Supreme Court

Case: 13-0158
03/06/2013
Petition for Review/Cause under Tex. R. App. P. 59.1
FORD MOTOR COMPANY 
EZEQUIEL CASTILLO, INDIVIDUALLY, MARIA DE LOS ANGELES CASTILLO, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND FOR A.C. AND E.C., AND ROSA SILVIA MARTINEZ, INDIVIDUALLY 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/04/2014Reply to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondentReply in support of Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Ezequiel Castillo.
07/30/2014Response to Motion for RehearingPetitionerResponse to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Ford Motor Company.
07/07/2014Motion for Rehearing - FiledRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Ezequiel Castillo.
02/06/2014Brief filedPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Ford.
01/07/2014Brief filedRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Ezequiel Castillo, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/18/2013Brief filedPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Ford Motor Company.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/02/2013Reply filedPetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/29/2013Response to Petition for Review filedRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Ezequiel Castillo et al.
04/09/2013Petition for Review filedPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Ford Motor Company.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionRemarksDocument
10/24/2014Letter ReceivedOther than Petitioner, Respondent, Relator etc. Order Granting Motion for Withdrawl as Attorney At Litem filed on behalf of Ernesto Gamez, Jr.
10/23/2014Phone call from Clerk's OfficeOther than Petitioner, Respondent, Relator etc. Spoke with legal assistant to Ernesto Gamez regarding the Court's request for a filing of a previous Order Granting Motion for Withdrawl as Attorney Ad Litem.
10/23/2014Letter ReceivedOther than Petitioner, Respondent, Relator etc. Letter filed regarding withdrawl of counsel filed on behalf of Ernesto Gamez, Jr.
10/03/2014Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record Issued 
10/03/2014Opinion issuedCauseCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed and remanded to Court of AppealsThe Court withdraws its opinion and judgment issued June 20, 2014, and issues a substituted opinion.  Pursuant to Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 59.1, after granting the petition for review and without hearing oral argument, the Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to that court.
(10/3/2014 1:15:52 PM) 13-0158.jmt substituted.pdf, 130158rh.pdf
10/03/2014Motion for Rehearing Granted   
10/03/2014Motion for Rehearing - Disposed Filing granted 
10/03/2014previous judgment withdrawn  Judgment issued June 20, 2014 is withdrawn and substituted.
10/03/2014Previous opinion withdrawn  Per Curiam Opinion issued June 20, 2014 withdrawn and substituted.
08/11/2014Letter FiledRespondent Letter filed on behalf of Ezequiel Castillo, et al.
08/04/2014Reply to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondent Reply in support of Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Ezequiel Castillo.
07/30/2014Response to Motion for RehearingPetitioner Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Ford Motor Company.
07/17/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedPetitionerFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Motion for Rehearing is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Motion for Rehearing is due July 30, 2014.
07/16/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponsePetitioner Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Ford Motor Co.
07/15/2014Supreme Court of Texas Requested ResponseIndicates Motion for Rehearing Response requested to Motion for Rehearing due no later than Wednesday, July 23, 2014.
07/07/2014Case forwarded to Court   
07/07/2014Motion for Rehearing - FiledRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filed Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Ezequiel Castillo.
06/20/2014Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record Issued 
06/20/2014Opinion issuedCauseCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed, trial court judgment reinstatedPursuant to Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 59.1, after granting the petition for review and without hearing oral argument, the Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and reinstates the trial court's judgment.  Per Curiam Opinion
(6/20/2014 12:21:13 PM) 130158.pdf, 13-0158.jmt.pdf
06/20/2014Petition for Review disposed Petition granted pursuant to TRAP 59.1 
06/20/2014Petition for Review granted under TRAP 59.1   
02/06/2014Brief filedPetitioner Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Ford.
01/16/2014Motion for Extension of Time disposed.PetitionerFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Reply brief is due February 6, 2014.
01/16/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief.Petitioner Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Requesting an additional 15 days until February 6, 2014.
01/07/2014Brief filedRespondent Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Ezequiel Castillo, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/18/2013Brief filedPetitioner Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Ford Motor Company.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/16/2013Case Record Filed   Clerk's record (1 V), reporter's record (16 V - V 14-16 labeled as EXHIBITS), supp reporter's record (3 V), ant's br, ape's br, ant's reply br, misc. folder (motions), opinion, judgment
11/12/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.PetitionerFiling grantedPetitioner brief due 12/18/13; Response brief due 01/07/14; Reply brief due 01/22/13. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
11/07/2013Phone call from Clerk's OfficeRespondent Left message for Attorney Kasofsky to inform the Court whether he will e-file a response to the motion by 11/08/13.
11/06/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief.Petitioner Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Petitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Ford Motor Company.
10/21/2013Record Requested in Petition for Review   
10/18/2013Brief on the Merits RequestedIndicates filing of Petition for Review Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than 11/18/13; Response brief due 12/9/13; Reply brief due 12/27/13.
10/02/2013Reply filedPetitioner Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/10/2013MET to file reply disposed ofPetitionerFiling grantedReply due 10/02/13.
09/05/2013Phone call from Clerk's OfficeRespondent Attorney Kasofsky will inform whether he will e-file a response to the motion by 09/11/13.
09/05/2013Motion to extend time to file replyPetitioner Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Ford Motor Company.
08/29/2013Response to Petition for Review filedRespondent Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Ezequiel Castillo et al.
08/19/2013Description of document returned to Supreme CourtOther than Petitioner, Respondent, Relator etc. Mail returned for Michael Keisel.  Updated address and resent notice.
08/01/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.** See RemarksFiling grantedOpposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition for Review is Granted in part.  Response to Petition for Review is due August, 29, 2013.  No further extensions of time will be considered.
08/01/2013Call received  Spoke with David Schenck and he stated that they are opposed to the second motion for extension and will rely on their previous response in opposition to respondent's first motion for extension.
08/01/2013Phone call from Clerk's Office  Left message with David Schenck asking if they intended to file a written response in oppostition to respondent's second motion for extension of time to file response to petition for review.
08/01/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseRespondent Opposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Ezequiel Castillo, et al.  Requesting an additional 45 days until September 16, 2013.
07/16/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.** See RemarksFiling granted in partMotion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Ezequiel Castillo, et al. granted in part.  Response is due no later than August 2, 2013.  Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.
07/16/2013Response to Motion filedPetitioner Response to Respondent's Motion for Extension filed on behalf of Ford Motor Company.
07/10/2013Call receivedPetitioner Call received from petitioner attorney, David Schenck, stating he is opposed to the motion for extension of time to file requested response proposed due date of August 25, 2013 but is not opposed to a 30 day extension from the original due date of June 24, 2013.  A response to the motion for extension of time to file the requested response is forthcoming within 5 business days.
07/10/2013Phone call from Clerk's OfficePetitioner Call made to petitioner attorney, David Schenck, to find out if unopposed to motion for extension of time to file response to petition for review.  Left voicemail.
07/05/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseRespondent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Ezequiel Castillo, et al.
07/03/2013Call receivedRespondent From Mr. Mark Cantu's office in re:  requested response that was due on 6/24/13.  They never got notice and are going to efile a m/e/t along with a designation of lead counsel.
07/03/2013Call received  Inquiry about respondent's response that was due on 6/24/13.
05/24/2013Supreme Court of Texas Requested ResponseIndicates filing of Petition for Review Requested response to petition for review due no later than 6/24/13.
04/23/2013Case forwarded to Court   
04/18/2013Response to Petition for Review waivedRespondent Response Waiver filed on behalf of Ezequiel Castillo, et al.
04/09/2013Petition for Review filedPetitioner Petition for Review filed on behalf of Ford Motor Company.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/18/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedPetitionerFiling grantedPetition is due April 10, 2013.
03/08/2013Response to Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for ReviewRespondent Response to Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed on behalf of Ezequiel Castillo, et al.
03/07/2013Call receivedRespondent from Mr. Cantu to notify the Court that a response to petitioner's motion to extend time will be filed on or before Tuesday, March 11.
03/06/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filedPetitioner Opposed Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Review. On behalf of Ford Motor Company.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/20/2014StatusMotion for rehearing due to be filed.  
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Castillo, AshleyOther interested party Mr. Ernesto Gamez Jr.
Ford Motor CompanyPetitionerMr. David J. Schenck
Mr. Eduardo R. Rodriguez
Mr. Ronald D. Wamsted
Mr. Christopher D. Kratovil
Mr. Jaime A. Saenz
Mr. Michael W. Eady
Castillo, EzequielOther interested party Mr. Michael T. Kiesel
Castillo, EzequielRespondentMr. Robert Schell
Mr. Juan A. Gonzalez
Mr. Keith C. Livesay
Mr. Mark A. Cantu
Mr. Dale S. Kasofsky
Mr. David M. Gunn
Mr. Roger W. Hughes
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
___ SW3d ___, 01-24-13 
13th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Rogelio Valdez 
Trial Court Information
404th District Court 
Cameron 
Honorable Elia Cornejo-Lopez 
2003-01-251-G 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site