Supreme Court

Case: 12-0937    
12-0937
11/21/2012
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
MEHRDAD MOAYEDI 
INTERSTATE 35/CHISAM ROAD, L.P. AND MALACHI DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/30/2014Motion for RehearingPetitioner's motion for rehearing of cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Mehrdad Moayedi.
11/12/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Robert H. Holmes.
10/23/2013Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Mehrdad Moayedi. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/26/2013Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Interstate 35/Chisam Rd., LP.
09/06/2013Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits is filed on behalf of Mehrdad Moayedi.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/07/2013Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petitin for Review. On behalf of Mehrdad Moayedi.
04/08/2013Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Interstate 35/Chisam Road, L.P., et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/21/2013Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter Brief of Larry Bob Showalter & Charles David Howard in support of petition for review. Submitted by Alexander N. Beard of Saunders Walsh & Beard PLLC of McKinney Texas.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/31/2013Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of Robert H. Holmes.
01/07/2013Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Mehrdad Moayedi. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/12/2014Case Stored G02 Row 14 B-1
08/22/2014Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
08/22/2014Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied 
07/31/2014Letter Filed Respondents, Interstate 35/Chisam Road, LP and Malachi Development Corporation, will not file a response unless requested.
07/30/2014Case forwarded to Court  
07/30/2014Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Mehrdad Moayedi.
06/25/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Motion for Rehearing is due July 30, 2014.
06/25/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Mehrdad Moayedi.
06/13/2014Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
06/13/2014Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment affirmedThe Court affirms the court of appeals' judgment. Justice Willett delivered the opinion of the Court.
(6/13/2014 1:33:15 PM) 12-0937.jmt.pdf, 120937.pdf
01/08/2014Oral argument  argued on behalf of petitioner by Dana Livingston; argued on behalf of respondents by F. Colin Durham, Jr.
12/31/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral argument submission form submitted by petitioner attorney Dana Livingston of Alexander Dubose Jefferson & Townsend LLP of Austin.
12/17/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by F. Colin Durham, Jr.
11/22/2013Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., January 8, 2014.  Time allotted to argue: 20/20 minutes.
11/22/2013Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
11/22/2013Petition for Review granted  
11/12/2013Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Robert H. Holmes.
10/23/2013Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Mehrdad Moayedi. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/09/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Reply Brief is due October 23, 2013.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
10/08/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief filed on behalf of Mehrdad Moayedi.
09/26/2013Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Interstate 35/Chisam Rd., LP.
09/06/2013Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is filed on behalf of Mehrdad Moayedi.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/28/2013Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
07/24/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of time is granted.  Petitioner's Brief is due September 6, 2013.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED.  Response Brief is due September 26, 2013.  Reply Brief is due October 11, 2013.
07/24/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Mehrdad Moayedi.
06/28/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petitioner's brief is due August 7, 2013; Respondent's brief is due August 27, 2013; and Reply brief is due September 11, 2013.
06/28/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Mehrdad Moayedi.
06/10/2013Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 5th COA
06/07/2013Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than 7/8/13; Response brief due 7/29/13; Reply brief due 8/13/13.
05/07/2013Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petitin for Review. On behalf of Mehrdad Moayedi.
04/18/2013MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply is granted. Reply is due May 7, 2013. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
04/18/2013Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply to Response. On behalf of Mehrad Moayedi.
04/08/2013Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Interstate 35/Chisam Road, L.P., et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/27/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedResponse due 04/08/13; FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
03/25/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response filed on behalf of Interstate 35/Chisam Road, L.P. and Malachi Development Corporation.
02/22/2013Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than 3/25/13.
02/21/2013Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter Brief of Larry Bob Showalter & Charles David Howard in support of petition for review. Submitted by Alexander N. Beard of Saunders Walsh & Beard PLLC of McKinney Texas.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/31/2013Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of Robert H. Holmes.
01/22/2013Case forwarded to Court  
01/17/2013Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Interstate 35/Chisam Road, LP, et al.
01/07/2013Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Mehrdad Moayedi. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/21/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Petition for Review is due January 7, 2012.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
11/21/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Mehrdad Moayedi.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
09/12/2014Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 14 B-1
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Showalter, Larry BobAmicus CuriaeMr. Alexander N. Beard
Interstate 35/Chisam Rd. L.P.RespondentMr. Fred Colin Durham
Holmes, Robert H.Amicus CuriaeMr. Robert H. Holmes  
Moayedi, MehrdadPetitionerMr. Jonathan J. Cunningham
Ms. Dana Livingston
Mr. C. Gregory Shamoun
Court of Appeals Information:
Rev & Ren/Pt and Rem/Pt 
___ SW3d ___, 08-02-12 
5th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Douglas S. Lang 
Trial Court Information
14th District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Eric V. Moye 
09-12666-A 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site