Twelfth Court of Appeals

Case: 12-14-00034-CV    
12-14-00034-CV
01/30/2014
Condemnation
John Allen and Angela Allen 
Enbridge G & P (East Texas) L.P. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/21/2014Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
10/02/2014Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
06/17/2014Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/11/2016Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk 
04/08/2016Case stored 
04/08/2016Mandate issued 
03/29/2016Sent to publisher 
03/14/2016Petition for review was not filed 
02/16/2016Motion for rehearing was not filed 
01/29/2016Memorandum opinion issuedModified and Affirmed
06/16/2015Submitted 
06/08/2015Motion to postpone oral argument disposedoverruled in part and granting in part
06/02/2015Motion to postpone oral argument filed 
05/26/2015Set for submission on oral argument 
05/05/2015Set for submission on oral argument 
03/09/2015Set for submission on oral argument 
02/26/2015Letter filed 
02/12/2015Motion to postpone oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/12/2015Submission cancelled 
02/11/2015Motion to postpone oral argument filed 
11/21/2014Electronic reply brief filed 
10/15/2014Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/09/2014Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
10/03/2014Prescreened 
10/02/2014Case ready to be set 
10/02/2014Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
09/29/2014Appearance of counsel 
08/20/2014Electronic Motion for extension of time to file brief dispMotion or Writ Granted
08/18/2014Electronic Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/09/2014Electronic Motion for extension of time to file brief dispMotion or Writ Granted
07/02/2014Electronic Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/25/2014Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/17/2014Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/03/2014Electronic Motion for extension of time to file brief dispMotion or Writ Granted
05/23/2014Electronic Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/16/2014Electronic Motion for extension of time to file brief dispMotion or Writ Granted
04/15/2014Electronic Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/03/2014Internal memo 
03/26/2014Electronic Motion for extension of time to file brief dispMotion or Writ Granted
03/20/2014Electronic Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/18/2014Letter filed 
03/13/2014Record checked out 
03/13/2014Letter filed 
03/05/2014Letter filed 
03/05/2014Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
03/05/2014Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
02/18/2014Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/11/2014Confidential mediation questionnaire filed 
02/11/2014Docketing statement filed 
02/11/2014Telephone call received 
02/10/2014Confidential mediation questionnaire filed 
02/10/2014Notice of late record 
02/07/2014Fee paid 
01/31/2014Court packet sent to parties 
01/31/2014Fee requested 
01/30/2014Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk 
01/30/2014Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
12/31/2013Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
10/23/2013Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
10/03/2013Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/08/2016Case StoredCase stored
04/08/2022RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Allen, AngelaAppellantMr. Karl C. Hoppess  
Mr. Darrin Walker
Allen, JohnAppellantMr. Darrin Walker
Mr. Karl C. Hoppess  
Enbridge G & P (East Texas) L.P.AppelleeMr. Preston W. McGee
Mr. Stuart Hene  
Mr. J. Mitchell Beard
Ms. Julie P. Wright
Mr. Thomas H. Buchanan
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law 
Nacogdoches 
Honorable John A. Sinz 
CV1012363 
Gary G. Harris, CSR 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site