Supreme Court

Case: 12-0843    
12-0843
10/15/2012
Petition for Review/Cause under Tex. R. App. P. 59.1
RIO GRANDE VALLEY VEIN CLINIC, P.A., D/B/A RGV VEIN LASER & AESTHETIC CLINIC 
YVETTE GUERRERO 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/14/2013Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Rio Grande Valley Vein Clinic, PA. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
04/29/2013Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Yvette Guerrero.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/25/2013Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Rio Grande Valley Vein Clinic, P.A. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/20/2013Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Rio Grande Valley Vein Clinic, P.A., d/b/a RGV Vein Laser & Aesthetic Clinic.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/22/2013Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Yvette Guerrero.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/15/2012Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Rio Grande Valley Vein Clinic, P.A.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/11/2014Case Stored G02 Row 29 C-3
06/06/2014Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
04/25/2014Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
04/25/2014Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; cause remanded to trial courtPursuant to Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 59.1, after granting the petition for review and without hearing oral argument, the Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to the trial court.
(4/25/2014 2:28:37 PM) 120843.pdf, 12-0843.jmt.pdf
04/25/2014Petition for Review disposedPetition granted pursuant to TRAP 59.1 
04/25/2014Petition for Review granted under TRAP 59.1  
05/14/2013Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Rio Grande Valley Vein Clinic, PA. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
04/29/2013Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Yvette Guerrero.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
04/11/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits is Granted.  Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.  Respondent's brief is due April 29, 2013.  Reply brief is due May 14, 2013.
04/11/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Yvette Guerrero.
03/25/2013Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Rio Grande Valley Vein Clinic, P.A. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/21/2013Case Record Filed  Clerk's record (1 Vol.) supp clk's record (1 Vol.), reporter's record (1 Vol.), ant's br, ape's br, ant's reply br, misc. folder (mos. & corres.), opinion &  judgment (non-blue backed)
02/25/2013Record Requested in Petition for Review  
02/22/2013Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested: Petitioner's brief due no later than 3/25/13; Response brief due 4/15/13; Reply brief due 4/30/13.
02/20/2013Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Rio Grande Valley Vein Clinic, P.A., d/b/a RGV Vein Laser & Aesthetic Clinic.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/06/2013MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply filed on behalf of Rio Grande Valley Vein Clinic, P.A. d/b/a RGV Vein Laser & Aesthetic Clinic has been granted. Reply due February 20, 2013.
02/06/2013Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply filed on behalf of Rio Grande Valley Vein Clinic, P.A. d/b/a RGV Vein Laser & Aesthetic Clinic.
01/22/2013Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Yvette Guerrero.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/21/2012Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response  
11/20/2012Case forwarded to Court  
10/15/2012Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Rio Grande Valley Vein Clinic, P.A.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/11/2014Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 29 C-3
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Guerrero, YvetteRespondentMr. Gilberto Hinojosa
Mr. Carlos Escobar
Rio Grande Valley Vein Clinic, P.A.PetitionerMs. Diana L. Faust
Mr. R. Brent Cooper  
Ms. Criselda Palacios  
Mr. Steven M. Gonzalez
Mr. Kyle M. Burke  
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
___ SW3d ___, 08-30-12 
13th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Georgina M. Benavides 
Trial Court Information
138th District Court 
Cameron 
Honorable John Keith Nelson 
2010 -DCL- 5830 -B 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site