Supreme Court

Case: 13-0006    
13-0006
01/03/2013
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
ZAHER EL-ALI 
THE STATE OF TEXAS 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/21/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Americans for Prosperity - Texas.
01/21/2014Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Zaher El-Ali.
12/12/2013Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of the State of Texas.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/25/2013Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Zaher El-Ali. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/19/2013Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Zaher El-Ali. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/27/2013Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of The State of  Texas. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/19/2013Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Zaher El-Ali.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/15/2014Case Stored Row 10 B-2
05/13/2014Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
03/28/2014Justice(s) concurring in the denial of petition Justice Boyd, joined by Justice Guzman, concurring in the denial of the petition
for review.
03/28/2014Justice(s) dissent to denial of petition Justice Willett, joined by Justice Lehrmann and Justice Devine, dissenting to the denial of the petition for review.
03/28/2014Petition for Review disposedDenied with Justice not sitting.(3/28/2014 5:01:56 PM) 130006c.pdf, 130006d.pdf
01/21/2014Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Americans for Prosperity - Texas.
01/21/2014Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Zaher El-Ali.
12/17/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Pet's Reply Brief due January 21, 2014.
12/17/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Zaher El-Ali.
12/12/2013Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of the State of Texas.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/07/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Resp's Brief is due December 12, 2013; Pet's Reply Brief is due December 27, 2013.
11/07/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondent’s Brief on the Merits. On behalf of the State of Texas.
10/25/2013Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Zaher El-Ali. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/09/2013Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
08/27/2013Record Requested in Petition for Review  
08/26/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Petitioner's Brief is due October 25, 2013.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.  Response Brief is due November 12, 2013.  Reply Brief is due November 27, 2013.
08/26/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Zaher El-Ali.
08/23/2013Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than 9/23/13; Response brief due 10/14/13; Reply brief due 10/29/13.
07/19/2013Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Zaher El-Ali. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/28/2013MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply to Response to Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Reply is due July 19, 2013.
06/28/2013Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Zaher El-Ali.
06/27/2013Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of The State of  Texas. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/28/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.  Response is due June 27, 2013.
05/28/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of State of Texas.
04/26/2013Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested Response to Petition for Review due no later than May 28, 2013.
03/26/2013Case forwarded to Court  
02/19/2013Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Zaher El-Ali.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
02/06/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion in support of Scott G. Bullock's application for pro hac vice admission has been granted.
02/06/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedScott G. Bullock's application for pro hac vice admission has been granted.
02/06/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Scott G. Bullock's Application for pro hac vice admission.
02/05/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion in support of Scott G. Bullock's application for pro hac vice admission.
01/07/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Petition for Review is due February 19, 2013.
01/03/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Zahar El-Ali.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/15/2014Case StoredCase stored.Row 10 B-2
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
El-Ali, ZaherPetitionerMr. Scott Bullock
Nathan M. Smith  
Mr. Matthew R. Miller
Mr. Michael Kenan Oldham
Mr. Scott G. Bullock
Americans for ProsperityAmicus CuriaeMichael E. Lovins  
State of TexasRespondentMs. Lisa Gail Porter  
Mr. John Robert Skrabanek
Mr. Donald W. Rogers Jr.
Suzanne L. Hanneman  
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
388 SW3d 890, 12-04-12 
14th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Jeffrey Vincent Brown 
Trial Court Information
269th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Ravi K. Sandill 
2009-52869 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site