Supreme Court

Case: 12-0815
10/08/2012
Multidistrict Litigation
IN RE HEAVY EQUIPMENT APPRAISAL LITIGATION 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/10/2012Multidistrict Litigation Reply filedMovantReply in Support of Motion for Transfer filed on behalf of EES Leasing, LLC, et al.
12/03/2012Multidistrict Litigation Reply filedMovantLessors' Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer filed by movant attorney Renn G. Neilson
11/30/2012Multidistrict Litigation Filing RespondentGalveston Central Appraisal District's Surreply filed by attorney Anthony Brown
11/29/2012MDL Response to Motion for TransferRespondentResponse to Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of Starr County District by H.P. Guerra, III
11/20/2012Multidistrict Litigation Reply filedPetitionerLessors' Consolidated Reply in Support of Motion for Transfer and Amended Appendix A.
11/13/2012MDL Response to Motion for TransferRespondentResponse to Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of Austin Appraisal District, et al.
11/07/2012MDL Response filed RespondentResponse to Motion to Transfer on behalf of Limestone County Appraisal District by attorney Charles Buenger
10/29/2012MDL Response to Motion for TransferRespondentResponse to Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of Anderson County Appraisal District, et al.
10/29/2012MDL Response to Motion for TransferRespondentResponse to Motion to Transfer by Respondents Bee County Appraisal District, Cooke County Appraisal District, Fayette County Appraisal District, Frio Co. Appraisal District, Goliad Co. Appraisal District, Jim Hogg Co. Appraisal District, Matagorda Co. Appraisal District, Refugio Co. Appraisal District, Shelby Co. District filed by attorney Leonard F. Green
10/29/2012MDL Response to Motion for TransferRespondentResponse to Motion to Transfer submitted by Clay County Appraisal District;
Duval County Appraisal District; Lavaca County Central Appraisal District; Panola County Appraisal District; Polk County Appraisal District; Rusk County Appraisal District; Waller County Appraisal District; and Wood County Appraisal District
10/29/2012MDL Response to Motion for TransferRespondentResponse to Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of Galveston Central Appraisal District.
10/26/2012MDL Response to Motion for TransferRespondentResponse to Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of Brown County Appraisal District, et al. by attorney Kirk Swinney
10/08/2012Multidistrcit Litigation Motion to Transfer filedMovantMotion for Transfer submitted by EES Leasing LLC; EXLP Leasing LLC; USAC Leasing, LLC; Midcon Compression, LLC; Enerven Compression Services, LLC; Valerus Compression Services, LP; and Valerus Compression Services Management, LLC
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionRemarksDocument
02/14/2013Opinion issued by Multidistrict Litigation Panel Issued 
02/14/2013Multidistrict Litigation Motion to Transfer disposed Denied 
12/10/2012Multidistrict Litigation Reply filedMovant Reply in Support of Motion for Transfer filed on behalf of EES Leasing, LLC, et al.
12/04/2012Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. Filing grantedGalveston Central Appraisal District's Motion for Leave to File Surreply Brief granted
12/03/2012Multidistrict Litigation Reply filedMovant Lessors' Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer filed by movant attorney Renn G. Neilson
11/30/2012Multidistrict Litigation Filing Respondent Galveston Central Appraisal District's Surreply filed by attorney Anthony Brown
11/30/2012Multidistrict Litigation Motion FiledRespondent Galveston Central Appraisal District's Motion for Leave to File Surreply Brief filed by attorney Anthony P. Brown
11/29/2012MDL Response to Motion for TransferRespondent Response to Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of Starr County District by H.P. Guerra, III
11/20/2012Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. Filing grantedLessors' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Austin County Group's Response granted.  Reply due 12/3/12.
11/20/2012Multidistrict Litigation Reply filedPetitioner Lessors' Consolidated Reply in Support of Motion for Transfer and Amended Appendix A.
11/15/2012Motion to extend time to file replyPetitioner Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply filed on behalf of EES Leasing LLC, et al.
11/13/2012MDL Response to Motion for TransferRespondent Response to Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of Austin Appraisal District, et al.
11/07/2012MDL Response filed Respondent Response to Motion to Transfer on behalf of Limestone County Appraisal District by attorney Charles Buenger
11/02/2012Call received  Call received from Stephen Tipps letting him know that the motion for extension of time was granted.  
11/02/2012Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.PetitionerFiling grantedLessors' Expedited Motion for Extension of Time to File Enlarged Consolidated Reply filed by attorney Renn G. Neilson granted
10/31/2012Multidistrict Litigation Motion FiledMovant Lessors' Expedited Motion for Extension of Time to File Enlarged Consolidated Reply filed by attorney Renn G. Neilson
10/29/2012MDL Response to Motion for TransferRespondent Response to Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of Anderson County Appraisal District, et al.
10/29/2012MDL Response to Motion for TransferRespondent Response to Motion to Transfer by Respondents Bee County Appraisal District, Cooke County Appraisal District, Fayette County Appraisal District, Frio Co. Appraisal District, Goliad Co. Appraisal District, Jim Hogg Co. Appraisal District, Matagorda Co. Appraisal District, Refugio Co. Appraisal District, Shelby Co. District filed by attorney Leonard F. Green
10/29/2012MDL Response to Motion for TransferRespondent Response to Motion to Transfer submitted by Clay County Appraisal District;
Duval County Appraisal District; Lavaca County Central Appraisal District; Panola County Appraisal District; Polk County Appraisal District; Rusk County Appraisal District; Waller County Appraisal District; and Wood County Appraisal District
10/29/2012MDL Response to Motion for TransferRespondent Response to Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of Galveston Central Appraisal District.
10/26/2012Motion for Extension of Time disposed.PetitionerFiling grantedRespondents' Motion to Extend Deadline to File Response to Movants' Motion for Transfer granted.  Response on behalf of Austin County Appraisal District, et al. due no later than 11/13/12.  
10/26/2012MDL Response to Motion for TransferRespondent Response to Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of Brown County Appraisal District, et al. by attorney Kirk Swinney
10/25/2012Phone call from Clerk's OfficeRespondent Call made to attorney Michael Balcezak letting him know that his motion for extension of time to file response on behalf of Austin County Appraisal District, et al. is granted.  Response due 11/13/12.  Left message.
10/23/2012Motion to Stay Disposed DeniedMotion to Stay submitted by EES Leasing LLC; EXLP Leasing LLC; USAC Leasing, LLC; Midcon Compression, LLC; Enerven Compression Services LLC; Valerus Compression Services, LP; and Valerus Compression Services Management, LLC denied
10/19/2012Multidistrict Litigation Motion FiledRespondent Respondents' Motion to Extend Deadline to File Response to Movants' Motion for Transfer filed by Michael Balcezak
10/08/2012Motion to Stay Filed Movant Motion to Stay submitted by EES Leasing LLC; EXLP Leasing LLC; USAC Leasing, LLC; Midcon Compression, LLC; Enerven Compression Services LLC; Valerus Compression Services, LP; and Valerus Compression Services Management, LLC
10/08/2012Multidistrcit Litigation Motion to Transfer filedMovant Motion for Transfer submitted by EES Leasing LLC; EXLP Leasing LLC; USAC Leasing, LLC; Midcon Compression, LLC; Enerven Compression Services, LLC; Valerus Compression Services, LP; and Valerus Compression Services Management, LLC
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MDL DefendantsRespondentMichael William Balcezak  
EES Leasing LLCMovantMr. Renn G. Neilson
Court of Appeals Information:
 
 
 
 
Trial Court Information
 
 
 
 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site