Supreme Court

Case: 11-0773    
11-0773
09/28/2011
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
BIODERM SKIN CARE, LLC AND QUAN NGUYEN, M.D. 
VEASNA “SANDEE” SOK 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/15/2013Petition Reinstated  
02/05/2013Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedPetitionerReply to Response to Motion for Rehearing.
12/31/2012Response to Motion for RehearingRespondentResponse to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Respondent.
11/12/2012Motion for RehearingRehearing filed in Petition for ReviewMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Bioderm Skin Care, LLC.
09/27/2012Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioners Bioderm Skin Care, LLC, et al.'s Reply Brief on the Merits.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/13/2012Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Vaesna 'Sandee' Sok.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/23/2012Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Bioderm Skin Care, LLC and Quan Nguyen.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/05/2012Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review. On behalf of Bioderm Skin Care, L.L.C., et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/21/2012Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Veasna "Sandee" Sok.
09/29/2011Supplemental appendix PetitionerE-FILED: Supplemental Appendix to Petition for Review: Court of Appeals Judgment filed on behalf of Bioderm Skin Care, LLC, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/28/2011Appendix FiledPetitionerE-FILED Attached to petition
09/28/2011Petition for ReviewPetitionerE-FILED  Petition appendix attached filed on behalf of Bioderm Skin Care, LLC.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/11/2014Case Stored G02 Row 29 C-3
05/09/2014Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
03/28/2014Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
03/28/2014Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; cause remanded to trial courtThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to the trial court. Justice Guzman delivered the opinion of the Court.  
(3/28/2014 10:43:46 AM) 11-0773.jmt.pdf, 110773.pdf
09/09/2013Oral argument  Argued on behalf of Petitioners by R. Brent Cooper; Argued on behalf of Respondents by Coury M. Jacocks (Chief Justice Jefferson not sitting)
09/06/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral argument submission form submitted by respondent attorney Coury M. Jacocks  of Law Offices of Coury M. Jacocks of Addison.
09/06/2013Phone call from Clerk's Office Contacted respondent attorney Coury Jacocks to request the oral argument submission form on behalf of respondent.  Left voicemail and sent email.
08/29/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral argument submission form submitted by petitioners attorney R. Brent Cooper of Cooper & Scully, P.C of Dallas, TX
05/03/2013Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., September 9, 2013.  Time allotted to argue: 20/20 minutes
02/15/2013Petition for Review granted  
02/15/2013Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedDate and time of oral argument are yet to be determined.
02/15/2013Petition Reinstated  
02/15/2013Motion for Rehearing - DisposedFiling granted 
02/15/2013Previous Order of the Court withdrawn denial of petition for review on October 26, 2012, withdrawn
02/05/2013Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing.
12/31/2012Response to Motion for Rehearing Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Respondent.
12/14/2012Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to motion for rehearing due no later than 12/31/12.
11/13/2012Case forwarded to Court  
11/12/2012Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Bioderm Skin Care, LLC.
10/26/2012Petition for Review disposedDenied 
09/27/2012Reply Brief Petitioners Bioderm Skin Care, LLC, et al.'s Reply Brief on the Merits.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/13/2012Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Vaesna 'Sandee' Sok.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/06/2012Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedResponse brief due 09/12/12; Reply brief due 09/27/12; FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
08/28/2012Response to Motion filed Response to Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Bioderm Skin Care.
08/27/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Veasna "Sandee" Sok.
08/16/2012Phone call from Clerk's Office Spoke with Mr. Jacouks.  He informed the Court that he thought the due date was August 20, 2012 for the Respondent's Brief on the Merits.  He will file a motion for extension of time.
07/23/2012Brief on the Merits Petitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Bioderm Skin Care, LLC and Quan Nguyen.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/18/2012Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received from the 5th Court of Appeals.
06/22/2012Record Requested in Petition for Review  
06/22/2012Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than 7/23/12; Response brief due 8/13/12; Reply brief due 8/28/12
06/05/2012Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review. On behalf of Bioderm Skin Care, L.L.C., et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/21/2012Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Veasna "Sandee" Sok.
05/08/2012Designation of Lead Counsel  Petitioner's Notice of Appearance and Designation of Lead Counsel as Mr. Diana L. Faust and R. Brent Cooper, Cooper & Scully, P.C., 900 Jackson Street, Suite 100, Telephone: (214) 712-9500.
04/20/2012Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing granted in partMotion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition for Review granted (in part).  Requested response due 5/21/12, not 5/31/12 per request.  NO further requests for extensions of time will be considered.
04/20/2012Call received Call received from Caroline Block of Fraley & Fraley, LLP who said they are unopposed to the extension of time filed by respondent attorney.  
04/19/2012Phone call from Clerk's Office Call made to petitioner attorney, Liz Fraley, to ask if a response to the motion for extension of time is forthcoming.  Let voicemail.
04/19/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Veasna "Sandee" Sok
04/17/2012Phone call from Clerk's Office Call made to Coury Jacocks to request emailed version of motion for extension of time.  Filing fee has been received without the hard copy of the motion.
04/05/2012Call received Call received from respondent attorney Coury Jacocks letting us know a motion for extension of time is being mailed in instead of e-filed.  Mr. Jacocks stated he can not use his current attorney firm's resources to e-file and that is why he is sending in the hard copy of the motion.  He did not include a filing fee so I explained that he needs to send the fee soon otherwise he will be getting another call.
04/05/2012Phone call from Clerk's Office Call made to respondent attorney Coury Jacocks to find out status of motion for extension of time (per call on 1/6/12) and response.  Mr. Jacocks expressed that he no longer has his own law firm and has changed jobs since then.  He stated he no longer represents respondent however he is not going to file motion to withdraw.  He will look for appellate counsel to appear on respondent's behalf.
02/03/2012Phone call from Clerk's Office To Mr. Coury Matthews Jacocks office:  left message on voice mail for a call back in re:  the motion for extension of time that he was going to file.
01/06/2012Call received From respondent's atty, Mr. Coury Jacocks to inform the Court that we have an incorrect address on him and he has not gotten the letter from the Court requesting that he file a response to pet/rev.
12/02/2011Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than 1/2/2012.
11/01/2011Case forwarded to Court  
09/29/2011Supplemental appendix  E-FILED: Supplemental Appendix to Petition for Review: Court of Appeals Judgment filed on behalf of Bioderm Skin Care, LLC, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/28/2011Appendix Filed E-FILED Attached to petition
09/28/2011Petition for Review E-FILED  Petition appendix attached filed on behalf of Bioderm Skin Care, LLC.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/11/2014Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 29 C-3
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sok, Vaesna SandeeRespondentMr. Matthew Sharp
Mr. Coury Matthews Jacocks
Bioderm Skin Care, LLCPetitionerMr. R. Brent Cooper
Ms. Elizabeth M. Fraley
Ms. Diana L. Faust
Mr. Richard Clark Harrist
Mr. Kyle M. Burke  
Ms. Caroline Clore Block
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
345 SW3d 189, 06-28-11 
5th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Kerry P. FitzGerald 
Trial Court Information
160th District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable James R. Jordan 
DC-09-08815 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site