Eleventh Court of Appeals

Case: 11-11-00015-CR
01/13/2011
Theft
Darrell Henderson 
State of Texas 
No 
10th Court of Appeals 
01/13/2011 
10-10-00444-CR 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/29/2011Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
04/08/2011Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionDocument
04/09/2013Sent to publisher  
04/09/2013Mandate issued  
02/06/2013Letter filedAppellant 
01/31/2013Opinion issued Affirmed
11/29/2012Submitted  
10/05/2012Set for submission on briefs  
06/29/2011Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState 
06/29/2011Case ready to be set  
05/12/2011Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedStateMotion or Writ Granted
05/09/2011Motion for extension of time to file brief filedState 
04/08/2011Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant 
04/07/2011Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedAppellantMotion or Writ Granted
04/04/2011Motion for extension of time to file brief filedAppellant 
03/04/2011Letter filedCourt Reporter 
02/24/2011Reporters record filedCourt Reporter 
01/13/2011Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals  
12/28/2010Extension of time to file reporters record disposedCourt ReporterMotion or Writ Granted
12/10/2010Clerks record filedDistrict Clerk 
10/19/2010Sentence imposed in the trial courtTrial court judge 
11/11/2000Notice of appeal filed in trial courtDistrict Clerk 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/09/2013Case StoredCase stored
04/09/2038RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
05/09/2013StatusRelease to publisher
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Henderson, DarrellCriminal - AppellantMary B. Hennessy
State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasBill R. Turner, District Attorney
Jeffrey Garon, Assistant
Trial Court Information
272nd District Court 
Brazos 
Honorable Travis B. Bryan, Judge 
10-03632-CRF 
 
5 years 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site