Supreme Court

Case: 13-0156
03/05/2013
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
KEY OPERATING & EQUIPMENT, INC. 
WILL HEGAR AND LOREE HEGAR 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/20/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Texas Oil & Gas Association. Submitted by Jillian M. Marullo of Liskow & Lewis PLC of Houston Texas.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/29/2013Reply brief filedPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Key Operating Equipment, Inc.
10/10/2013Brief filedRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Will and Loree Hegar.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/23/2013Brief filedPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Key Operating Equipment, Inc.
08/22/2013Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of Texas Oil & Gas Association in support of Petition for Review. Submitted by Everard A. Marseglia, Jr. of Liskow & Lewis PLC. of Houston Texas. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/29/2013Response to Petition for Review filedRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Will Hegar and Loree Hegar.(HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/25/2013Petition for Review filedPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Key Operating Equipment, Inc. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionRemarksDocument
08/07/2014Case Stored  G02 Row 14 A-3
08/01/2014Mandate issued  Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
06/20/2014Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record Issued 
06/20/2014Opinion issuedCauseCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed & judgment renderedThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and renders judgment. Justice Johnson delivered the opinion of the Court.
(6/20/2014 12:03:58 PM) 130156.pdf, 13-0156.jmt.pdf
02/04/2014Oral argument   Argued on behalf of petitioner by Jeffrey M. Burns; argued on behalf of respondents by Mark Harwell
01/08/2014Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedPetitioner Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Key Operating & Equipment, Inc.
12/18/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedRespondent Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Will Hegar, et al.
12/13/2013Case set for oral argumentIndicates filing of Petition for ReviewCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., February 4, 2014.  Time allotted to argue: 20/20 minutes.
12/13/2013Petition for Review disposed Filing granted 
12/13/2013Petition for Review granted   
11/20/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus Brief of Texas Oil & Gas Association. Submitted by Jillian M. Marullo of Liskow & Lewis PLC of Houston Texas.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/05/2013Letter FiledRespondent Letter in regard to Appellant’s Reply Brief filed with the Court on October 29, 2013 filed on behalf of Will Hegar.
(Hard Copies Received)
10/29/2013Reply brief filedPetitioner Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Key Operating Equipment, Inc.
10/10/2013Brief filedRespondent Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Will and Loree Hegar.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/23/2013Brief filedPetitioner Petitioner's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Key Operating Equipment, Inc.
09/05/2013Case Record Filed Clerk of the Court of Appeals Electronic Appellate Record received.
08/27/2013Record Requested in Petition for Review   
08/23/2013Brief on the Merits RequestedIndicates filing of Petition for Review Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than 9/23/13; Response brief due 10/14/13; Reply brief due 10/29/13.
08/22/2013Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus Letter of Texas Oil & Gas Association in support of Petition for Review. Submitted by Everard A. Marseglia, Jr. of Liskow & Lewis PLC. of Houston Texas. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/29/2013Response to Petition for Review filedRespondent Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Will Hegar and Loree Hegar.(HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/03/2013Supreme Court of Texas Requested ResponseIndicates filing of Petition for Review Response due 06/03/13.
04/02/2013Case forwarded to Court   
04/01/2013Response to Petition for Review waivedRespondent Response Waiver filed on behalf of Will Hegar, et al.
03/25/2013Petition for Review filedPetitioner Petition for Review filed on behalf of Key Operating Equipment, Inc. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/13/2013Phone call from Clerk's OfficePetitioner Left message for Mr. Burns.  Informed him that the motion was granted, and the petition is due on March 25, 2013.
03/13/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedPetitionerFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Petition for Review is due March 25, 2013.
03/12/2013Amendment to motion Petitioner Amended Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Key Operating & Equipment, Inc.
03/11/2013Phone call from Clerk's OfficePetitioner Mr. Burns informed the Court that he will Supplement the Motion for Extension of Time by the end of the day tomorrow.
03/07/2013Response to Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for ReviewRespondent Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Reviewfiled on behalf of Will and Loree Hegar.
03/07/2013Call receivedRespondent Mr. Harwell informed the Court that a Response to the Motion will be filed by March 11, 2013.
03/06/2013Phone call from Clerk's OfficeRespondent Messaged Mr. Harwell.  Requested whether or not a response will be filed to the motion.
03/06/2013Certification (various) in case receivedPetitioner Certificate of Conference indicates that the Motion for Extension of Time is Opposed.  Filed on behalf of Key Operating & Equipment, Inc.
03/05/2013Phone call from Clerk's OfficePetitioner Requested certificate of conference for motion.  Should receive it by the end of day tomorrow.
03/05/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filedPetitioner Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Key Operating & Equipment, Inc.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/07/2014Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 14 A-3
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Oil & Gas AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. Everard A. Marseglia Jr.
Ms. Jillian Marullo  
Key Operating & Equipment, Inc.PetitionerMr. Jeffrey Burns  
Hegar, WillRespondentMr. Mark C. Harwell
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
403 SW3d 318, 01-07-13 
1st Court of Appeals 
Honorable Harvey G. Brown 
Trial Court Information
21st District Court 
Washington 
Honorable Terry Flenniken 
33,968 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site