Supreme Court

Case: 11-0778
09/30/2011
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
THE CITY OF HOUSTON, TEXAS 
ROGER BATES, MICHAEL L. SPRATT AND DOUGLAS SPRINGER 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/25/2012Reply brief filedPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits. On behalf of City of Houston.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/10/2012Brief filedRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Roger Bates, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
04/20/2012Brief filedPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of the City of Houston, Texas.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/28/2011Reply filedPetitionerE-FILED: Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of The City of Houston, Texas. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/15/2011Response to Petition for Review filedRespondentE-FILED  Response to Petition for Review.  On behalf of Roger Bates, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/30/2011Appendix FiledPetitionerE-FILED  appendix attached
11/30/2011Petition for Review filedPetitionerE-FILED  Petition for Review filed on behalf of The City of Houston.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionRemarksDocument
05/16/2014Case Stored - stored case location updated  Row 7 A-3
09/26/2013Case Stored  G02 Row 22 H-1
08/02/2013Mandate issued  Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
08/02/2013Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. Filing grantedJoint Motion to Expedite Issuance of Mandate granted
07/24/2013Motion to Expedite FiledJoint motion filed Joint Motion to Expedite the Issuance of the Mandate filed on behalf of the City of HOuston and Roger Bates, et al.
06/28/2013Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record Issued 
06/28/2013Concurring and Dissenting Opinion delivered IssuedJustice Guzman delivered an opinion concurring in part and dissenting in part, in which Justice Boyd joined.
06/28/2013Concurring and Dissenting Opinion delivered IssuedJustice Hecht filed an opinion concurring in part and dissenting in part, in which Justice Lehrmann joined.
06/28/2013Opinion issuedCauseCourt of Appeals' judgment affirmed/reversed in part/rendered Justice Green delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Chief Justice Jefferson, Justice Johnson, Justice Willett, and Justice Devine joined; in which Justice Hecht and Justice Lehrmann joined as to Parts I and II.A; and in which Justice Guzman and Justice Boyd joined as to Parts I and II.B.
(6/28/2013 10:55:19 AM) 110778cd2.pdf, 110778cd.pdf, 110778.pdf, 11-0778.jmt.pdf
01/15/2013Post submission brief filedRespondent Post Submission Brief filed on behalf of City of Houston. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/11/2013Post submission brief filedRespondent Post-Submission Letter Brief on behalf of Roger Bates, et al.
01/09/2013Oral argument   argued on behalf of petitioner by Reagan D. Pratt; argued on behalf of Vincent Lee Marable III
12/04/2012Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedPetitioner Oral argument submission form submitted by petitioner attorney Reagan D. Pratt of The Pratt Law Firm, PLLC of Houston, TX
11/26/2012Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedRespondent Oral Argument will be presented by Vincent Lee Marable, III of Paul Webb, P.C. of Wharton, TX
09/21/2012Case set for oral argumentIndicates filing of Petition for ReviewCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., January 9, 2013. (Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes)
09/21/2012Petition for Review disposed Filing granted 
09/21/2012Petition for Review granted   
05/25/2012Reply brief filedPetitioner Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits. On behalf of City of Houston.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/10/2012Brief filedRespondent Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Roger Bates, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
04/20/2012Brief filedPetitioner Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of the City of Houston, Texas.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
04/18/2012Motion for Extension of Time disposed.PetitionerFiling grantedPetitioner brief due 04/20/12; Response brief due 05/10/12; Reply brief due 05/25/12; NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WILL BE CONSIDERED.
04/18/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief.Petitioner Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Petitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of the City of Houston, Texas.
03/19/2012Case Record Filed Clerk of the Court of Appeals Electronic Appellate Record received from the 14th Court of Appeals
03/14/2012Motion for Extension of Time disposed.PetitionerFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Petitioner's Brief is due April 18, 2012; Respondent's Brief is due May 8, 2012; Reply Brief is due May 23, 2012.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
03/14/2012Phone call from Clerk's OfficeRespondent Mr. Marable informed the Court that the Motion for Extension of Time is unopposed.
03/09/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief.Petitioner Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief filed on behalf of the City of Houston, et al.
02/22/2012Record Requested in Petition for Review   
02/17/2012Brief on the Merits RequestedIndicates filing of Petition for Review Petitioner brief due 03/19/12; Response brief due 04/09/12; Reply brief due 04/24/12
12/28/2011Reply filedPetitioner E-FILED: Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of The City of Houston, Texas. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/27/2011Case forwarded to Court   
12/15/2011Response to Petition for Review filedRespondent E-FILED  Response to Petition for Review.  On behalf of Roger Bates, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/30/2011Appendix FiledPetitioner E-FILED  appendix attached
11/30/2011Petition for Review filedPetitioner E-FILED  Petition for Review filed on behalf of The City of Houston.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/16/2011Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedPetitionerFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time granted.  Petition for Review is due November 30, 2011.  Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored.
11/14/2011Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filedPetitioner E-FILED  Third Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of The City of Houston.
10/14/2011Corrected Notice sent to all counsel  Corrected notice sent to parties to update the petition for review due date to 11/16/11 (not 11/30/11).
10/14/2011Phone call from Clerk's OfficeRespondent Call made to Vincent Marable III to ask if he is unopposed to the original request by petitioner for a 47 day extension of time to file petition for review.  Mr. Marable is not opposed to the 47 day extension.  Corrected notices will be mailed out to parties to move due date to 11/16/11 (not 11/30/11).  
Treated amended motion for extension of time as a second motion for extension of time to file petition for review.
10/13/2011Letter FiledRespondent Letter from Vincent Marable III bringing to the attention of the Clerk that there appears to be some type of internal miscalculation in calendaring the extension of time sought by petitioner.  Petitioner was given a total of 60 days to file petition for review when their amended motion requested a total of 47 days to file the petition.  
10/04/2011Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedPetitionerFiling grantedPetition for review is due November 30, 2011.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
10/04/2011Phone call from Clerk's OfficeRespondent Mr. Marable informed the Court that the second motion is unopposed.
10/04/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedPetitionerFiling grantedPetition is due October 31, 2011.
10/04/2011Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filedPetitioner E-FILED  Amended Motion for Extend Time to file Petition for Review filed as a second motion for extension.  Filed on behalf of The City of Houston.
10/03/2011Call receivedRespondent From respondent's atty's office to inform the Court that they will not be filing a response to the m/e/t and they are NOT opposed to the motion.
09/30/2011Phone call from Clerk's OfficeRespondent Left message for respondent attorneys to inform whether they will file a response to motion by 10/06/11.
09/30/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filedPetitioner E-FILED: Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed on behalf of The City of Houston. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/16/2014Case StoredCase stored. 
09/26/2013Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 22 H-1
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The City of HoustonPetitionerMr. Reagan Douglas Pratt
Mr. Donald J. Fleming
Mr. Timothy J. Higley
Mr. David M. Feldman
Bates, RogerRespondentMr. E. Troy Blakeney Jr.
Mr. Vincent L. Marable III
Mr. Richard C. Mumey
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed [duplicate 3] 
___ SW3d ___, 08-16-11 
14th Court of Appeals 
Honorable John S. Anderson 
Trial Court Information
165th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Josefina M. Rendon 
2007-65680 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site