Supreme Court

Case: 13-0043
01/18/2013
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
ROBERT KINNEY 
ANDREW HARRISON BARNES (A/K/A A. HARRISON BARNES, A.H. BARNES, ANDREW H. BARNES, HARRISON BARNES), BCG ATTORNEY SEARCH, INC., EMPLOYMENT CROSSING, INC. AND JD JOURNAL, INC. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/06/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al.
10/11/2013Reply brief filedPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Robert Kinney.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/01/2013Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letter of Texas Apartment Association, Inc., submitted by John Sepehri, 1011 San Jacinto Blvd., Suite 600, Austin, Texas 78701-1951.
09/26/2013Brief filedRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Andrew Barnes, et al.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
08/06/2013Brief filedPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Robert Kinney.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/20/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Texas Apartment Association submitted by Brian J. Levy Texas Bar No. 24067728, 1911 Maryland, Houston, Texas 77019, Telephone: (713) 876-2886, brianjlevy@gmail.com.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/20/2013Reply to Response to Petition filed PetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Robert Kinney.(HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/13/2013Response to Petition for Review filedRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Andrew Harrison Barnes, et al.(HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/06/2013Petition for Review filedPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Robert Kinney.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionRemarksDocument
10/09/2014Mandate issued  Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
10/03/2014Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. DeniedMotion to Stay Execution of Mandate denied
09/25/2014Reply to Response to MotionRespondent Reply in support of Motion to Stay Execution of Mandate Pending Disposition of Petition for Writ of Certiorari. On behalf of Andrew Harrison Barnes, et al.
09/24/2014Call receivedPetitioner From petitioner's office to inform the Court that they're going to efile a reply to resp's response to mo/stay mandate.
09/24/2014Response to Motion filedPetitioner Response to Respondent's Motion to Stay Mandate Pending Petition for Certiorari.
09/19/2014Motion to stay mandate filed.Respondent Motion to Stay Execution of Mandate Pending Disposition of Petition for Writ of Certiorari. On behalf of Andrew Harrison Barnes, et al.
08/29/2014Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record Issued 
08/29/2014Opinion issuedCauseCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; cause remanded to trial courtThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to the trial court. Justice Lehrmann delivered the  opinion of the Court.
(8/29/2014 1:44:23 PM) 13-0043.jmt.pdf, 130043.pdf
02/06/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al.
02/06/2014Pro hac vice motion disposedAmicus Curiae Filing grantedMotion in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David Greene granted.
02/06/2014Pro hac vice motion disposedAmicus Curiae Filing grantedMotion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David Greene granted.
02/06/2014Pro hac vice motion filedAmicus Curiae  Motion in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David A. Greene filed on behalf of Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al.
02/06/2014Pro hac vice motion filedAmicus Curiae  Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David A. Greene filed on behalf of Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al.
01/09/2014Oral argument   argued on behalf of petitioner by Martin J. Siegel; argued on behalf of respondents by Michael R. Parker & Anthony T. Riccardelli
01/03/2014Pro hac vice motion disposed** See RemarksFiling grantedUnopposed Motion in Support of Attorney Mr. Parker's Motion Pro Hac Vice granted
01/03/2014Pro hac vice motion disposed** See RemarksFiling grantedOut-state Attorney Michael Parker's Unopposed Motion for Admission Por Hac Vice granted.
01/03/2014Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedRespondent Oral Argument Submission Form on behalf of Andrew Harrison Barnes, et al. Submitted by Michael R. Parker of Harrison Barnes PLC of Malibu, California and Anthony T. Ricciardelli of Plano Texas.
01/02/2014Pro hac vice motion filedRespondent In-state Attorney Anthony Ricciardelli's Unopposed Motion in Support of Attorney Mr. Parker's Motion Pro Hac Vice. On behalf of Andrew Harrison Barnes, et al.
01/02/2014Pro hac vice motion filedRespondent Out-state Attorney Michael Parker's Unopposed Motion for Admission Por Hac Vice. On behalf of Andrew Harrison Barnes, et al.
01/02/2014Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedPetitioner Oral Argument Will Be Presented By: Martin J. Siegel, counsel for petitioner.
12/27/2013Notice of AppearanceRespondent Notice of Appearance - Anthony T. Ricciardelli will appear as co-counsel for respondents, Andrew Harrison Barnes, et al.
12/13/2013Case set for oral argumentIndicates filing of Petition for ReviewCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., January 9, 2014.  Time allotted to argue: 20/20 minutes.
12/13/2013Petition for Review disposed Filing granted 
12/13/2013Petition for Review granted   
10/11/2013Reply brief filedPetitioner Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Robert Kinney.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/01/2013Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus Curiae Letter of Texas Apartment Association, Inc., submitted by John Sepehri, 1011 San Jacinto Blvd., Suite 600, Austin, Texas 78701-1951.
09/26/2013Brief filedRespondent Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Andrew Barnes, et al.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
08/26/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.RespondentFiling grantedUnoppose Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Respondent's brief is due September 26, 2013; Reply brief is due October 11, 2013.
08/26/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief.Respondent Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Andrew Harrison Barnes, et al.
08/06/2013Brief filedPetitioner Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Robert Kinney.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/21/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.PetitionerFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Petitioner's Brief is due August 7, 2013.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING TO BE DISFAVORED.  Respondent's Brief is due August 27, 2013.  Reply Brief is due September 11, 2013.
06/21/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief.Petitioner Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief filed on behalf of Robert Kinney.
06/10/2013Case Record Filed Clerk of the Court of Appeals Electronic Appellate Record Received
06/10/2013Record Requested in Petition for Review  Record requested from the 3rd COA
06/07/2013Brief on the Merits RequestedIndicates filing of Petition for Review Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than 7/8/13; Response brief due 7/29/13; Reply brief due 8/13/13.
05/20/2013Certification (various) in case receivedAmicus Curiae  Corrected Certificate of Compliance filed on behalf of Robert Kinney.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/20/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus Brief of Texas Apartment Association submitted by Brian J. Levy Texas Bar No. 24067728, 1911 Maryland, Houston, Texas 77019, Telephone: (713) 876-2886, brianjlevy@gmail.com.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/20/2013Reply to Response to Petition filed Petitioner Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Robert Kinney.(HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/15/2013Designation of Lead Counsel Petitioner Letter designating Martin J. Siegel as lead counsel for petitioner Robert Kinney.
05/13/2013Response to Petition for Review filedRespondent Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Andrew Harrison Barnes, et al.(HARD COPIES REC'D)
04/12/2013Supreme Court of Texas Requested ResponseIndicates filing of Petition for Review Requested response to petition for review due no later than 5/13/13.
03/12/2013Case forwarded to Court   
02/06/2013Petition for Review filedPetitioner Petition for Review filed on behalf of Robert Kinney.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/25/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedPetitionerFiling grantedPetition is due February 6, 2013.
01/18/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filedPetitioner Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review. On behalf of Robert Kinney.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/09/2014StatusCase to be stored 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Apartment AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. John Sepehri
Mr. Brian J. Levy
Kinney, RobertPetitionerMr. Stewart Edmond Hoffer
Mr. Martin J. Siegel
Mr. Andrew J. Sarne
Mr. Greggory A. Teeter
Electronic Frontier FoundationAmicus CuriaeMr. Marc A. Fuller
Barnes, Andrew HarrisonRespondentMr. Anthony T. Ricciardelli  
Mr. Michael R. Parker
Ms. Eleanor Ruffner  
Mr Dale Lynn Roberts
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
___ SW3d ___, 11-21-12 
3rd Court of Appeals 
Honorable Melissa Young Goodwin 
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 1 
Travis 
Honorable J. David Phillips 
C-1-CV-10-004331 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site