Supreme Court

Case: 12-0002    
12-0002
01/03/2012
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
LILLIE PAYNE 
HILLCREST BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER AND HILLCREST HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/01/2012Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition filed on behalf of HILLCREST BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER AND HILLCREST HEALTH SYSTEM, INC..  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/03/2012Appendix FiledPetitionerAppendix attached.
01/03/2012Petition for ReviewPetitionerEFILED: Petition for Review filed on behalf of Lillie Payne. (HC REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/21/2014Case Stored - stored case location updated Row 13 D-2
05/31/2012Case Stored Row 21 J-4
05/30/2012Notice sent to Court of Appeals Certified copy of notice sent to the Court of Appeals
03/30/2012Petition for Review disposedDenied 
02/07/2012Case forwarded to Court  
02/06/2012Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates Vacation notice for Robert L. Greening: March 12-16, 2012; July 2-6, 2012; August 6-17, 2012; December 17, 2012-January 2, 2013. Filed on behalf of Lillie Payne.
02/01/2012Response to Petition Response to Petition filed on behalf of HILLCREST BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER AND HILLCREST HEALTH SYSTEM, INC..  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/04/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition is due January 3, 2012.
01/03/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed E-FILED: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed on behalf of Lillie Payne.
01/03/2012Appendix Filed Appendix attached.
01/03/2012Petition for Review EFILED: Petition for Review filed on behalf of Lillie Payne. (HC REC'D)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/21/2014Case StoredCase stored.Row 13 D-2
05/31/2012Case StoredCase stored.Row 21 J-4
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Payne, LilliePetitionerMr. Robert L. Greening
Hillcrest Baptist Medical CenterRespondentMr. Russell G. Thornton
Court of Appeals Information:
Aff,part & Rev & Rem/prt 
___ SW3d ___, 11-16-11 
10th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Al Scoggins 
Trial Court Information
414th District Court 
McLennan 
Honorable Vicki L. Menard 
2010-15045 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site