Supreme Court

Case: 13-0638
08/20/2013
U.S. Certified Question accepted by Supreme Court
FRANKIE SIMS, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED; AND PATSY SIMS, ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED 
CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, L.L.C. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/19/2014Motion for Rehearing - FiledAppellant's motion for rehearing of a cause filedAppellant's Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Frankie Sims, et al.
11/27/2013Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedAppellant in caseAppellants' Response to Amici Curiae. On behalf of Frankie Sims, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC"D)
11/26/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Brief of Amicus Curiae of Federal National Mortgage Association. Submitted by Ken Carroll of Carrington Coleman Sloman & Blumenthal LLP of Dallas, Texas. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/19/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Independent Bankers Association of Texas, Texas Bankers Association, and Texas Mortgage Bankers Association. Submitted by Karen M. Neeley, John C. Fleming and B. Scott Daugherty. (Hard Copies Received)
11/12/2013Reply brief filedAppellant in caseReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Frankie Sims, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/08/2013Brief filedAppellee in caseAppellee's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Carrington Mortgage Services LLC. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/30/2013Appellant's Brief filedAppellant in caseAppellant's Brief filed on behalf of Frankie Sims, et al.
08/20/2013Certified Question filedU. S. Certified QuestionCertified Question filed by the Fifth Circuit of Appeals.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionRemarksDocument
10/03/2014Motion for Rehearing - DisposedCauseDenied 
05/19/2014Case forwarded to Court   
05/19/2014Motion for Rehearing - FiledAppellant's motion for rehearing of a cause filed Appellant's Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Frankie Sims, et al.
05/16/2014Opinion issuedCauseCertified question answered by the Court(5/16/2014 11:18:43 AM) 130638.pdf
12/04/2013Oral argument   argued on behalf of appellant by J. Patrick Sutton; argued on behalf of appellee by W. Scott Hastings
11/27/2013Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedAppellant in case Appellants' Response to Amici Curiae. On behalf of Frankie Sims, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC"D)
11/26/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed) Brief of Amicus Curiae of Federal National Mortgage Association. Submitted by Ken Carroll of Carrington Coleman Sloman & Blumenthal LLP of Dallas, Texas. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/19/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus Brief of Independent Bankers Association of Texas, Texas Bankers Association, and Texas Mortgage Bankers Association. Submitted by Karen M. Neeley, John C. Fleming and B. Scott Daugherty. (Hard Copies Received)
11/18/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedAppellee in case Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC.
11/15/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedAppellant in case Oral Argument Submission Form submitted by J. Patrick Sutton of Austin Texas. On behalf of Frankie Sims et al.
11/15/2013Case set for oral argumentCertified questionCase set for oral argumentThe cause is set for oral argument on December 4, 2013.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes.
11/12/2013Reply brief filedAppellant in case Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Frankie Sims, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/08/2013Brief filedAppellee in case Appellee's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Carrington Mortgage Services LLC. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/04/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.RespondentFiling grantedCarrington Mortgage Services, LLC's Motion to Extend Deadline to File Brief granted.  Appellee brief due 11/8/13; Reply brief due 11/25/13.  Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.
08/30/2013Appellant's Brief filedAppellant in case Appellant's Brief filed on behalf of Frankie Sims, et al.
08/28/2013Reply to Response to MotionAppellee in case Reply in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to file Appellee's Brief filed on behalf of Frankie Sims.
08/28/2013Response to Motion filedAppellant in case Opposed Response to Motion for Extension of Time to file Appellant's Brief.
08/27/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief.Appellee in case Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Appellee's Brief filed on behalf of Carrington Mortgage Serv.
08/27/2013Call receivedAppellant in case From Mr. James Patrick Sutton to inform the Court that he will be efiling a response to ape's m/e/t today.
08/23/2013Brief on the Merits RequestedCertified question Briefs on the merits requested:  Appellant brief due no later than 9/23/13; Appellee brief due 10/14/13; Reply brief due 10/29/13.
08/23/2013Certified Question accepted   
08/23/2013Certified Question disposed Certified Question accepted 
08/20/2013Notice requesting filing feeU. S. Certified Question Fee request sent to both parties for Certified Question.
08/20/2013Case Record Filed   Record filed by the Fift Circuit of Appeals.
08/20/2013Certified Question filedU. S. Certified Question Certified Question filed by the Fifth Circuit of Appeals.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/03/2014StatusCase to be stored 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Independent Bankers Association of TexasAmicus CuriaeMs. Karen M. Neeley
Carrington Mortgage Services, LLCAppelleeMr. William Scott Hastings  
Mr. Daron L. Janis
Mr. Benjamin David Lee Foster  
Ms. Amanda Schaeffer  
Mr. Thomas G. Yoxall
Mr. Robert T. Mowrey
Texas Bankers AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. B. Scott Daugherty
Sims, FrankieAppellantMr. David M. Gottfried
Mr. James Patrick Sutton  
Mr. Jeffrey W. Hurt
Mr. Earl Berry Jr.
Federal National Mortgage AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. Ken Carroll
Texas Mortgage Bankers AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. John C. Fleming
Court of Appeals Information:
 
 
 
 
Trial Court Information
 
 
 
 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site