Supreme Court

Case: 13-0439    
13-0439
06/17/2013
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
LEZLEA ROSS 
ST. LUKE’S EPISCOPAL HOSPITAL 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/24/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Texas Trial Lawyers Association (TTLA). Submitted by Michael Guajardo, president of TTLA and Peter M. Kelly of Kelly Durham & Pittard LLP of Houston Texas.
06/19/2014Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Lezlea Ross.
05/05/2014Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of St. Luke's Episcopal Hosp.
03/24/2014Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Lezlea Ross.
12/03/2013Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply filed on behalf of Lezlea Ross.
11/12/2013Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of St. Luke's Episcopal Hospital, et al.
07/17/2013Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Lezlea Ross. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/11/2015Case Stored G02 Row 14 H-1
06/11/2015Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
05/01/2015Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
05/01/2015Concurring Opinion issued.IssuedJustice Lehrmann delivered a concurring opinion, in which Justice Devine joined.
05/01/2015Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; cause remanded to trial courtThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to the trial court.  Justice Johnson delivered the opinion of the Court.
(5/1/2015 9:22:03 AM) 130439c.pdf, 130439.pdf, 13-0439.jmt.pdf
11/24/2014Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Texas Trial Lawyers Association (TTLA). Submitted by Michael Guajardo, president of TTLA and Peter M. Kelly of Kelly Durham & Pittard LLP of Houston Texas.
11/05/2014Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Sean M. Reagan; argued on behalf of respondents by E. Dale Burrus
10/20/2014Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Sean M. Reagan of Leyh, Payne & Mallia, PLLC on behalf of Lezlea Ross.
09/08/2014Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral argument submission form of respondent, St. Luke's Episcopal Hospital.  Submitted by Ms. E. Dale Burrus of Kroger Burrus, Houston, TX .
06/27/2014Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argument[Note: This case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., November 5, 2014.]  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/27/2014Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
06/27/2014Petition for Review granted  
06/19/2014Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Lezlea Ross.
05/20/2014Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for extension of time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. Pet's Reply Brief is due June 19, 2014. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored.
05/20/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Lezlea Ross.
05/05/2014Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of St. Luke's Episcopal Hosp.
04/10/2014Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedResponse brief due 05/05/14; Reply brief due 05/20/14; FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
04/10/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of St. Luke's Episcopal Hospital, et al.
03/24/2014Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Lezlea Ross.
03/20/2014Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits is Granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Petitioner's brief is due March 24, 2014; Respondent's brief is due April 14, 2014; and Reply brief is due April 29, 2014.
03/20/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Lezlea Ross.
02/19/2014Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Moiton for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petitioner's brief is due March 20, 2014; Respondent's brief is due April 9, 2014; and Reply brief is due April 24, 2014.
02/18/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Lezlea Ross.
01/21/2014Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
01/21/2014Record Requested in Petition for Review  
01/17/2014Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than 2/18/14; Response brief due 3/10/14; Reply brief due 3/25/14.
01/15/2014Letter Filed Letter filed on behalf of St. Luke's Episcopal Hospital.
12/03/2013Reply to Response Reply filed on behalf of Lezlea Ross.
12/03/2013MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Reply was filed on December 3, 2013.
12/03/2013Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply to Petition filed on behalf of Lezlea Ross.
11/12/2013Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of St. Luke's Episcopal Hospital, et al.
10/16/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Response is due November 12, 2013.
10/16/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of St. Luke's Episcopal Hospital.
(Hard Copies Received)
09/20/2013Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than 10/21/13.
08/20/2013Case forwarded to Court  
07/17/2013Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Lezlea Ross. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/17/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition is due July 17, 2013.
06/17/2013Phone call from Clerk's Office to Ms. Burrus to inquire whether a response noting her opposition to petitioner's motion was going to be filed or not. Per Ms. Burrus, there was a misunderstanding; she does not oppose petitioner's motion.
06/17/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Opposed Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Review. On behalf of Lezlea Ross.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/11/2015Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 14 H-1
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The Texas Trial Lawyers Association (TTLA)Amicus CuriaeMr. Michael G. Guajardo
Mr. Peter M. Kelly
St. Luke's Episcopal HospitalRespondentMrs. Elizabeth Dale Burrus
Mr. Charles Creighton Carr II
Mr. Gregory Alan Schlak
Ms. Lauren Nelson  
Ms. Marsha A. Bradley  
Ross, LezleaPetitionerMr. Harold Kenneth 'Ken' Tummel
Mr. Sean Michael Reagan
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
459 SW3d 617, 03-19-13 
14th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Sharon Sue Mccally 
Trial Court Information
215th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Steven E. Kirkland 
2010-75291 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site