/2013Brief filedAppellant in caseAppellant's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/12/2013Brief filedAppellee in caseAppellees' Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Christy Carty, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/22/2013Brief filedAppellant in caseBrief on the Merits filed on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/20/2013Certified Question filedU. S. Certified QuestionCertified Question filed by the Fift Circuit of Appeals on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionRemarksDocument
08/07/2014Case Stored  G02 Row 14 A-3
06/20/2014Opinion issuedCauseCertified question answered by the Court(6/20/2014 10:15:38 AM) 130639.pdf
02/14/2014Post submission brief filedRespondent Appellee's Post-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Chris Carty, et al.
02/12/2014Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus letter of Texas Mutual Insurance Co.
02/05/2014Oral argument   argued on behalf of appellant by Laura B. Fountain; argued on behalf of appellee by Roger W. Anderson
01/27/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus Brief of Texas Mutual Insurance Company submitted by Mary A. Keeney, SB No. 11170300, GRAVES, DOUGHERTY, HEARON & MOODY PC, 401 Congress Ave., Suite 2200, Austin, Texas 78701, Telephone: (512) 480.5682
.
01/21/2014Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedAppellant in case Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.
01/13/2014Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedAppellee in case Oral Argument will be presented by Roger W. Anderson on behalf of Christy Carty.
01/10/2014Case set for oral argumentCertified questionCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00, February 5, 2014.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
12/23/2013Brief filedAppellant in case Appellant's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/12/2013Brief filedAppellee in case Appellees' Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Christy Carty, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/06/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Appellee in caseFiling grantedUnopposed Motion to Extend Time to file Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Appellee brief is due December 12, 2013; Reply brief is due December 27, 2013.
11/06/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief.Appellee in case Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to file Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Christy Carty, et al.
10/22/2013Brief filedAppellant in case Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/16/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Appellant in caseFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State Office of Risk Management has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Appellant's Brief due October 23, 2013; Appelle Brief due November 12, 2013; Reply Brief due November 27, 2013.
09/16/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief.Appellant in case Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.
08/23/2013Brief on the Merits RequestedCertified question Briefs on the merits requested:  Appellant brief due no later than 9/23/13; Appellee brief due 10/14/13; Reply brief due 10/29/13.
08/23/2013Certified Question accepted   
08/23/2013Certified Question disposed Certified Question accepted 
08/21/2013Phone call from Clerk's Office** See Remarks Call made to both parties to request the filing fee. Spoke with Lisa, assistant for Mr. Anderson, counsel for Christy Carty, and she said that they are going to send the fee today.  SORM's counsel, Ms. Laura fountain, didn't answer, so left a message in her answering machine requesting the fee to be expedited.
08/20/2013Notice requesting filing feeU. S. Certified Question Fee request sent to both parties for Certified Question.
08/20/2013Case Record Filed   Record filed by the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.
08/20/2013Certified Question filedU. S. Certified Question Certified Question filed by the Fift Circuit of Appeals on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/07/2014Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 14 A-3
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Mutual Insurance CompanyAmicus CuriaeMs. Mary A. Keeney
Carty, ChristyAppelleeMr. William S. Hommel Jr.
Mr. Roger W. Anderson
State Office of Risk ManagementAppellantMs. Laura B. Fountain
Court of Appeals Information:
 
 
 
 
Trial Court Information
 
 
 
 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site