Supreme Court

Case: 13-0053    
13-0053
01/23/2013
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
STATE OF TEXAS 
CLEAR CHANNEL OUTDOOR, INC. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/16/2014Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondentOral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.
07/31/2014Supplemental Letter BriefRespondentSupplemental Letter Brief filed on behalf of Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.
07/24/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief filed on behalf of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center and Owners' Counsel of America.
05/06/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Outdoor Advertising Association of America.  Submitted by J. Allen Smith, Texas Bar No. 18616900, asmith@Settlepou.com, SETTLEPOU, 3333 Lee Parkway, Eighth Floor, Dallas, Texas 75219, (214) 520-3300
04/28/2014Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondentResponse to Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.
04/23/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of the City of Fort Worth, Texas.  Submitted by CHRISTOPHER B. MOSLEY, Sr. Assistant City Attorneyj, State Bar No. 00789505, Chris.Mosley@fortworthtexas.gov, CITY OF FORT WORTH, TEXAS, 1000 Throckmorton Street, Fort Worth, Texas 76102, Tel: 817-392-7600
04/21/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amici Curiae Brief of City of Houston, Harris Cty.;  Tex. Municipal League; Tex. Assoc. of Counties; Tex. Conference of Urban Counties; Alamo, Ctrl. Tex., N. East Tex., and N. Tex. Reg. Mobility Auth.; and Scenic Tex., Inc.. Submitted by Scott A. Brister of Andrews Kurth LLP of Austin Texas.
04/07/2014Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State of Texas.
02/10/2014Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.
12/18/2013Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of the State of Texas.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/30/2013Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Petition filed on behalf of the State of Texas.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
07/29/2013Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/25/2013Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of the State of Texas. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/28/2015Corrected Mandate Issued On July 20, 2015, our Court issued mandate referencing the wrong trial court information.  This mandate corrects the previous trial court number 857417 from County Court at Law #1, with case number 857472 from County Court at Law #3.
09/28/2015Call received Call received from petitioner attorney, Michael Murphy, regarding previous mandate issued.  Mandate lists incorrect trial court information.  Informed Mr. Murphy that a corrected mandate with the correct trial court information will be resent today.
08/20/2015Case Stored G02 Row 14 H-2
07/20/2015Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
07/01/2015Notice received Notice of Intent Not to File Motion for Rehearing Due to Settlement filed on behalf of Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.
06/25/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for extension of time is granted.  Motion for Rehearing of Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc. is due no later than July 6, 2015.
06/24/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Ten-Day Extension to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.
05/15/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Rehearing due June 25, 2015.
05/15/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.
05/05/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing is granted. Clear Channel Outdoor's Motion for Rehearing is due May 26, 2015. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored.
05/05/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Fifteen-Day Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing. On behalf of Respondent Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.
04/24/2015Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
04/24/2015Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; cause remanded to trial courtThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to the trial court. Chief Justice Hecht delivered the opinion of the Court.
(4/24/2015 12:53:30 PM) 13-0053.jmt.pdf, 130053.pdf
09/17/2014Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Michael P. Murphy; argued on behalf of respondents by Marie R. Yeates
09/16/2014Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.
08/18/2014Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.
08/18/2014Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Michael P. Murphy on behalf of the State of Texas.
07/31/2014Supplemental Letter Brief Supplemental Letter Brief filed on behalf of Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.
07/24/2014Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief filed on behalf of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center and Owners' Counsel of America.
06/13/2014Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argument[Note: This cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., September 17, 2014.]  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
05/16/2014Petition for Review disposedFiling granted[Note: The date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.]  
05/16/2014Petition for Review granted  
05/14/2014Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric M. Rubin is granted.
05/14/2014Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion for Pro Hac Vice of Eric M. Rubin is granted.
05/14/2014Pro hac vice motion filed Unopposed Motion in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric M. Rubin filed by Texas Attorney J. Allen Smith.
05/14/2014Pro hac vice motion filed Unopposed Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Eric M. Rubin, amicus attorney.
05/09/2014Electronic communication sent to Party Messaged Amicus Attorneys for Outdoor Advertising Association of America.  Requested bookmarks added to amicus brief, and pro hac vice motions for Mr. Rubin.
05/06/2014Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Outdoor Advertising Association of America.  Submitted by J. Allen Smith, Texas Bar No. 18616900, asmith@Settlepou.com, SETTLEPOU, 3333 Lee Parkway, Eighth Floor, Dallas, Texas 75219, (214) 520-3300
04/28/2014Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed Response to Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.
04/23/2014Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of the City of Fort Worth, Texas.  Submitted by CHRISTOPHER B. MOSLEY, Sr. Assistant City Attorneyj, State Bar No. 00789505, Chris.Mosley@fortworthtexas.gov, CITY OF FORT WORTH, TEXAS, 1000 Throckmorton Street, Fort Worth, Texas 76102, Tel: 817-392-7600
04/21/2014Amicus Curiae Brief received Amici Curiae Brief of City of Houston, Harris Cty.;  Tex. Municipal League; Tex. Assoc. of Counties; Tex. Conference of Urban Counties; Alamo, Ctrl. Tex., N. East Tex., and N. Tex. Reg. Mobility Auth.; and Scenic Tex., Inc.. Submitted by Scott A. Brister of Andrews Kurth LLP of Austin Texas.
04/07/2014Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State of Texas.
03/21/2014Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing granted2nd Motion to Extend Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. Reply Brief is due April 7, 2014. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED.
03/19/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to file Petitioner's Reply Brief. On behalf of State of Texas.
02/18/2014Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedReply brief due 03/24/14. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
02/14/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
02/10/2014Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.
12/19/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedResponse brief due 02/10/14; Reply brief due 02/25/14; FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
12/19/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.
12/18/2013Brief on the Merits Petitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of the State of Texas.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/05/2013Letter Filed Letter filed on behalf of the State of Texas regarding difficulties experienced with electronic filing.
11/20/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits is Granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Petitioner's brief is due December 20, 2013; Respondent's brief is due January 9, 2014; and Reply brief is due January 24, 2014.
11/19/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State of Texas.
10/18/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petitioner's brief is due November 20, 2013; Respondent's brief is due December 10, 2013; and Reply brief is due December 30, 2013.
10/17/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State of Texas.
10/17/2013Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance and Designation of Lead Counsel filed on behalf of Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.
10/01/2013Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
09/24/2013Record Requested in Petition for Review  
09/20/2013Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than 10/21/13; Response brief due 11/12/13; Reply brief due 11/27/13.
08/30/2013Reply to Response Reply to Petition filed on behalf of the State of Texas.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
08/02/2013MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedMotion to Extend Time to file Reply is granted. Petitioner's Reply is due August 30, 2013. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
08/02/2013Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to file Reply Supporting Petition for Review. On behalf of State of Texas.
07/29/2013Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/25/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Response is due July 31, 2013.
06/25/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.
05/31/2013Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than 7/1/13.
04/30/2013Case forwarded to Court  
03/25/2013Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of the State of Texas. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/19/2013Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Petition for Review is due March 25, 2013.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
02/19/2013Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
01/23/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for extension of time to file petition for review filed on behalf of the State of Texas has been granted. Petition due February 21, 2013.
01/23/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/20/2015Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 14 H-2
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.Amicus CuriaeMr. Bradley E. McLain
Eric Rubin
Mr. J. Allen Smith
State of TexasPetitionerMr. Daniel T. Hodge
Ms. Susan Desmarais Bonnen
Ms. Bonnie Cox Lockhart  
Mr. Jonathan F. Mitchell
Mr. Michael P. Murphy
Attorney General Greg W. Abbott
Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.RespondentMr. J. Allen Smith
Ms. Sydney N. Floyd
Ms. Marie R. Yeates
Mr. Richard L. Rothfelder
Mr. H. Dixon Montague
Mr. Michael Andrew Heidler
National Federation of Independent BusinessAmicus CuriaeMs. Kimberly S. Keller
Mr. John R. Hays Jr.
City of Fort Worth, TexasAmicus CuriaeMr. Christopher Bedford Mosley
City of HoustonAmicus CuriaeMr. Scott A. Brister
Outdoor Advertising Association of TexasAmicus Curiae 
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
462 SW3d 68, 09-27-12 
1st Court of Appeals 
Honorable Laura C. Higley 
Trial Court Information
County Civil Court at Law No 3 
Harris 
Honorable Linda Kathryn Storey 
857472 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site