Supreme Court

Case: 12-0905    
12-0905
11/07/2012
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
ENVIRONMENTAL PROCESSING SYSTEMS, L.C. 
FPL FARMING LTD. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/09/2015Motion for Rehearing for pet #2 Respondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedCross-Petitioner FPL Farming Ltd.'s Motion for Rehearing.
01/02/2014Letter brief Event related to subsequent petition filed in case.Letter brief filed on behalf of FPL Farming, Ltd., submitted by Claudia Wilson Frost, DLA Piper, 1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 2800, Houston, TX  77002-5005, Phone (713) 425-8450, Fax (713) 300-6050. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/02/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Brief of Amicus Curiae filed on behalf of Texas Farm Bureau, submitted by Andy McSwain, Fulbright Winniford, P.C., P.O. Box 445, Waco, TX  76703-0445.  Phone (254) 776-6000, Fax (254) 776-8555.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/24/2013Supplement to Amicus CuriaeReceived (instead of filed)Supplemental Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Texas Oil and Gas Association.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/18/2013Reply BriefEvent related to first petition filed in case.Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Environmental Processing Systems, LC. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/18/2013Reply BriefEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Reply Brief on the Merits in support of Cross-Petition for Review. On behalf of FPL Farming Ltd.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/18/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Brief of Amici Curiae the Texas Chemical Council and the Underground Injection Technology Council in Support of Petitioner #1, EPS. Submitted by Jay L. Krystinik of Bryan Cave LLP of Dallas Texas.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/02/2013Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Environmental Processing Systems, L.C.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/02/2013Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of FPL Farming Ltd.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/03/2013Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondentResponse to Amicus Brief filed on behalf of FPL Farming Ltd.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
07/03/2013Brief on the MeritsEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of FPL Farming Ltd.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
07/03/2013Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Environmental Processing Systems.(HARD COPIES REC'D)
04/10/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Association of Energy Service Companies, submitted by Gardere Wynne Sewell, Ms. Leslie Ritchie Robnett, 600 Congress Avenue, Suite 3000, Austin, TX  78701, Phone (512) 542-7100.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/20/2013Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondentResponse to Amicus brief filed on behalf of FPL Farming, Ltd. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/20/2013Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Cross-Petition for Review filed on behalf of FPL Farming Ltd. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/06/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae Amicus Brief in Support of Petitioner EPS filed on behalf of The Texas Council and The Underground Injection Technology Council.  (HARD COPIES REC"D)
03/06/2013Response to Petition Response to Cross-Petition (Incorporated with Reply in Support of Petition for Review) filed on behalf of  Environmental Processing Systems, L.C. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/06/2013Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review (Incorporated with Response to Cross-Petition) filed on behalf of  Environmental Processing Systems, L.C. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/18/2013Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Environmental Processing's Petition for Review. On behalf of FPL Farming Ltd.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/18/2013Petition for Review #2PetitionerCross-Petition for Review filed on behalf of FPL Farming Ltd.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/07/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Texas Oil and Gas Association, submitted by Baker Botts L.L.P., Ms. Samara L. Kline, 2001 Ross Avenue,Suite 600, Dallas, TX  75201, Phone (214) 953-6825. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/19/2012Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for review filed by Craig T. Enoch on behalf of Environmental Processing Systems, L.C. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/13/2015Case Stored G02 Row 14 F-2 (5 vols)
05/01/2015Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
05/01/2015Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied 
03/09/2015Case forwarded to Court  
03/09/2015Motion for Rehearing for pet #2  Cross-Petitioner FPL Farming Ltd.'s Motion for Rehearing.
02/12/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of FPL Farming Ltd. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Motion for Rehearing due March 9, 2015.
02/12/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of FPL Farming Ltd.
02/06/2015Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
02/06/2015Opinion issuedIssued 
02/06/2015Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed & judgment renderedThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and renders judgment.  Justice Green delivered the opinion of the Court.
01/07/2014Oral argument  argued on behalf of petitioner/cross-respondent by Craig Enoch; argued on behalf of respondent/cross-petitioner by Claudia Wilson Frost
01/07/2014Oral argument  argued on behalf of petitioner/cross-respondent by Craig Enoch; argued on behalf of respondent/cross-petitioner by Claudia Wilson Frost
01/02/2014Letter brief  Letter brief filed on behalf of FPL Farming, Ltd., submitted by Claudia Wilson Frost, DLA Piper, 1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 2800, Houston, TX  77002-5005, Phone (713) 425-8450, Fax (713) 300-6050. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/02/2014Amicus Curiae Brief received Brief of Amicus Curiae filed on behalf of Texas Farm Bureau, submitted by Andy McSwain, Fulbright Winniford, P.C., P.O. Box 445, Waco, TX  76703-0445.  Phone (254) 776-6000, Fax (254) 776-8555.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/23/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral argument submission form submitted by petitioner attorneys Craig Enoch and Melissa Lorber of Enoch Kever PLLC of Austin, TX
12/13/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Claudia Wilson Frost on behalf of FPL Farming Ltd.
11/22/2013Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., January 7, 2014.  Time allotted to argue: 20/20 minutes.
11/22/2013Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
11/22/2013Petition for Review granted  
11/22/2013Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., January 7, 2014.  Time alloted to argue: 20/20 minutes.
11/22/2013Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
11/22/2013Petition for Review granted  
09/24/2013Supplement to Amicus Curiae Supplemental Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Texas Oil and Gas Association.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/18/2013Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Environmental Processing Systems, LC. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/18/2013Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits in support of Cross-Petition for Review. On behalf of FPL Farming Ltd.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/18/2013Amicus Curiae Brief received Brief of Amici Curiae the Texas Chemical Council and the Underground Injection Technology Council in Support of Petitioner #1, EPS. Submitted by Jay L. Krystinik of Bryan Cave LLP of Dallas Texas.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/09/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner 2's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of FPL Farming Ltd. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply Brief due September 18, 2013.
08/09/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of time to file Petitioners Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Environmental Processing Systems, L.C. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply Brief due September 18, 2013.
08/08/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner 2's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of FPL Farming Ltd.
08/08/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Motion for Extension of time to file Petitioners Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Environmental Processing Systems, L.C.
08/02/2013Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Environmental Processing Systems, L.C.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/02/2013Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of FPL Farming Ltd.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/17/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Cross-Petitioner FPL Farming, Ltd. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response Brief due August 2, 2013; Reply Brief due August 19, 2013.
07/17/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Cross-Petitioner FPL Farming, Ltd.
07/17/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Environmental Processing Systems, L.C. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response Brief due August 2, 2013; Reply Brief due August 19, 2013.
07/17/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Environmental Processing Systems, L.C.
07/03/2013Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed Response to Amicus Brief filed on behalf of FPL Farming Ltd.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
07/03/2013Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of FPL Farming Ltd.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
07/03/2013Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Environmental Processing Systems.(HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/24/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedPetitioner brief due 07/03/13; Response brief due 07/23/13; Reply brief due 08/07/13; FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
05/24/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Petitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Environmental Processing Systems, L.C. and FPL Farming Ltd.
05/08/2013Case Record Filed  Clerk's record (1V), supp clk's record (1V), reporter's record (19 V - V13-19 labeled as EXHIBITS), ant's br, ant's supp br, ape's br, ant's reply br, ape's (EPS) mo/re, amicus briefs (2 - The Underground Injection Technology Council & Texas Oil & Gas Assoc.), ant's letter brief of 7/3/12 (2), ant's letter br of 3/21/12, ant's letter br of 2/13/12, amicus brief of 5/24/12, ant's reply br of 5/24/12, opinion & judgment (non-blue backed)
05/03/2013Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 9th COA
05/03/2013Brief on the Merits Requested Petitioner brief due 06/03/13; Response brief due 06/24/13; Reply brief due 07/09/13.
04/10/2013Amicus Curiae Brief received Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Association of Energy Service Companies, submitted by Gardere Wynne Sewell, Ms. Leslie Ritchie Robnett, 600 Congress Avenue, Suite 3000, Austin, TX  78701, Phone (512) 542-7100.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/20/2013Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed Response to Amicus brief filed on behalf of FPL Farming, Ltd. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/20/2013Reply to Response Reply in Support of Cross-Petition for Review filed on behalf of FPL Farming Ltd. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/12/2013Case forwarded to Court  
03/12/2013Case forwarded to Court  
03/06/2013Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief in Support of Petitioner EPS filed on behalf of The Texas Council and The Underground Injection Technology Council.  (HARD COPIES REC"D)
03/06/2013Response to Petition Response to Cross-Petition (Incorporated with Reply in Support of Petition for Review) filed on behalf of  Environmental Processing Systems, L.C. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/06/2013Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review (Incorporated with Response to Cross-Petition) filed on behalf of  Environmental Processing Systems, L.C. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/06/2013Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedMotion to file Response and Reply as a Combined Brief is granted.  Combined Brief is due March 6, 2013.
02/06/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Combined Response and Reply is granted.  Combined Brief is due March 6, 2013.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
02/01/2013Miscellaneous Motion Unopposed Motion for Leave to file Combined Brief INCORPORATED WITH Motion for Extension of Time to file Response and Reply .  Filed on behalf of Environmental Processing Systems, Inc.
02/01/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response and Reply INCORPORATED WITH Motion for Leave to file Combined Brief.  Filed on behalf of Environmental Processing Systems, Inc.
01/18/2013Response to Petition Response to Environmental Processing's Petition for Review. On behalf of FPL Farming Ltd.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/18/2013Petition for Review #2 Cross-Petition for Review filed on behalf of FPL Farming Ltd.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/07/2013Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Texas Oil and Gas Association, submitted by Baker Botts L.L.P., Ms. Samara L. Kline, 2001 Ross Avenue,Suite 600, Dallas, TX  75201, Phone (214) 953-6825. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/19/2012Petition for Review Petition for review filed by Craig T. Enoch on behalf of Environmental Processing Systems, L.C. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/13/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition is due December 19, 2012.
11/13/2012Letter Filed Letter to inform the Court that FPL Farming withdraws its opposition to EPS's request to extend the deadline to file its petition.
11/12/2012Response to Motion filed Response to Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition. On behalf of FPL Farming Ltd.
11/09/2012Phone call from Clerk's Office to Mr. Richart to inquire whether he is going to file a written response to petitioner's motion to extend time or not. He said that he will call back to let us know on Monday, Nov. 12.
11/07/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review. On behalf of Environmental Processing Systems, L.C.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/13/2015Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 14 F-2 (5 vols)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Association of Energy Service CompaniesAmicus CuriaeMr. Geoffrey H. Bracken
Mr. Peter Scaff
Mr. Mark A Mayfield
Ms. Leslie Ritchie Robnett
Environmental Processing Systems, L.C.PetitionerMr. Craig T. Enoch
Ms. Melissa A. Lorber
Mr. Richard G. Baker
The Texas Chemical CouncilAmicus CuriaeMr. Jay Lloyd Krystinik
Robert F. Van Voorhees
Mr. Thomas J. Adair  
Ms. Christina T. Wisdom  
Texas Farm BureauAmicus CuriaeMr. Andy McSwain
FPL Farming Ltd.RespondentMr. C. B. Stratton
Ms. Claudia Wilson Frost
Mr. Christopher Jene Richart
Mr. Hutson Brit Smelley
Honorable Justin Brett Busby
Mr. Paul L. Mitchell
Texas Oil and Gas AssociationAmicus CuriaeMs. Samara L. Kline
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
383 SW3d 274, 09-13-12 
9th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Hollis Horton  
Trial Court Information
75th District Court 
Liberty 
Honorable Vann Culp 
CV71974 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site