Supreme Court

Case: 12-0518
06/25/2012
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE NESTLE USA, INC. 
 
Trial Court Information
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/05/2012Motion for Rehearing - FiledRelator's Brief in CauseRelator Nestle USA Inc.'s Motion for Rehearing.
09/17/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Texas Association of Manufacturers, et al.  Submitted by Keith Strama, State Bar No. 24070707, BEATTY BANGLE STRAMA, P.C., 400 West 15th Street, Suite 1450, Austin, Texas 78701, Phone: (512) 879-5050.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/05/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Brief of Amicus Curiae National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center in Support of Relator.  Submitted by Scott A. Keller of YETTER COLEMAN LLP, 221 West Sixth St. Ste. 750, Austin Texas 78701, ph. (512) 533-0150.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/23/2012Reply brief filedPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Nestle USA, Inc.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/16/2012Brief filedReal Parties in Interest Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Susan Combs, Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/26/2012Brief filedRelatorRelator's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf Nestle USA, Inc.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/03/2012Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus FiledReal Parties in Interest Response to the Petition for Review filed on behalf of Susan Combs, Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
06/25/2012Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelatorPetition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Nestle USA, Inc.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionRemarksDocument
05/19/2014Case Stored - stored case location updated  Row 11 G-5
01/16/2013Case Stored  G02 Row 21 C-3
12/14/2012Certified cys of cost bill sent to attys of record  Cost Bill Issued
12/14/2012Motion for Rehearing - DisposedCauseDenied with Justice not sitting. 
11/05/2012Case forwarded to Court   
11/05/2012Motion for Rehearing - FiledRelator's Brief in Cause Relator Nestle USA Inc.'s Motion for Rehearing.
10/19/2012Dissenting opinion issued. Issued 
10/19/2012Opinion issuedCauseDenied 
10/04/2012Post submission brief filedRelator Post Submission brief filed on behalf of Nestle USA, Inc.
09/28/2012Post submission brief filedReal Parties in Interest  Post Submission Brief filed on behalf of Susan Combs.
09/18/2012Oral argument   argued on behalf of relator by Peter A. Nolan; argued on behalf of real party in interest by Rance L. Craft; argued on behalf of amicus, National Federation of Independence Business Small Business Legal Center, by Scott A. Keller
09/17/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Texas Association of Manufacturers, et al.  Submitted by Keith Strama, State Bar No. 24070707, BEATTY BANGLE STRAMA, P.C., 400 West 15th Street, Suite 1450, Austin, Texas 78701, Phone: (512) 879-5050.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/12/2012Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedAmicus Curiae  Oral Argument Submission form submitted by amicus curiae attorney Scott A. Keller of Yetter Coleman LLP of Austin, TX
09/11/2012Phone call from Clerk's OfficeAmicus Curiae  Call made to Scott Keller to inform him that the Court granted the Unopposed Motion for Leave of Court for Amicus Curiae to Share Argument.  Time allotted to argue 15/20/5 minutes. Asked that Mr. Keller efile an Oral Argument Submission Form via efiling as soon as possible.  Left voicemail.
09/11/2012Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Leave of Court for Amicus Curiae to Share Argument granted.  (Time allotted to argue: 15/20/5)
09/05/2012Miscellaneous motion filed. Received (instead of filed) Unopposed Motion for Leave of Court for Amicus Curiae to Share Argument filed on behalf of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center.
09/05/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed) Brief of Amicus Curiae National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center in Support of Relator.  Submitted by Scott A. Keller of YETTER COLEMAN LLP, 221 West Sixth St. Ste. 750, Austin Texas 78701, ph. (512) 533-0150.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/29/2012Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedReal Parties in Interest  Oral Argument Submission Form submitted by attorney Rance L. Craft of the Office of the Attorney General of Austin, TX
08/29/2012Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedRelator Oral Argument Submission Form submitted by relator attorne Peter A. Nolan of Winstead PC of Austin, TX
08/24/2012Case set for oral argumentRefers to Petition for Writ of MandamusCase set for oral argumentThis case is set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m. on September 18, 2012.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes.
08/24/2012Mandamus Set to Argue   
08/24/2012Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed Case set for oral argument 
08/23/2012Reply brief filedPetitioner Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Nestle USA, Inc.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/16/2012Brief filedReal Parties in Interest  Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Susan Combs, Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/26/2012Brief filedRelator Relator's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf Nestle USA, Inc.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/05/2012Phone call from Clerk's Office  Call made to parties to request brief on the merits.  Left message for relator and spoke with real party attorney Rance Craft about due dates.
07/05/2012Brief on the Merits RequestedRefers to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Brief on the merits requested: Relator's brief due no later than 7/26/12; Response brief due 8/16/12; Reply brief due 8/23/12.
07/03/2012Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus FiledReal Parties in Interest  Response to the Petition for Review filed on behalf of Susan Combs, Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
07/03/2012Notice of vacation dates.Real Parties in Interest  Letter from attorney Rance Craft to inform the Court that he will be out of town on vacation from August 22, 2012 through August 26, 2012.  He asks that the Court not set any deadlines during this time.
06/29/2012Notice of vacation dates.Relator Mr. Nolan's vacation notice as August 6-17, 2012.  Filed on behalf of Nestle USA, Inc.
06/26/2012Designation of Lead Counsel Real Parties in Interest  Designation of Lead Counsel:  Rance L. Craft, Asst. Solicitor Gen., Office of the Attorney General, PO Box 12548 (MC 059), Austin, TX 78711, (512)936-2872.  Filed on behalf of Susan Combs, Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts.
06/26/2012Phone call from Clerk's OfficeReal Parties in Interest  Call made to Kevin Van Oort and Rance Craft to see if they will be filing on behalf of real party in interest.  Mr. Craft said he is the one to contact.  Let him know that a response is requested, due on 7/5/12.  Left voicemail with Mr. Van Oort.
06/26/2012Supreme Court of Texas Requested ResponseRefers to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Requested response to petition for writ of mandamus due no later than 7/5/12.
06/25/2012Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Nestle USA, Inc.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/16/2013Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 21 C-3
05/19/2014Case StoredCase stored.Row 11 G-5
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Association of ManufacturersAmicus CuriaeMr. Keith Strama
Susan Combs, Texas Comptroller of Public AccountsReal Party in Interest Mr. Kevin D. Van Oort
Mr. Rance L. Craft
Attorney General Greg W. Abbott
National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal CenterAmicus CuriaeMr. Scott A. Keller
Nestle USA, Inc.RelatorMs. Jennifer Patterson Rabb
Mr. Peter Nolan
Ms. Anna Windsor Kana
Court of Appeals Information:
 
 
 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site