Eleventh Court of Appeals

Case: 11-17-00028-CV    
11-17-00028-CV
02/01/2017
Oil & Gas
Endeavor Energy Resources, L.P. 
Energen Resources Corporation and John Thomas Quinn 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/02/2018Letter brief filedAppellant
04/18/2018Additional authorities filedAppellee
08/09/2017Reply brief filedAppellant
06/23/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
06/21/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
04/28/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/09/2018Motion for rehearing filed 
10/25/2018Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/04/2018Letter issued by the court 
09/20/2018Letter issued by the court 
05/02/2018Letter brief filed 
04/18/2018Additional authorities filed 
10/20/2017Submitted 
09/07/2017Set for submission on oral argument 
08/09/2017Reply brief filed 
07/07/2017Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/03/2017Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
06/23/2017Case ready to be set 
06/23/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/21/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/23/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/23/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/28/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/23/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/07/2017Appearance of counsel 
03/01/2017Notification received that no record was taken 
02/28/2017Clerks record filed 
02/09/2017Fee paid 
02/08/2017Docketing statement filed 
02/08/2017Telephone call received 
02/01/2017Case Information Sheet from trial court clerk filed 
02/01/2017Case began in court of appeals 
01/31/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
11/30/2016Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
11/09/2016Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/09/2018MotionMotion for rehearing
11/26/2018StatusRelease to publisher
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Energen Resources CorporationAppelleeRyan Clinton
John A. "Jad" Davis
Jacob M. Davidson
Endeavor Energy Resources, L.P.AppellantSteven C. Kiser
Richard E. Booth
Quinn, John ThomasAppelleeSean M. Guerrero
Trial Court Information
118th District Court 
Howard 
Honorable Timothy D. Yeats, Judge 
50827 
Karen E. Freeman, Court Reporter, Howard County 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site