Supreme Court

Case: 12-0983
12/07/2012
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
MCALLEN HOSPITALS, L.P. D/B/A MCALLEN MEDICAL CENTER 
STATE FARM COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/19/2014Supplemental Brief filedPetitionerSupplemental Brief in Support of its Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of McAllen Hospitals, LP.
11/14/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Texas Hospital Association.
06/05/2013Brief filedPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of McAllen Hospitals.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
05/21/2013Brief filedRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State Farm Mutual Insurance Company of Texas. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
04/29/2013Brief filedPetitionerPetitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of McAllen Hospitals, L.P. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/06/2013Reply filedPetitionerPetitioner McAllen Hospitals, LP's Reply in Support of Petition for Review. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/19/2013Response to Petition for Review filedRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/07/2012Petition for Review filedPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of McAllen Hospitals, L.P. d/b/a McAllen Medical Center.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionRemarksDocument
07/16/2014Case Stored  G02 Row 29 A-3
06/27/2014Mandate issued  Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
05/16/2014Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record Issued 
05/16/2014Opinion issuedCauseCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; cause remanded to trial courtThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to the trial court. Justice Lehrmann delivered the opinion of the Court.
(5/16/2014 10:57:45 AM) 12-0983.jmt.pdf, 120983.pdf
03/19/2014Notice from Counsel of a change in addressPetitioner Change of address: Douglas Turek, State Bar No. 00792882, dturek@turekdevore.com, Jessica Guobadia, jguobadia@turekdevore.com, State Bar No. 24069840, Turek DeVore PC, 25227 Grogans Mill Road, Suite 100A, The Woodlands, TX 77380, (281)/296-6920.
03/19/2014Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner Supplemental Brief in Support of its Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of McAllen Hospitals, LP.
12/04/2013Oral argument   argued on behalf of petitioners by Douglas Turek; argued on behalf of respondent by Isidro O. Castanon
11/25/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedRespondent Oral Argument will be presented by Isidro O. Castanon on behalf of State Farm County Mut. Ins. Co.
11/19/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedPetitioner Oral Argument will be presented by Douglas Turek on behalf of McAllen Hospitals, L.P.
11/14/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Texas Hospital Association.
09/20/2013Case set for oral argumentIndicates filing of Petition for ReviewCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., December 4, 2013.  Time allotted to argue: 20/20 minutes.
09/20/2013Petition for Review disposed Filing granted 
09/20/2013Petition for Review granted   
06/05/2013Brief filedPetitioner Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of McAllen Hospitals.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
05/22/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.RespondentFiling grantedResponse brief due 05/21/13; Reply brief due 06/05/13; FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
05/21/2013Brief filedRespondent Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State Farm Mutual Insurance Company of Texas. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/21/2013Response to Motion filedPetitioner Response to Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief. On behalf of McAllen Hospitals, LP.
05/16/2013Phone call from Clerk's OfficePetitioner Attorney will inform whether they will e-file a response to the motion by 05/21/13.
05/15/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief.Respondent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas.
04/29/2013Brief filedPetitioner Petitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of McAllen Hospitals, L.P. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
04/22/2013Case Record Filed   Clerk's record (1V), reporter's record (1V), ant's br, appendix to ant's br, ape's br, ant's reply br, appendix to ant's reply br, amicuc curiae brief, misc. folder (mos. & corres.), judgment w/attached opinion (un blue-backed)
03/29/2013Record Requested in Petition for Review   
03/29/2013Brief on the Merits RequestedIndicates filing of Petition for Review Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than 4/29/13; Response brief due 5/20/13; Reply brief due 6/4/13.
03/06/2013Reply filedPetitioner Petitioner McAllen Hospitals, LP's Reply in Support of Petition for Review. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/19/2013Response to Petition for Review filedRespondent Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/18/2013Supreme Court of Texas Requested ResponseIndicates filing of Petition for Review Requested response to petition for review due no later than 2/19/13.
12/18/2012Case forwarded to Court   
12/14/2012Response to Petition for Review waivedRespondent Response Waiver filed on behalf of State Farm County Mut. Ins. Co.
12/07/2012Petition for Review filedPetitioner Petition for Review filed on behalf of McAllen Hospitals, L.P. d/b/a McAllen Medical Center.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/16/2014Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 29 A-3
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
McAllen Hospitals, L.P.PetitionerMr. Douglas D. Turek
Ms. Jessica Lea Guobadia  
Ms. Parul Dayaram Das
Texas Hospital AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. Charles W. Bailey
State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of TexasRespondentMs. Katherine Willis
Mr. Isidro O. Castanon
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
___ SW3d ___, 10-25-12 
13th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Georgina M. Benavides 
Trial Court Information
139th District Court 
Hidalgo 
Honorable Jose Roberto Flores 
C-2040-09-C-1 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site