Supreme Court

Case: 13-0397    
13-0397
06/03/2013
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
HITESH B. YAGNIK, M.D. 
MARCUS HERNANDEZ AND DIANE HERNANDEZ 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/17/2014Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedPetitionerReply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Hitesh B. Yagnik, M.D.
04/16/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Brief of Texas Association of Defense Counsel as Amicus Curiae. Submitted by Richard B. Phillips, Jr. of Thompson & Knight LLP of Dallas, Texas.
03/31/2014Response to Motion for RehearingRespondentResponse to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Marcus Hernandez, et al.
01/08/2014Motion for RehearingRehearing filed in Petition for ReviewMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Hitesh B. Yagnik, M.D.
09/12/2013Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Hitesh B. Yagnik, M.D. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/28/2013Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition filed on behalf of Marcus Hernandez, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/03/2013Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Hitesh B. Yagnik, M.D. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/10/2015Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See Remarks Letter sent correcting the petition for review date notated on the final order sent out on April 29, 2014.
05/01/2014Case Stored Row 10 A-4
04/29/2014Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
04/25/2014Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied 
04/17/2014Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Hitesh B. Yagnik, M.D.
04/16/2014Amicus Curiae Brief received Brief of Texas Association of Defense Counsel as Amicus Curiae. Submitted by Richard B. Phillips, Jr. of Thompson & Knight LLP of Dallas, Texas.
03/31/2014Response to Motion for Rehearing Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Marcus Hernandez, et al.
02/26/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Marcus and Diane Hernandez has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response due April 2, 2014.
02/26/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Marcus and Diane Hernandez.
02/14/2014Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to motion for rehearing due no later than 3/3/14.
01/14/2014Case forwarded to Court  
01/08/2014Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Hitesh B. Yagnik, M.D.
12/09/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Motion for Rehearing is due January 8, 2014.
12/09/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Hitesh B. Yagnik, M.D.
11/22/2013Petition for Review disposedDenied 
09/12/2013Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Hitesh B. Yagnik, M.D. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/10/2013Case forwarded to Court  
08/28/2013Response to Petition Response to Petition filed on behalf of Marcus Hernandez, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/01/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Response is due September 3, 2013.
08/01/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion to Extend Timeto File Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Marcus Hernandez, et al.
07/03/2013Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Hitesh B. Yagnik, M.D. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/04/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition is due July 3, 2013.
06/03/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review. On behalf of Hitesh B. Yagnik, M.D.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/01/2014Case StoredCase stored.Row 10 A-4
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Association of Defense CounselAmicus CuriaeMr. Richard B. Phillips Jr.
Yagnik, M.D., Hitesh B.PetitionerMs. Diana L. Faust
Mr. R. Brent Cooper
Mr. Kyle M. Burke  
Mr. Wesley David Donald Raff  
Mr. Edward P. Quillin
Hernandez, MarcusRespondentMr. Joe D. Gregory
Mr. Robert D. Hudnall
Mr. David F. Farris
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
___ SW3d ___, 04-18-13 
2nd Court of Appeals 
Honorable LeeAnn Dauphinot 
Trial Court Information
141st District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable John Parrish Chupp 
141-201678-03 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site