Supreme Court

Case: 13-0321
05/01/2013
Petition for Review/Cause under Tex. R. App. P. 59.1
KENNEDY HODGES, L.L.P. 
VENTURA GOBELLAN, JR. AND PAULA GOBELLAN 
Trial Court Information
24th District Court 
Jackson 
Honorable Kemper Stephen Williams 
03-5-12118 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/27/2013Reply brief filedPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Kennedy Hodges LLP  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/26/2013Brief filedRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Ventura Gobellan, Jr., et al.
(Hard Copies Received)
10/21/2013Brief filedPetitionerBrief on the Merits filed on behalf of Kennedy Hodges, L.L.P. (Hard Copies Recieved)
08/19/2013Reply filedPetitionerReply to Petition filed on behalf of Kennedy Hodges LLP.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/12/2013Response to Petition for Review filedRespondentResponse to Petition for Review. On behalf of Ventura Gobellan, Jr., and Paula Gobellan.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/03/2013Petition for Review filedPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Kennedy Hodges, L.L.P.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionRemarksDocument
07/16/2014Case Stored  G02 Row 29 A-3
06/27/2014Mandate issued  Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
05/16/2014Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record Issued 
05/16/2014Opinion issuedCauseCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; cause remanded to trial courtPursuant to Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 59.1, after granting the petition for review and without hearing oral argument, the Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to the trial court.
(5/16/2014 11:11:08 AM) 130321.pdf, 13-0321.jmt.pdf
05/16/2014Petition for Review disposed Petition granted pursuant to TRAP 59.1 
05/16/2014Petition for Review granted under TRAP 59.1   
05/16/2014Stay Order lifted  Stay order issued August 9, 2013, lifted
12/27/2013Reply brief filedPetitioner Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Kennedy Hodges LLP  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/16/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Petitioner's Reply BriefFiling grantedMotion for extension of time to file Reply Brief on the Merits granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Pet's Reply Brief due December 27, 2013.
12/13/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief.Petitioner Unopposed motion for extension of time to file Reply Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Kennedy Hodges LLP.
11/26/2013Brief filedRespondent Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Ventura Gobellan, Jr., et al.
(Hard Copies Received)
10/31/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.RespondentFiling grantedResponse brief due 11/26/13; Reply brief due 12/11/13; FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
10/31/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief.Respondent Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Ventura Gobellan, Jr.
10/21/2013Brief filedPetitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Kennedy Hodges, L.L.P. (Hard Copies Recieved)
10/18/2013Case Record Filed   Clerk's record (1 V), reporter's record (1 V), ant's br, appendix to ant's br, ape's br, ant's reply br, amended post-submission ant's br, ape's post-submission br, misc. folder ( mos. & corres.), opinion, judgment
09/24/2013Record Requested in Petition for Review   
09/20/2013Brief on the Merits RequestedIndicates filing of Petition for Review Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than 10/21/13; Response brief due 11/12/13; Reply brief due 11/27/13.
08/19/2013Reply filedPetitioner Reply to Petition filed on behalf of Kennedy Hodges LLP.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/12/2013Response to Petition for Review filedRespondent Response to Petition for Review. On behalf of Ventura Gobellan, Jr., and Paula Gobellan.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/09/2013Stay Order issuedIndicates filing of Petition for Review  
08/09/2013Motion to Stay Disposed Filing granted 
08/07/2013Reply to Response to MotionPetitioner Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for Temporary Relief filed on behalf of Kennedy Hodges, L.L.P.
08/06/2013Response to Motion filedRespondent Respondents' Response to Emergency Motion for Temporary Relief. On behalf of Ventura Gobellan, Jr., and Paula Gobellan.
08/05/2013Call receivedRespondent Counsel for respondent informed the Court that the motion will be filed tomorrow, rather than today.
08/01/2013Call receivedRespondent Counsel for respondent called to inform that a response to the emergency motion will be forthcoming on 08/05/13.
07/31/2013Motion to Stay Filed Petitioner Emergency Motion for Temporary Relief filed on behalf of Kennedy Hodges, L.L.P.
07/12/2013Supreme Court of Texas Requested ResponseIndicates filing of Petition for Review Requested response to petition for writ of mandamus due no later than 8/12/13.
06/04/2013Case forwarded to Court   
05/17/2013Stay Order issued   
05/17/2013Motion to Stay Disposed Filing granted in partEmergency Motion for Temporary Relief granted in part
05/13/2013Reply to Response to MotionPetitioner Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for Temporary Relief filed on behalf of Ventura Gobellan, Jr. and Paula Gobellan.
05/10/2013Response to Motion filedRespondent Response to Emergency Motion for Temporary Relief filed on behalf of Ventura Gobellan, Jr. and Paula Gobellan.
05/09/2013Supplement to Motion filedPetitioner Supplement to Motion to Stay filed on behalf of Kennedy Hodges, LLP.
05/08/2013Phone call from Clerk's OfficePetitioner Call made to petitioner attorney, Kevin Risley, to verify that the summary judgment motion is set for hearing on May 17, 2013, not May 10 per the first paragraph of the Emergency Motion for Temporary Relief.  Mr. Risley confirmed the hearing is on May 17.  
05/08/2013Call receivedRespondent From Mr. Robert McKnight, att for resp, informing the Court that they are going to be efiling a response to pet's motion to stay by no later than Friday, May 10th.
05/07/2013Motion to Stay Filed Petitioner Emergency Motion for Temporary Relief filed on behalf of Kennedy Hodges, L.L.P.
05/03/2013Petition for Review filedPetitioner Petition for Review filed on behalf of Kennedy Hodges, L.L.P.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/01/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedPetitionerFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.  Petition for Review is due May 6, 2013.
05/01/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filedPetitioner Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review is filed on behalf of Kennedy Hodges, L.L.P.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/16/2014Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 29 A-3
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gobellan, VenturaRespondentMr. Robert P. Houston
Mr. Robert Edward McKnight Jr.
Mr. John W. Griffin Jr.
Kennedy Hodges, L.L.P.PetitionerCory Reed  
Ms. Zandra Elayne Foley
Mr. Kevin F. Risley
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
___ SW3d ___, 03-14-13 
13th Court of Appeals 
Affirmed  
Honorable Nora Longoria 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site