Supreme Court

Case: 12-0789
10/01/2012
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
TENASKA ENERGY, INC., TENASKA ENERGY HOLDINGS, LLC, TENASKA CLEBURNE, LLC, CONTINENTAL ENERGY SERVICES, INC., AND ILLINOVA GENERATING COMPANY 
PONDEROSA PINE ENERGY, LLC 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/06/2014Motion for Rehearing - FiledRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Ponderosa Pine Energy, LLC.
09/26/2013Reply brief filedPetitionerPetitioners' Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tenaska Energy, Inc., et al.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
07/29/2013Brief filedRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Ponderosa Pine Energy, LLC.
06/07/2013Brief filedPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tenaska Energy, Inc., et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/16/2013Reply filedPetitionerReply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Tenaska Energy Inc., et al.(HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/04/2013Response to Petition for Review filedRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Ponderosa Pine Energy, LLC (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/05/2012Petition for Review filedPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Tenaska Energy, Inc., et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionRemarksDocument
09/12/2014Case Stored  G02 Row 14 B-2 (7 vols)
08/22/2014Mandate issued  Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
08/22/2014Motion for Rehearing - DisposedCauseDenied 
06/06/2014Motion for Rehearing - FiledRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filed Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Ponderosa Pine Energy, LLC.
05/23/2014Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record Issued 
05/23/2014Opinion issuedCauseCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed, trial court judgment reinstatedThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and reinstates the judgment of the trial court.  Justice Guzman delivered the opinion of the Court.
05/23/2014Pro hac vice motion disposed Filing grantedConstance Boland's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Reagan Simpson's Motion in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice granted.
05/23/2014Pro hac vice motion disposed Filing grantedConstance Boland's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Reagan Simpson's Motion in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice granted.
05/23/2014Pro hac vice motion disposed Filing grantedFrank Penski' Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Reagan Simpson's Motion in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice granted.
05/23/2014Pro hac vice motion disposed Filing grantedFrank Penski' Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Reagan Simpson's Motion in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice granted.
01/21/2014Notice from Counsel of a change in addressRespondent Change of Address for B. Frank Cain filed on behalf of Ponderosa Pine Energy, LLC.
01/17/2014Notice from Counsel of a change in addressRespondent Change of Address for Reagan Simpson and Marc Tabolsky filed on behalf of Ponderosa Pine Energy, LLC.
01/07/2014Oral argument   argued on behalf of petitioners by Deborah G. Hankinson; argued on behalf of respondent by Reagan W. Simpson
12/16/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedRespondent Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Ponderosa Pine Energy, LLC.
12/12/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedPetitioner Oral Argument will be presented by Deborah G. Hankinson on behalf of Tenaska Energy, Inc.
11/22/2013Case set for oral argumentIndicates filing of Petition for ReviewCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., January 7, 2014.  Time allotted to argue: 20/20 minutes
11/22/2013Petition for Review disposed Filing granted 
11/22/2013Petition for Review granted   
09/26/2013Reply brief filedPetitioner Petitioners' Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tenaska Energy, Inc., et al.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
09/11/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Petitioner's Reply BriefFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Petitioner's Reply Brief is due on September 26, 2013.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED.
09/09/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief.Petitioner's Reply Brief Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tenaska Energy, Inc.
08/08/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.PetitionerFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Reply brief is due September 12, 2013.
08/08/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief.Petitioner Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tenaska Energy, Inc., et al.
07/29/2013Brief filedRespondent Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Ponderosa Pine Energy, LLC.
07/29/2013Pro hac vice motion filedRespondent Frank Penski's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice AND MOTION IN SUPPORT INCORPORATED TOGETHER, submitted by Reagan Simpson.  Filed on behalf of Ponderosa Pine Energy LLC.
07/29/2013Pro hac vice motion filedRespondent Frank Penski's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice AND MOTION IN SUPPORT INCORPORATED TOGETHER, submitted by Reagan Simpson.  Filed on behalf of Ponderosa Pine Energy LLC.
07/29/2013Pro hac vice motion filedRespondent Constance Boland's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Ponderosa Pine Energy LLC AND MOTION IN SUPPORT INCORPORATED TOGETHER, submitted by Reagan Simpson.
07/29/2013Pro hac vice motion filedRespondent Constance Boland's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Ponderosa Pine Energy LLC AND MOTION IN SUPPORT INCORPORATED TOGETHER, submitted by Reagan Simpson.
07/08/2013Notice from Counsel of a change in addressPetitioner Wright & Close LLP, cousel of record for Petitioner Continental Energy Services, Inc. filed Notice of Change of Address: One Riverway, Suite 2200, Houston, Texas 77056.
06/25/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.RespondentFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Response Brief is due July 29, 2013.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.  Reply Brief is due August 13, 2013.
06/24/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief.Respondent Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Ponderosa Pine Energy, LLC.
06/07/2013Brief filedPetitioner Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tenaska Energy, Inc., et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
04/29/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.PetitionerFiling grantedUnopposed second motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tenaska Energy, Inc., et al. has been granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Petitioners Brief on the merits is due June 7, 2013; Respondents Brief is due June 27, 2013; Petitioners Reply Brief is due July 12, 2013.
04/29/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief.Petitioner Unopposed second motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tenaska Energy, Inc., et al.
04/08/2013Notice from Counsel of a change in addressPetitioner Notice of Change of Address for Petitioners' Attorneys at the Austin Offices. On behalf of Illinova Generating Company.
04/04/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.PetitionerFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.  Petitioner's brief is due May 8, 2013; Respondent's brief is due May 28, 2013; and Petitioner's reply brief is due June 12, 2013.
04/04/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief.Petitioner Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tenaska Energy, Inc., et al.
03/27/2013Case Record Filed Clerk of the Court of Appeals Electronic Appellate Rec. received.
(Per COA Clerk, 19 Volumes of Clerk's Rec. to be shipped in paper form)
04.01.13 - 19 volumes of clerk's record & 1 volume of supp clerk's record (paper)
04.25.14 - Exhibits (electronic version)
03/08/2013Record Requested in Petition for Review  Record requested from the 5th COA
03/08/2013Brief on the Merits RequestedIndicates filing of Petition for Review Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than 4/8/13; Response brief due 4/29/13; Reply brief due 5/14/13.
01/16/2013Reply filedPetitioner Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Tenaska Energy Inc., et al.(HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/10/2013Notice from Counsel of a change in addressRespondent Change of Address for Marc Tabolsky filed on behalf of Ponderosa Pine Energy, LLC.
01/09/2013Phone call from Clerk's OfficeRespondent To Mr. Marc Tabolsky's office (spoke to his asst., Joy Moreno) and requested that they efile their change of address letter.
01/08/2013Case forwarded to Court   
01/04/2013Response to Petition for Review filedRespondent Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Ponderosa Pine Energy, LLC (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/05/2012Petition for Review filedPetitioner Petition for Review filed on behalf of Tenaska Energy, Inc., et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/02/2012Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedPetitionerFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Petition for Review is due December 5, 2012.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
11/02/2012Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filedPetitioner Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Tenaska Energy, Inc.
10/02/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedPetitionerFiling grantedPetition due 11/05/12.
10/01/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filedPetitioner Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed on behalf of Tenaska Energy, Inc., et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
09/12/2014Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 14 B-2 (7 vols)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tenaska Energy, Inc.PetitionerMr. William W. Dibrell
Mr. Ryan D. Clinton
Mr. John J. 'Mike' McKetta III
Ms. Deborah G. Hankinson
Illinova Generating CompanyPetitionerMr. Mike A. Hatchell
Mr. Bradley Knapp  
Mr. Bryce Christian Quine
Mr. Bradley C. Weber
Continental Energy Services, Inc.PetitionerMr. Howard L. Close
Ms. Wanda McKee Fowler
Mr. Patrick McAndrew  
Ms. Carmen S. Mitchell
Ponderosa Pine Energy, LLCRespondentMs. Constance Boland
Mr. Michael W. Huddleston
Mr. B. Frank Cain
Mr. Ryan Parker Bates
Mr. Frank Penski
Mr. Reagan W. Simpson
Mr. Marc S. Tabolsky
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Render 
376 SW3d 358, 08-20-12 
5th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Douglas S. Lang 
Trial Court Information
191st District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Gena Nicole Slaughter 
07-04189 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site