Supreme Court

Case: 12-0360    
12-0360
05/07/2012
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
ARSENIO COLORADO, ET AL. 
TYCO VALVES & CONTROLS, L.P. AND TV&C GP HOLDINGS, INC. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/14/2014Motion for RehearingPetitioner's motion for rehearing of cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Arsenio Colorado, et al.
01/30/2013Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Arsenio Colorado, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/11/2013Brief on the MeritsRespondentBrief on the Merits filed on behalf of TYCO Valves & Controls, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/29/2012Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Arsenio Colorado, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/20/2012Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Arsenio Colorado, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/07/2012Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition filed on behalf of TYCO Valves & Controls, LP.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/07/2012Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Arsenio Colorado, et al.  
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/16/2014Case Stored G02 Row 29 A-3
06/27/2014Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
06/27/2014Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied 
04/14/2014Case forwarded to Court  
04/14/2014Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Arsenio Colorado, et al.
03/28/2014Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
03/28/2014Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment affirmedThe Court affirms the court of appeals' judgment. Justice Lehrmann delivered the opinion of the Court.
(3/28/2014 3:38:57 PM) 12-0360.jmt.pdf, 120360.pdf
09/11/2013Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by David C. Holmes; Argued on behalf of respondents by Michael W. Fox (Chief Justice Jefferson not sitting)
09/06/2013Phone call from Clerk's Office Call made to petitioner attorney David Holmes regarding oral argument submission form and submission fee.  Left voicemail.
08/28/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Michael W. Fox of Ogletree, Deakins, Smoak, Nash & Stewart, P.C., 301 Congress Avenue, Suite 1150, Austin, Texas 78701 on behalf of Tyco Valves & Controls, L.P. and TV&C GP Holdings, Inc.
05/03/2013Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., September 11, 2013.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes.
04/19/2013Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
04/19/2013Petition for Review granted  
01/30/2013Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Arsenio Colorado, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/28/2013MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedUnopposed motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed on behalf of Arsenio Colorado, et al. has been GRANTED. Reply due January 30, 2013. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
01/28/2013Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed on behalf of Arsenio Colorado, et al.
01/15/2013Phone call from Clerk's Office To Mr. Michael Fox's office (spoke to his assst., Kris) and requested that they send in 2 more copies of their resp's brief on the merits that was efiled on 1/1/13.
01/11/2013Brief on the Merits Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of TYCO Valves & Controls, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/13/2012Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
12/12/2012Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedResponse brief due 01/11/13; Reply brief due 01/28/12; FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
12/10/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tyco Valves & Controls, L.P and TV&C GP Holdings, Inc.
11/29/2012Brief on the Merits Petitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Arsenio Colorado, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/27/2012Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedPetitioner brief due 11/29/12; Response brief due 12/19/12; Reply brief due 01/03/13; FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
11/26/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Petitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Arsenio Colorado, et al.
10/29/2012Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 1st COA
10/26/2012Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than 11/26/12; Response brief due 12/17/12; Reply brief due 1/2/13.
09/20/2012Reply to Response Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Arsenio Colorado, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/07/2012Response to Petition Response to Petition filed on behalf of TYCO Valves & Controls, LP.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/17/2012Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedResponse due 09/07/12; FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
08/09/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Tyco Valves & Controls, L.P. and TV&C GP Holdings, Inc.
07/13/2012Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than 8/13/12.
06/12/2012Case forwarded to Court  
05/08/2012Resubmitted Document Petition originally rejected on May 7, 2012 has been resubmitted as of this date, May 8, 2012.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/07/2012Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Arsenio Colorado, et al.  
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/16/2014Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 29 A-3
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tyco Valves & Controls, L.P.RespondentMr. James Ronald Staley
Mr. Michael W. Fox
Stephen Eric Hart  
Colorado, ArsenioPetitionerMr. David C. Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Render 
365 SW3d 750, 01-19-12 
1st Court of Appeals 
Honorable Evelyn Keyes 
Trial Court Information
125th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable O. Kyler Carter 
2008-19895 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site