Supreme Court

Case: 12-0920    
12-0920
11/14/2012
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
CHARLES G. HOOKS, III, ET AL. 
SAMSON LONE STAR, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, N/K/A SAMSON LONE STAR LLC 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/27/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of Jamie Nielson.
04/22/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed in support of Petitioners' Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of The Texas Oil and Gas Association.
04/16/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of John G. Soule.
03/16/2015Motion for RehearingRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Samson Lone Star, L.P.
09/29/2014Post submission brief filedRespondentResponse Letter to Charles Hooks' Post Submission Letter. On behalf of Samson Lone Star.
09/25/2014Post submission brief filedRespondentRespondent's Post Submission Letter. On behalf of Samson Lone Star.
09/25/2014Post submission brief filedPetitionerPetitioner's post-submission letter filed on behalf of  Charles Hooks, et al.
09/16/2014Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerPetitioner's Oral Argument Handout filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks, III.
01/13/2014Letter brief PetitionerSur-reply letter filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks, et al.
01/10/2014Letter brief RespondentReply Letter Brief filed on behalf of Samson Lone Star, LP.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/06/2014Reply to Amicus Curiae BriefPetitionerReply to Briefs of Amici filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks, III, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/06/2013Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks, III, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/06/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Independent Petroleum Association of America.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/06/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of the Texas Alliance of Energy Producers in opposition to the Petition for Review.  Submitted by Gloria Leal , 3600C Las Colinas, Austin, TX  78731, Phone (512) 426-1568  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/03/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of The Texas Oil & Gas Association submitted by Pamela Baron, State Bar No. 01797100, Post Office Box 5573, Austin, Texas 78763, 512/479-8480. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/04/2013Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Samson Lone Star, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/24/2013Fully hyperlinked brief filedPetitionerHYPERLINKED  Corrected Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks, III.
09/23/2013Corrected BriefPetitionerCorrected Petitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks, III, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/03/2013Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks, III, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/30/2013Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondentResponse to Amicus Briefs of Texas Land & Mineral Association and Cardwell, Hart & Bennett, LLP.  On behalf of respondent, Samson Lone Star. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/28/2013Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks III, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/23/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Texas Land and Mineral Owerners' Association.  Submitted by John B. McFarland and Mary A. Keeny, Graves, Dougherty, Hearon & Moody. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/10/2013Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondentResponse to Amicus Brief filed on behalf Samson Lone Star, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/10/2013Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition filed on behalf Samson Lone Star, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/07/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Cardwell, Hart & Bennett, LLP's Amicus Brief in support of Petition for Review. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/19/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of the Bordages in Support of Petition for Review. Submitted by Patton G. Lochridge of McGinnis Lochridge & Kilgore LLP of Austin, Texas.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
01/31/2013Fully hyperlinked brief filedPetitionerHYPERLINKED version of Petition for Review filed on Jan 25, 2013. On behalf of Charles G. Hooks, III, et al.
01/25/2013Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks, III, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/07/2015Case Stored G02 Row 14 E-4
05/01/2015Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
05/01/2015Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied 
04/27/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of Jamie Nielson.
04/22/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed in support of Petitioners' Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of The Texas Oil and Gas Association.
04/16/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of John G. Soule.
03/16/2015Case forwarded to Court  
03/16/2015Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Samson Lone Star, L.P.
02/17/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedRespondent's Motion for Extension of Time to file Rehearing is granted. The Motion for Rehearing is due March 16, 2015. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored.
02/17/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Motion for Rehearing. On behalf of Samson Exploration, LLC.
02/17/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedPetitioner's Motion for Extension of Time to file Rehearing is granted. The Motion for Rehearing is due March 16, 2015. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored.
02/17/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners' Motion for Rehearing. On behalf of Charles G. Hooks, III, et al.
01/30/2015Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
01/30/2015Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment affirm and reverse in part; remand to court of appealsThe Court affirms in part and reverses in part the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to that court.  Justice Devine delivered the opinion of the Court.
(1/30/2015 4:10:09 PM) 12-0920.jmt.pdf, 120920.pdf
09/29/2014Post submission brief filed Response Letter to Charles Hooks' Post Submission Letter. On behalf of Samson Lone Star.
09/25/2014Post submission brief filed Respondent's Post Submission Letter. On behalf of Samson Lone Star.
09/25/2014Post submission brief filed Petitioner's post-submission letter filed on behalf of  Charles Hooks, et al.
09/17/2014Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioners by Shannon H. Ratliff; argued on behalf of respondents by Cynthia Keely Timms
09/16/2014Exhibits in case/cause filed Petitioner's Oral Argument Handout filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks, III.
08/13/2014Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Cynthia Keely Timms on behalf of Respondent Samson Lone Star.
08/12/2014Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Arugment will be presented by Shannon H. Ratliff on behalf of Charles G. Hooks, III.
06/13/2014Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argument[Note: This cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., September 17, 2014.]  Time allotted to argue: 20/20 minutes
05/02/2014Petition for Review disposedFiling granted[Note: The date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.]
05/02/2014Petition for Review granted  
04/03/2014Address Change  The Houston office of McGinnis Lochridge moved to new location on March 31, 2014.  The new address: 711 Louisiana St, Ste, 1600  Houston, TX 77002
01/13/2014Letter brief  Sur-reply letter filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks, et al.
01/10/2014Letter brief  Reply Letter Brief filed on behalf of Samson Lone Star, LP.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/06/2014Reply to Amicus Curiae Brief Reply to Briefs of Amici filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks, III, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/06/2014Letter Filed Letter filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks, III, et al.
12/31/2013Phone call from Clerk's Office To Ms. Gloria Leal in re:  submitting 2 hard bound courtesy copies of amicus efiled on 12/6/13.
12/20/2013Letter Filed Letter filed on behalf of Samson Lone Star, Limited Partnership, et al.
12/06/2013Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks, III, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/06/2013Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Independent Petroleum Association of America.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/06/2013Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of the Texas Alliance of Energy Producers in opposition to the Petition for Review.  Submitted by Gloria Leal , 3600C Las Colinas, Austin, TX  78731, Phone (512) 426-1568  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/03/2013Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of The Texas Oil & Gas Association submitted by Pamela Baron, State Bar No. 01797100, Post Office Box 5573, Austin, Texas 78763, 512/479-8480. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/12/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Reply brief is due December 6, 2013.
11/12/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks, III, et al.
11/04/2013Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Samson Lone Star, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/24/2013Fully hyperlinked brief filed HYPERLINKED  Corrected Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks, III.
09/23/2013Corrected Brief Corrected Petitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks, III, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/11/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Samson Exploration, LLC has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response Brief due November 4, 2013; Reply Brief due November 19, 2013.
09/11/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Samson Exploration, LLC.
09/03/2013Brief on the Merits Petitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks, III, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/01/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Petitioner's Brief is due September 13, 2013.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED.  Response Brief is due October 3, 2013.  Reply Brief is due October 18, 2013.
08/01/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Charles Hooks, et al.
07/18/2013Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record Received
07/01/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedPetitioner brief due 08/14/13; Response brief due 09/03/13; Reply brief due 09/18/13; FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
07/01/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Petitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks, III, et al.
06/14/2013Record Requested in Petition for Review  
06/14/2013Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than 7/15/13; Response brief due 8/5/13; Reply brief due 8/20/13.
05/30/2013Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed Response to Amicus Briefs of Texas Land & Mineral Association and Cardwell, Hart & Bennett, LLP.  On behalf of respondent, Samson Lone Star. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/30/2013Address Change  Address Change for Dick Watt:  dwatt@wattbeckworth.com.  Filed on behalf of Samson Lone Star.
05/28/2013Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks III, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/23/2013Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Texas Land and Mineral Owerners' Association.  Submitted by John B. McFarland and Mary A. Keeny, Graves, Dougherty, Hearon & Moody. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/17/2013Call received Call received to inform the Court that a reply will be filed by May 28, 2013.
05/10/2013Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed Response to Amicus Brief filed on behalf Samson Lone Star, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/10/2013Response to Petition Response to Petition filed on behalf Samson Lone Star, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/26/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Response is due May 15, 2013.
03/25/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Samson.
03/15/2013Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Response to petition for review due no later than 4/15/13.
03/07/2013Amicus Curiae Brief received Cardwell, Hart & Bennett, LLP's Amicus Brief in support of Petition for Review. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/21/2013Letter Filed If the Court requests a formal response to the Hooks Petition for Review, then, at that time, Samson will respond to the "amicus" brief.
02/19/2013Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of the Bordages in Support of Petition for Review. Submitted by Patton G. Lochridge of McGinnis Lochridge & Kilgore LLP of Austin, Texas.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
02/12/2013Case forwarded to Court  
02/08/2013Response Waiver filed Response waiver filed on behalf of Samson Lone Star Limited Partnership.
01/31/2013Fully hyperlinked brief filed HYPERLINKED version of Petition for Review filed on Jan 25, 2013. On behalf of Charles G. Hooks, III, et al.
01/25/2013Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks, III, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/21/2012Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling granted2nd Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition is granted. Petition is due January 25, 2013.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
12/19/2012Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks III, et al.
11/15/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition due 12/26/12.
11/14/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed motion for exension of time to file petition for review filed on behalf of Charles G. Hooks III, et. al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/07/2015Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 14 E-4
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The Texas Alliance of Energy ProducersAmicus CuriaeMs. Gloria Leal
Independent Petroleum Association of AmericaAmicus CuriaeMr. Craig T. Enoch
Cardwell, Hart & Bennett, LLPAmicus CuriaeMr. Jeffery L. Hart
Mr. J. Bruce Bennett
Soule, John G.Amicus CuriaeMr. John G. Soule
Bordages, Jr., Joe A.Amicus CuriaeMr. Patton G. Lochridge
The Texas Oil and Gas AssociationAmicus CuriaeMs. Pamela Stanton Baron
Hooks, III, Charles G.PetitionerMr. Paul F. Simpson
Mr. Dale Wainwright  
Mr. Patton G. Lochridge
Mr. J. Derrick Price
Mr. Shannon H. Ratliff
Ms. Erin H. Huber
Mr. David M. Gunn
Ms. Marla Diane Broaddus
Texas Land and Mineral Owners' AssociationAmicus CuriaeMs. Mary A. Keeney
Mr. John B. McFarland
Samson Lone Star LLCRespondentMs. Cynthia Keely Timms
Mr. Michael V. Powell
Mr. J. Matthew Marchak
Mr. Dick Watt
Mr. M. C. Carrington
Nielson, JamieAmicus CuriaeMr. Jamie Nielson
Court of Appeals Information:
Aff-Mod/Pt,Rev & Rem/Pt  
389 SW3d 409, 05-31-12 
1st Court of Appeals 
Honorable Evelyn Keyes 
Trial Court Information
60th District Court 
Jefferson 
Honorable Gary Sanderson 
Bl73008-B 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site