Supreme Court

Case: 12-1013
12/17/2012
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 
CHRISTOPHER ARTHEY AND DENISE ARTHEY 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/17/2013Reply brief filedPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
(Hard Copies Recieved)  
09/11/2013Brief filedRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Christopher Arthey and Denise Arthey.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/22/2013Brief filedPetitionerPetitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Schlumberger, Ltd. and Schlumberger Technology Corporation.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/04/2013Reply filedPetitionerReply to Petition filed on behalf of Schlumberger Technology Corp.
05/28/2013Response to Petition for Review filedRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Christopher Arthey, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/23/2013Petition for Review filedPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Schlumberger Technology Corporation.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionRemarksDocument
09/26/2014Letter Filed** See Remarks Letter from the Clerk's Office of the U.S. Supreme Court to notify this Court that a petition for a writ of certiorari was filed and placed on the docket Sept. 22, 2014 as No. 14-331.
08/07/2014Case Stored  G02 Row 14 A-3
08/01/2014Mandate issued  Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
06/20/2014Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record Issued 
06/20/2014Opinion issuedCauseCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed & judgment renderedThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and renders judgment. Chief Justice Hecht delivered the opinion of the Court. (Justice Green not sitting)
01/08/2014Oral argument   argued on behalf of petitioners by David W. Green; argued on behalf of respondents by Lanny D. Ray
12/30/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedRespondent Oral Argument will be presented by Lanny D. Ray on behalf of Christopher and Denise Arthey.
12/27/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedPetitioner Amended Oral Argument will be presented by David W. Green of Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer LLP on behalf of Schlumberger, Ltd. d/b/a Schlumberger Information Systems, et al.
12/13/2013Phone call from Clerk's OfficePetitioner Left Message for Mr. Green.  Oral Argument Submission form received without the $75.00 fee.  Form is required to be resubmitted via electronic filing.
12/13/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedPetitioner Oral Argument will be presented by Michael G. Terry on behalf of Schlumberger, Ltd.
11/22/2013Case set for oral argumentIndicates filing of Petition for ReviewCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., January 8, 2014.  Time allotted to argue: 20/20 minutes.
11/22/2013Petition for Review disposed Filing granted 
11/22/2013Petition for Review granted   
10/17/2013Reply brief filedPetitioner Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
(Hard Copies Recieved)  
09/20/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.PetitionerFiling grantedReply brief due 10/17/13. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
09/20/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief.Petitioner Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
09/11/2013Brief filedRespondent Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Christopher Arthey and Denise Arthey.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/31/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.RespondentFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. Resp's Brief is due 9-11-13; Pet's Reply Brief is 9-26-13.
07/31/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief.Respondent Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Christopher Arthey and Denise Arthey.
07/22/2013Brief filedPetitioner Petitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Schlumberger, Ltd. and Schlumberger Technology Corporation.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/03/2013Case Record Filed   Clerk's record (3 V), ant's br, ape's br, ant's reply br, misc. folder (mos. & corres.), opinion, dissenting opinion, judgment
06/24/2013Record Requested in Petition for Review   
06/21/2013Brief on the Merits RequestedIndicates filing of Petition for Review Briefs on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than 7/22/13; Response brief due 8/12/13; Reply brief due 8/27/13.
06/04/2013Reply filedPetitioner Reply to Petition filed on behalf of Schlumberger Technology Corp.
05/28/2013Response to Petition for Review filedRespondent Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Christopher Arthey, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
04/25/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedRespondentFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Response is due May 29, 2013.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
04/24/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseRespondent Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Christopher Arthey.  
03/29/2013Supreme Court of Texas Requested ResponseIndicates filing of Petition for Review Requested response to petition for review due no later than 4/29/13.
02/26/2013Case forwarded to Court   
02/22/2013Response to Petition for Review waivedRespondent Response waiver filed on behalf of Christopher and Denise Arthey.
01/23/2013Petition for Review filedPetitioner Petition for Review filed on behalf of Schlumberger Technology Corporation.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/21/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedPetitionerFiling grantedPetition is due January 23, 2013.
12/21/2012Phone call from Clerk's OfficeRespondent to Resps' Counsels, and spoke with Attorney Lenny Ray, to inquire whether respondent is opposed or not to petitioner's motion to extend time. Per Mr. Ray, he is opposed to the requested extension but won't be filing a response to it.
12/17/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filedPetitioner Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed on behalf of Schlumberger Ltd.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/07/2014Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 14 A-3
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Schlumberger, Ltd.PetitionerMr. David W. Green
Mr. Michael G. Terry
Arthey, ChristopherRespondentMr. Lanny D. Ray
Mr. James Hans Barcus
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
398 SW3d 831, 11-08-12 
13th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Dori Contreras Garza 
Trial Court Information
267th District Court 
Refugio 
Honorable Juergen Skipper Koetter 
2008-10-10823 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site