Supreme Court

Case: 12-0047
01/17/2012
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
CARLA STRICKLAND 
KATHRYN AND JEREMY MEDLEN 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/20/2013Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, et al.
02/01/2013Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedAmicus Curiae During oral argument on January 10, 2013, three issues for which this letter provides supplemental authorities that my benefit the Court.  Filed by Manuel Lopez on behalf of The American Kennel Club.
01/09/2013Supplemental Brief filedRespondentSupplemental Brief:  Respondent's Exhibit Analyzing Petitioner's Oral Argument Handout.  Filed on behalf of Kathryn Medlen.
01/08/2013Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerOral Argument Exhibit filed on behalf of Carla Strickland.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
01/02/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of No Kill Advocacy Center in support of Respondents Kathryn and Jeremy Medlen.  Submitted by Ryan Clinton, State Bar No. 24027934, rclinton@hankinsonlaw.com, HANKINSON LLP, 750 North St. Paul Street, Suite 1800, Dallas, Texas 75201, 214.754.9190.(HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/31/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of Law Professors Opposing Petition for Review.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/25/2012Reply brief filedPetitionerPetitioner Carla Strickland's Reply Brief on the Merits.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/25/2012Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Texas Dog Commission's Amicus Letter. Submitted by Zandra Anderson; Attorney at Law, 7941 Katy Freeway No. 412, Houston Texas 77024, (713)222-7600. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/09/2012Brief filedRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Kathryn Medlen. (hc rec'd)
06/20/2012Brief filedPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Carla Strickland.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/01/2012Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Texas Civil Justice League's Amicus Letter. Submitted by George S. Christian; 400 West 15th Street Suite 400, Austin Texas 78701, 512-791-1429.
03/08/2012Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)E-FILED  Texas Veterinary Medical Association's Amicus Letter.  Submitted by Elizabeth Choate - TVMA Director of Government Relations/General Counsel, 8104 Exchange Drive, Austin Texas 78754, 512/452–4224.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/01/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)E-FILED  Amici Curiae Brief of the American Kennel Club, et al. in support of Petition for Review. Submitted by Manuel López of Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP, 600 Travis Street Suite 1600, Houston TX 77002, (713) 227-8008. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/01/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)E-FILED  Brief of Amici Curiae Texas Municipal League, Texas City Attorneys Association, and City of Arlington, Texas supporting Petition for Review by Carla Strickland. Submitted by Assistant City Attorney Mr. Robert Fugate of Arlington City Attorney's Office, M.S. #63-0300, PO Box 90231, Arlington Texas 76004, (817) 459-6878. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/01/2012Reply filedPetitionerE-FILED  Petitioner Carla Strickland's Reply in support of Petition for Review.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
02/16/2012Response to Petition for Review filedRespondentE-FILED  Response to Petition for Review. Kathryn & Jeremy Medlen.
02/02/2012Amended Petition for Review filedPetitionerE-FILED  Amended Petition for Review filed on behalf of Carla Strickland.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/17/2012Appendix FiledPetitionerE-FILED  appendix attached
01/17/2012Petition for Review filedPetitionerE-FILED  Petition for Review filed on behalf of Carla Strickland.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionRemarksDocument
05/16/2014Case Stored - stored case location updated  Row 10 E-5
06/21/2013Case Stored  G02 Row 22 D-3
05/16/2013Mandate issued  Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
04/05/2013Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record Issued 
04/05/2013Opinion issuedCauseCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed & judgment renderedJustice Willett delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Justice Hecht, Justice Green, Justice Guzman, Justice Lehrmann, Justice Boyd, and Justice Devine joined, and in which Chief Justice Jefferson joined as to all parts except footnote 58 and Part II-C, and in which Justice Johnson joined as to all parts except Part II-C.
(4/5/2013 4:17:00 PM) 12-0047.jmt.pdf, 120047.pdf
03/20/2013Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, et al.
02/01/2013Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedAmicus Curiae  During oral argument on January 10, 2013, three issues for which this letter provides supplemental authorities that my benefit the Court.  Filed by Manuel Lopez on behalf of The American Kennel Club.
01/22/2013Post submission brief filedPetitioner Reply to Respondents' 17 Page "Exhibit" Analyzing Petitioner's Oral Argument Handout filed on behalf of Carla Strickland.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/10/2013Oral argument   argued on behalf of petitioner by John H. Cayce, Jr.; argued on behalf of respondents by Randall E. Turner; argued on behalf of amicus curiae, The American Kennel Club, et al., by Victor E. Schwartz
01/09/2013Phone call from Clerk's OfficePetitioner Call made to Manuel Lopez and John Cayce, Jr. to let them know the Court granted Victor Schwartz 5 minutes of petitioner's time to argue on behalf of amicus.  Left message and voicemail.
01/09/2013Supplemental Brief filedRespondent Supplemental Brief:  Respondent's Exhibit Analyzing Petitioner's Oral Argument Handout.  Filed on behalf of Kathryn Medlen.
01/09/2013Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. Filing grantedMotion to Participate in Oral Argument by Amici Curiae, The American Kennel Club, et al., granted
01/09/2013Pro hac vice motion disposed Filing grantedNon-Resident Attorney, Victor E. Schwartz's Motion Pro Hac Vice granted
01/09/2013Pro hac vice motion disposed Filing grantedResident Attorney Manuel López's Motion in support of Mr. Schwartz's Motion Pro Hac Vice granted
01/09/2013Response to Motion filedRespondent Response to Amicus's request to participate in Oral Argument. On behalf of Kathryn and Jeremy Medlen.
01/08/2013Pro hac vice motion filedAmicus Curiae  Resident Attorney Manuel López's Motion in support of Mr. Schwartz's Motion Pro Hac Vice.  On behalf of Amicus Parties The American Kennel Club, et al.
01/08/2013Pro hac vice motion filedAmicus Curiae  Non-Resident Attorney, Victor E. Schwartz's Motion Pro Hac Vice. On behalf of Amicus Parties The American Kennel Club, et al.
01/08/2013Phone call from Clerk's OfficeRespondent call made to Mr. Turner to inquire whether he is going to file a response to motion to participate in oral argument. Per Turner, he would like to but he is not at his office. He is opposed to the motion but won't filing a response to it.
01/08/2013Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitioner Oral Argument Exhibit filed on behalf of Carla Strickland.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
01/08/2013Phone call from Clerk's OfficeAmicus Curiae  to Mr. Lopez to notify him that the Motion to Participate in Oral Argument of Out-State Attorney, Mr. Schwartz, won't be ruled on until the Motions Pro Hac Vice are submitted to the Court.
01/08/2013Motion to Argue filedAmicus Curiae  Motion to Participate in Oral Argument by Amici Curiae, The American Kennel Club, et al.
01/03/2013Letter FiledPetitioner Correction letter submitted on behalf of Carla Strickland to correct errors and/or omissions in Petitioner’s Brief on the Merits.
01/02/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus Brief of No Kill Advocacy Center in support of Respondents Kathryn and Jeremy Medlen.  Submitted by Ryan Clinton, State Bar No. 24027934, rclinton@hankinsonlaw.com, HANKINSON LLP, 750 North St. Paul Street, Suite 1800, Dallas, Texas 75201, 214.754.9190.(HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/13/2012Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedRespondent Oral Argument Submission Form submitted by respondent attorney Randall E. Turner of Bailey & Galyen of Bedford, TX
10/04/2012Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedPetitioner Oral Argument Submission Form submitted by petitioner attorney John H. Cayce, Jr. of Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP of Fort Worth, TX
09/21/2012Case set for oral argumentIndicates filing of Petition for ReviewCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., January 10, 2013.
09/21/2012Petition for Review disposed Filing granted 
09/21/2012Petition for Review granted   
07/31/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus Curiae Brief of Law Professors Opposing Petition for Review.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/25/2012Reply brief filedPetitioner Petitioner Carla Strickland's Reply Brief on the Merits.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/25/2012Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed) Texas Dog Commission's Amicus Letter. Submitted by Zandra Anderson; Attorney at Law, 7941 Katy Freeway No. 412, Houston Texas 77024, (713)222-7600. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/10/2012Pro hac vice motion disposedAmicus Curiae Filing grantedAttorney Ryan Clinton's Motion in Support of Sandra L. Weiherer's Motion Pro Hac Vice granted.
07/10/2012Pro hac vice motion disposedAmicus Curiae Filing grantedMotion Pro Hac Vice of Sandra L. Weiherer granted.
07/09/2012Brief filedRespondent Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Kathryn Medlen. (hc rec'd)
06/26/2012Pro hac vice motion filedAmicus Curiae  Attorney Ryan Clinton's Motion in Support of Sandra L. Weiherer's Motion Pro Hac Vice.  On behalf of Amicus Curiae No Kill Advocacy Center.
06/26/2012Pro hac vice motion filedAmicus Curiae  Motion Pro Hac Vice of Sandra L. Weiherer.  On behalf of Amicus Curiae No Kill Advocacy Center.
06/20/2012Brief filedPetitioner Petitioner's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Carla Strickland.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/01/2012Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed) Texas Civil Justice League's Amicus Letter. Submitted by George S. Christian; 400 West 15th Street Suite 400, Austin Texas 78701, 512-791-1429.
05/18/2012Motion for Extension of Time disposed.PetitionerFiling grantedPetitioner's Brief is due June 20, 2012; Respondents' Brief is due July 10, 2012; Petitioner's Reply brief is due July 25, 2012. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED
05/15/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief.Petitioner Petitioner Carla Strickland's Motion to Extend Time to file Brief on the Merits.
04/24/2012Case Record Filed Clerk of the Court of Appeals Clerk's record (1V), ant's br, ant's appendix to br, ape's br, amicus brief of The American Kennel Club, et al., amicus brief of The American Veterinary Medical Assoc., et al., misc. folder (mos. & corres.), judgment, opinion
04/23/2012Record Requested in Petition for Review   
04/20/2012Brief on the Merits RequestedIndicates filing of Petition for Review Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due 5/21/12; Response brief due 6/11/12; Reply brief due 6/26/12
03/08/2012Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed) E-FILED  Texas Veterinary Medical Association's Amicus Letter.  Submitted by Elizabeth Choate - TVMA Director of Government Relations/General Counsel, 8104 Exchange Drive, Austin Texas 78754, 512/452–4224.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/01/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed) E-FILED  Amici Curiae Brief of the American Kennel Club, et al. in support of Petition for Review. Submitted by Manuel López of Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP, 600 Travis Street Suite 1600, Houston TX 77002, (713) 227-8008. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/01/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed) E-FILED  Brief of Amici Curiae Texas Municipal League, Texas City Attorneys Association, and City of Arlington, Texas supporting Petition for Review by Carla Strickland. Submitted by Assistant City Attorney Mr. Robert Fugate of Arlington City Attorney's Office, M.S. #63-0300, PO Box 90231, Arlington Texas 76004, (817) 459-6878. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/01/2012Reply filedPetitioner E-FILED  Petitioner Carla Strickland's Reply in support of Petition for Review.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
02/21/2012Case forwarded to Court   
02/17/2012Motion for leave to file amended petition disposed Filing grantedOpposed Motion for Leave to Amend Petition for Review granted
02/16/2012Response to Petition for Review filedRespondent E-FILED  Response to Petition for Review. Kathryn & Jeremy Medlen.
02/07/2012Response to Motion filedRespondent E-FILED  Respondents Kathryn & Jeremy Medlen's  Response to Petitioner's motion for leave to file Amended Petition for Review.
02/03/2012Call receivedRespondent from Mr. Turner to inform the Court that he is going to file a Response to Petitioner's Motion to Amend within five business days from the date the motion was filed.
02/02/2012Phone call from Clerk's OfficeRespondent to Mr. Turner to inquire whether or not he intends to file a Response to Motion for Leave to Amend Petition .  Left message, requested a call back.
02/02/2012Motion for leave to file amended petitionPetitioner E-FILED Opposed Motion for Leave to Amend Petition for Review. On behalf of Carla Strickland.
02/02/2012Amended Petition for Review filedPetitioner E-FILED  Amended Petition for Review filed on behalf of Carla Strickland.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/17/2012Appendix FiledPetitioner E-FILED  appendix attached
01/17/2012Petition for Review filedPetitioner E-FILED  Petition for Review filed on behalf of Carla Strickland.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/16/2014Case StoredCase stored.Row 10 E-5
06/21/2013Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 22 D-3
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Veterinary Medical AssociationAmicus CuriaeMs. Elizabeth Ellen Holmes 'Liz' Choate
Strickland, CarlaPetitionerMr. Paul Boudloche
Ms. Mallory Ann Beagles
Ms. Alison M. Rowe
Mr. John H. Cayce Jr.
American Kennel ClubAmicus CuriaeMr. Manuel López
No Kill Advocacy CenterAmicus CuriaeMs. Sandra L. Weiherer
Mr. Ryan D. Clinton
Medlen, KathrynRespondentMr. Randall E. Turner
Ms. Susan Bleil
Ms. Sondrea King
Law Professors - South Texas College of Law; St. Mary's Univ. School of Law; Texas Southern Univ. Thurgood Marshall School of Law; Texas Tech Univ. of Law School; Texas Wesleyan School of Law; and the Univ. of Texas at Austin School of LawAmicus CuriaeFrancesca Ortiz  
No Kill Advocacy CenterAmicus CuriaeMr. Ryan D. Clinton
Texas Municipal LeagueAmicus CuriaeMr. Robert H. Fugate
Property Casualty InsurersAmicus CuriaeMs. Linda Jene Burgess
Texas Civil Justice LeagueAmicus CuriaeMr. George S. Christian
Texas Dog CommissionAmicus CuriaeMs. Zandra Anderson
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
353 SW3d 576, 11-03-11 
2nd Court of Appeals 
Honorable E. Lee Gabriel 
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 1 
Tarrant 
Honorable Donald R. Pierson 
2009-75521-1 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site