Case: 11-0732    
11-0732
09/15/2011
Mandamus/Cause
IN RE STEPHANIE LEE 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/19/2013Post submission brief filedRelatorPost-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Stephanie Lee.
01/09/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)E-FILED  Brief of the State Bar of Texas Family Law Council as Amicus Curiae.  Submitted by Georganna L. Simpson (SBOT #8400965) of Dallas Texas; Steven R.Morris (SBOT #24079026) of Dallas Texas; Richard R. Orsinger (SBOT #15322500) of Dallas Texas; and Thomas L. Ausley (SBOT #014340000) of Austin Texas.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/21/2011Reply BriefRelatorE-FILED: Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Stephanie Lee.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
12/07/2011Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)E-FILED  Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of the Office of the Attorney General.  Submitted by Bill Davis, Assistant Solicitor General, PO Box 12548, (MC) 059), Austin, Texas 78711, (512)936-1896.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/23/2011Brief on the MeritsReal Parties in Interest E-FILED  Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Benjamin Jay Redus. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/03/2011Brief on the MeritsRelatorE-FILED: Relator Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Stephanie Lee.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
09/21/2011Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRelatorE-FILED  Relator Stephanie Lee's Reply to Bejamin Redus' Response to Writ of Mandamus. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/21/2011Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus FiledReal Parties in Interest E-FILED  Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. On behalf of Benjamin Jay Redus. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/15/2011Appendix FiledRelatorE-FILED  appendix attached
09/15/2011Petition for Writ of MandamusRelatorE-FILED  Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Stephanie Lee. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/16/2014Case Stored - stored case location updated Row 10 F-2
11/22/2013Case Stored G02 Row 22 D-1
11/07/2013Certified cys of cost bill sent to attys of record Cost Bill Issued
09/27/2013Dissenting opinion issued.IssuedJustice Green filed a dissenting opinion, in which Chief Justice Jefferson, Justice Hecht, and Justice Devine joined.
09/27/2013Concurring Opinion issued.IssuedJustice Guzman filed a concurring opinion.
09/27/2013Opinion issuedWrit of Mandamus conditionally grantedJustice Lehrmann announced the Court’s decision and delivered the opinion of the Court as to Parts I, II, III, V, and VII, in which Justice Johnson, Justice Willett, Justice Guzman, and Justice Boyd joined, and delivered an opinion as to Parts IV and VI, in which Justice Johnson, Justice Willett, and Justice Boyd joined.
(9/27/2013 2:34:35 PM) 110732d.pdf, 110732c.pdf, 110732.pdf
04/19/2013Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Stephanie Lee.
02/28/2012Oral argument  argued on behalf of relator by Scott Rothenberg; argued on behalf of real party in interest by Clinton F. Lawson
02/15/2012Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument submission form submitted by real party attorney Clinton F. Lawson of The Law Offices of Clinton F. Lawson of San Antonio, TX
02/13/2012Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received OA submission form submitted by Scott Rothenberg of Law Offices of Scott Rothenberg of Houston, TX
02/03/2012Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentSet for oral argument on 2/28/12; time allotted to argue: 20/20 minutes
01/27/2012Case set for oral argumentThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.date and time are yet to be determined
01/27/2012Mandamus Set to Argue  
01/27/2012Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedCase set for oral argument 
01/27/2012Stay Order issued  
01/27/2012Motion to Stay DisposedFiling grantedMotion for Temporary Relief granted
01/09/2012Amicus Curiae Brief received E-FILED  Brief of the State Bar of Texas Family Law Council as Amicus Curiae.  Submitted by Georganna L. Simpson (SBOT #8400965) of Dallas Texas; Steven R.Morris (SBOT #24079026) of Dallas Texas; Richard R. Orsinger (SBOT #15322500) of Dallas Texas; and Thomas L. Ausley (SBOT #014340000) of Austin Texas.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/05/2012Call received Call received from Georganna Simpson letting us know that the State Bar Family Law Council will be submitting an amicus brief in support of mandamus.  It should be e-filed by Monday, January 9.
12/21/2011Reply Brief E-FILED: Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Stephanie Lee.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
12/21/2011Call received Call received from Georganna Simpson letting us know that the State Bar Family Law Council will be submitting an amicus brief in support of mandamus.  It should be e-filed by the end of the first week of January.
12/07/2011Amicus Curiae Brief received E-FILED  Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of the Office of the Attorney General.  Submitted by Bill Davis, Assistant Solicitor General, PO Box 12548, (MC) 059), Austin, Texas 78711, (512)936-1896.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/23/2011Brief on the Merits E-FILED  Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Benjamin Jay Redus. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/03/2011Brief on the Merits E-FILED: Relator Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Stephanie Lee.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
10/14/2011Phone call from Clerk's Office Call made to relator attorney Scott Rothenburg to let him know that the motion for extension of time to file amicus curiae brief was granted to 12/7/11.  Mr. Rothenburg was told relator's reply brief due date is no 12/21/11.
10/14/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedState of Texas' Motion for Extension of Time to File granted.  AMC State of Texas' Brief due 12/7/11; Reply brief due 12/21/11; Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored.
10/12/2011Motion for Extension of Time filed E-FILED  The State of Texas as Amicus Curiae's Motion to Extend Time to File Brief .
10/04/2011Solicitor general invited to file brief The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the State.  Brief due 11/03/11.
10/04/2011Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested: Rel br due on 11/03/11; Rsp br due 11/23/11; and Reply br due 12/08/11
09/21/2011Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus E-FILED  Relator Stephanie Lee's Reply to Bejamin Redus' Response to Writ of Mandamus. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/21/2011Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed E-FILED  Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. On behalf of Benjamin Jay Redus. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/16/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Motion for Temporary Relief granted.  Response due 9 a.m. on 9/21/11; Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.
09/16/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Response EFILED  Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Motion for Temporary Relief filed on behalf of Benjamin Jay Redus
09/16/2011Call received Call received from Clint Lawson regarding the requested responses to motion and petition.  Stated he would like to file a 2-day motion for extension of time to file responses.  He also mentioned the trial set for 9 a.m. on 9/26/11 has been postponed to the end of January.  He will be filing the motion by the end of the day.
09/15/2011Letter Filed E-FILED  Relator Stephanie Lee's Letter advising the Court that "the matter that forms the basis of the most imminent half of my client’s motion for temporary relief is now no longer a pressing issue requiring immediate action."
09/15/2011Phone call from Clerk's Office Call made to real parties in interest to request responses to motion and petition due 9/19/11 @ 9 a.m.
09/15/2011Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to both motion for temporary relief and to the petition for writ of mandamus due 9/19/11 @ 9 a.m.
09/15/2011Motion to Stay Filed  E-FILED  Motion for Temporary Relief filed on behalf of Stephanie Lee.
09/15/2011Appendix Filed E-FILED  appendix attached
09/15/2011Petition for Writ of Mandamus E-FILED  Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Stephanie Lee. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/16/2014Case StoredCase stored.Row 10 F-2
11/22/2013Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 22 D-1
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Redus, Benjamin JayReal Party in Interest Mr. Clinton Fancher Lawson
State Bar of Texas Family Law CouncilAmicus CuriaeMr. Steven Randall Morris
Mr. Thomas L. Ausley
Ms. Georganna L. Simpson
Mr. Richard R. Orsinger
Office of the Solicitor General of TexasAmicus CuriaeMr. Jonathan F. Mitchell
Mr. Bill Davis
Lee, StephanieRelatorMs. Marcela Halmagean
Mr. Scott Rothenberg
State of TexasReal Party in Interest Mr. J. Anthony Ramirez
Ms. Rande K. Herrell
Court of Appeals Information:
Denied 
___ SW3d ___, 09-13-11 
14th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Per Curiam 
Trial Court Information
309th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Sherill Youngberg Dean 
2005-41798 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site