Supreme Court

Case: 11-0265
04/13/2011
Probable juris noted
THE EPISCOPAL DIOCESE OF FORT WORTH, ET AL. 
THE EPISCOPAL CHURCH, ET AL. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/27/2013Fully hyperlinked brief filedAppellee in case11 CDs with the enhanced version (hyperlinking) of Episcopal Parties, et al.'s Reply in support of Motion for Rehearing.
12/19/2013Reply to Motion for Rehearing filedAppellee in caseReply in Support of Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Local Episcopal Parties, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/06/2013Response to Motion for RehearingAppellant in caseResponse to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.
10/30/2013Fully hyperlinked brief filedAppellee in caseHYPERLINKED DVD COPY of Appellee's Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of The Local Episcopal Parties, et al.
10/18/2013Motion for Rehearing - FiledAppellee in caseMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of The Local Episcopal Parties, et al.
03/11/2013Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letter of Rev. Dr. Ephraim Radner. (1)
11/06/2012Fully hyperlinked brief filedAppellee in caseHyperlinked Brief filed on behalf of the Local Episcopal Parties and Congregations. (12 cds)
10/15/2012Brief filedAppellee in caseAdditional Brief filed on behalf of The Local Episcopal Parties and Congregations.
(HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/15/2012Exhibits in case/cause filedAppellant in caseAppellant #1, Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.'s Bench Exhibits.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/24/2012Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of Liberty Institute.  Submitted by Kelly Shackelford,  LIBERTY INSTITUTE, 2001 W. Plano Parkway, Suite 1600, Plano, Texas 75075, Ph. (972) 941–4444.
08/29/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Liberty Institute.  Submitted by Kelly Shackelford, LIBERTY INSTITUTE, 2001 W. Plano Parkway, Suite 1600, Plano, Texas 75075, Ph. (972) 941–4444, Fax. (972) 941–4457, kshackelford@libertyinstitute.org  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
04/23/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of the Anglican Communion Institute, Inc.
03/26/2012Fully hyperlinked brief filedAppellee in caseHyperlinked Response Brief filed on behalf of Local Episcopal Parties and Congregations. (12)
03/23/2012Reply brief filedAppellant in caseReply Brief filed on behalf of The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/08/2012Brief filedAppellee in caseResponse Brief filed on behalf of the Local Episcopal Parties and Congregations.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/08/2012Brief filedAppellee in caseBrief filed on behalf of The Episcopal Church.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/27/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)E-FILED  Amicus Brief of The Presbyterian Lay Committee. Submitted by David B. West of COX SMITHMATTHEWS, 112 East Pecan Street Suite 1800, San Antonio TX 78205, (210) 554-5500 AND Lloyd J. Lunceford, TAYLOR, PORTER, BROOKS & PHILLIPS, L.L.P., P.O. Box 2471, Baton Rouge LA 70821, (225) 387-3221.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/06/2012Brief filedAppellant in caseAppellant's Brief filed on behalf of The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.   (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/27/2011Amended Brief filedAppellant in caseE-FILED  Appellant #1 The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.'s Amended Reply on Statement of Jurisdiction. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/20/2011Reply filedAppellant in caseE-FILED  Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.'s Reply on State of Jurisdiction. (HARD COPIES RECEIVED)
06/16/2011Response to brief filedAppellee in caseE-FILED  Appellees Local Episcopal Parties, et al.'s Response to Diocese's Statement of Jurisdiction. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/03/2011Direct Appeal filedAppellant in caseE-FILED:  Joint Notice of CROSS-Appeal (INCORPORATED w/Docketing Statement, Request for Supplement to Reporter's Record & Request for inclusion of add'l items in Clerk's Record) filed on behalf of The Local Episcopal Parties and The Local Episcopal Congregations. (HARD COPIES RE'C)
04/13/2011Notice of Appeal filedAppellant in caseE-FILED  Notice of Appeal filed on behalf of The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionRemarksDocument
07/09/2014Case Stored  G02 Row 14 A-1 (vols. 1-7) & A-2 (vols. 8-11)
06/23/2014Letter Filed** See Remarks from the Supreme Court of the United States to inform this Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed in their Court on June 19, 2014 and placed on the docket on June 20, 2014 as No. 13-1520.
04/17/2014Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. DeniedEmergency Motion to Recall and Stay Issuance of Mandate or to Stay Enforcement of Mandate, denied
04/17/2014Notice receivedAppellee in case Appellants have set a hearing in the trial court on Appellants’ request to set aside the bond and additional protections for 9:00 a.m. on April 24, 2014.  Appellees respectfully request that the Court grant Appellees’ Emergency Motion to Recall and Stay Issuance of Mandate or to Stay Enforcement of Mandate, filed with this Court on March 25, 2014, to eliminate the need for this hearing.
03/31/2014Reply to Response to MotionAppellant in case Reply in Support of Emergency Motion to Recall and Stay Issuance of Mandate or to Stay Enforcement of Mandate filed on behalf of the Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.
03/27/2014Phone call from Clerk's Office  Left message with Lisa Hobbs informing her that the Court has been notified of appeellees'  intention to file a reply in support of their emergency motion to recall and stay issuance of mandate or to stay enforcement of mandate by Monday, March 31, 2014.
03/27/2014Call receivedAppellee in case Lisa Hobbs called to inform the Court that appellees' intend to file a reply in support of their emergency motion to recall and stay issuance of mandate or to stay enforcement of mandate by Monday, March 31, 2014.
03/27/2014Response to Motion filedAppellant in case Response to Appellees' Motion to Recall and Stay Issuance of Mandate or to Stay Enforcement of Mandate filed on behalf of The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.
03/25/2014Call receivedAppellant in case Appellants called to inform the Court that they do intend to file a response to appellees' emergency motion to recall and stay issuance of mandate or to stay enforcement of mandate.
03/25/2014Miscellaneous motion filed. Appellee in case Emergency Motion to Recall and Stay Issuance of Mandate or to Stay Enforcement of Mandate filed on behalf of The Local Episcopal Parties.
03/21/2014Call received  Attorney Lisa Hobbs called to inform the Clerk's Office that a motion to recall the mandate will be filed on Monday, 3-22-14.
03/21/2014Mandate issued  Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
03/21/2014Motion for Rehearing - DisposedCauseDenied 
12/27/2013Fully hyperlinked brief filedAppellee in case 11 CDs with the enhanced version (hyperlinking) of Episcopal Parties, et al.'s Reply in support of Motion for Rehearing.
12/19/2013Reply to Motion for Rehearing filedAppellee in case Reply in Support of Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Local Episcopal Parties, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/06/2013Response to Motion for RehearingAppellant in case Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.
10/30/2013Fully hyperlinked brief filedAppellee in case HYPERLINKED DVD COPY of Appellee's Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of The Local Episcopal Parties, et al.
10/30/2013Motion for Extension of Time disposed.** See RemarksFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response to Motion for Rehearing is granted. Requested Response is due December 6, 2013. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored.
10/30/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseAppellant in case Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Appellees’ Motion for Rehearing. On behalf of Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.
10/23/2013Supreme Court of Texas Requested ResponseIndicates Motion for Rehearing Response requested to motion for rehearing due no later than November 7, 2013.
10/21/2013Letter FiledAppellant in case Appellants do not intend to file a response to the Appellees’ Motion for Rehearing. On behalf of The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth.
10/18/2013Motion for Rehearing - FiledAppellee in case Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of The Local Episcopal Parties, et al.
09/11/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedAppellee in caseFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of The Episcopal Church, et al. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Rehearing due October 18, 2013.
09/11/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for RehearingAppellee in case Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of The Episcopal Church, et al.
08/30/2013Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record Issued 
08/30/2013Dissenting opinion issued. IssuedJustice Willett delivered a dissenting opinion, in which Justice Lehrmann, Justice Boyd, and Justice Devine joined.
08/30/2013Opinion issued Issued 
08/30/2013Opinion issuedCausedirect appeal/judg of tc reversed; remanded to tcJustice Johnson delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Justice Hecht, Justice Green, and Justice Guzman joined, and in Parts I, II, III, and IV-A of which Chief Justice Jefferson joined.

(8/30/2013 6:39:21 PM) 110265.pdf, 110265d.pdf, 11-0265.jmt.pdf
(8/30/2013 7:03:07 PM) 110265.pdf, 110265d.pdf, 11-0265.jmt.pdf
04/26/2013Post submission brief filedAppellant in case Post-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
04/24/2013Additional citations received.Appellee in case Additional Cites filed on behalf of The Local Episcopal Parties.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/11/2013Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus Curiae Letter of Rev. Dr. Ephraim Radner. (1)
12/11/2012Post submission brief filedAppellee in case Post Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Local Episcopal Parties in Response to December 3, 2012 Post Submission Letter Brief.  
12/03/2012Post submission brief filedAppellant in case Post Submission Letter filed on behalf of The Episcopal Dioces of Fort Worth, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/15/2012Post submission brief filedAppellee in case Appellee The Episcopal Church's Post Submission Letter Brief.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/15/2012Post submission brief filedAppellant in case Appellant #1, The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.'s Post-Submmission Brief.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/06/2012Fully hyperlinked brief filedAppellee in case Hyperlinked Brief filed on behalf of the Local Episcopal Parties and Congregations. (12 cds)
10/16/2012Oral argument   argued on behalf of appellants by Scott A. Brister; argued on behalf of appellees by Thomas S. Leatherbury and Mary E. Kostel
10/16/2012Oral argument   argued on behalf of appellants by Scott A. Brister; argued on behalf of appellees by Thomas S. Leatherbury and Mary E. Kostel
10/15/2012Notice requesting filing fee  Fee request sent to collect filing fee for Appellant's Response to Appellee's Motion to File Additional Brief being treated as a Motion to File Post Submission Brief.  
10/15/2012Phone call from Clerk's Office  Call made to parties to let them know that Motion for Leave to File Additional Brief filed on behalf of The Local Episcopal Parties and Congregation was granted and that Appellant's Response to Motion for Leave is being treated as a Motion for Leave to File Post Submission Brief.  The Motion to File Post Submission Brief is granted.  The post submission brief is due no later than 11/15/12.  Also requested $10 filing fee for motion to file post submission brief.  Left messages.
10/15/2012Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Appellant in caseFiling grantedAppellant #1, Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.'s Response to Appellees' Motion to File Additional Brief, being treated as a Motion to File Post Submission Brief, granted.  Post Submission Brief due no later than 11/15/12.
10/15/2012Brief filedAppellee in case Additional Brief filed on behalf of The Local Episcopal Parties and Congregations.
(HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/15/2012Exhibits in case/cause filedAppellant in case Appellant #1, Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.'s Bench Exhibits.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/15/2012Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. Filing grantedMotion for Leave to File Additional Brief filed on behalf of The Local Episcopal Parties and Congregations granted.
10/15/2012Response to Motion filedAmicus Curiae  Response to Motion for Leave to File Additional Brief filed on behalf of Anglican Communion Institute, Inc.
10/11/2012Miscellaneous motion filed. Appellant in case Appellant #1, Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.'s Response to Appellees' Motion to file Additional Brief, being treated as Motion to File Post Submission Brief.
10/11/2012Response to Motion filedAppellant in case Appellant #1, Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.'s Response to Appellees' Motion to file additional Brief.
10/10/2012Miscellaneous motion filed. Appellee in case Motion for Leave to File Additional Brief filed on behalf of The Local Episcopal Parties and Congregations.
09/28/2012Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedAppellee in case Oral Argument Submission form for Thomas Leatherbury filed on behalf of The Episcopal Church, et al.
09/28/2012Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedAppellee in case Oral Argument Submission form for Mary Kostel filed on behalf of The Episcopal Church, et al.
09/24/2012Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus Letter of Liberty Institute.  Submitted by Kelly Shackelford,  LIBERTY INSTITUTE, 2001 W. Plano Parkway, Suite 1600, Plano, Texas 75075, Ph. (972) 941–4444.
09/07/2012Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney receivedAppellant in case Oral argument submission form submitted by appellant attorney, Scott A. Brister, of Andrews Kurth LLP of Austin, TX
08/31/2012Case set for oral argument Case set for oral argument 
08/31/2012Case set for oral argument Case set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., October 16, 2012.
08/31/2012Motion to Expedite disposed Filing grantedMotion to Expedite Oral Argument granted.  
08/29/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus Brief of Liberty Institute.  Submitted by Kelly Shackelford, LIBERTY INSTITUTE, 2001 W. Plano Parkway, Suite 1600, Plano, Texas 75075, Ph. (972) 941–4444, Fax. (972) 941–4457, kshackelford@libertyinstitute.org  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/06/2012Motion to Expedite FiledAppellant in case Motion to Expedite Oral Argument filed on behalf of The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.
06/19/2012Additional citations received.Appellee in case Appellees The Episcopal Church, et al's Additional Cites from the U.S. Supreme Court denying petitions for writs of certiorari in Gauss v. Episcopal Church in the Diocese of Connecticut, --- S. Ct. ----, No. 11-1139, 2012 WL 910227 (June 18, 2012) and Timberridge Presbyterian Church, Inc. v. Presbytery of Greater Atlanta, Inc., --- S. Ct. ----, No. 11-1101, 2012 WL 761216 (June 18, 2012).  A copy of the opinion of Timberridge's case is attached to this letter.
05/04/2012Additional citations received.Appellee in case Additional authority filed on behalf of The Episcopal Church, et al.
04/23/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus Curiae Brief of the Anglican Communion Institute, Inc.
04/06/2012Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. Filing grantedUnopposed Motion to File a Consolidated Reply that Exceeds Page Limits granted
03/26/2012Fully hyperlinked brief filedAppellee in case Hyperlinked Response Brief filed on behalf of Local Episcopal Parties and Congregations. (12)
03/23/2012Miscellaneous motion filed. Appellant in case Unopposed Motion to File a Consolidated Reply that Exceeds Page Limits filed on behalf of The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/23/2012Reply brief filedAppellant in case Reply Brief filed on behalf of The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/13/2012Letter FiledAppellee in case E-FILED  Appellee The Episcopal Church's Letter in regard of their desires to appear and argue during any oral submission scheduled.
03/13/2012Pro hac vice motion disposed Filing grantedMotion in Support of Motion to Admit Lloyd J. Lunceford Pro Hac Vice granted.
03/13/2012Pro hac vice motion disposed Filing grantedMotion to Admit Lloyd J. Lunceford Pro Hac vice granted.
03/12/2012Letter FiledAppellee in case Letter requesting oral argument filed on behalf of Local Episcopal Parties and Congregations.
03/09/2012Pro hac vice motion disposed Filing grantedMotion in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David Beers is granted.
03/09/2012Pro hac vice motion disposed Filing grantedMotion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David Beers is granted.
03/09/2012Pro hac vice motion disposed Filing grantedMotion in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Mary Kostel is granted.
03/09/2012Pro hac vice motion disposed Filing grantedMotion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Mary Kostel is granted.
03/08/2012Pro hac vice motion filedAppellee in case Motion in Support of Motion to Admit David Beers Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of the Episcopal Church.
03/08/2012Pro hac vice motion filedAppellee in case Motion in Support of Motion to Admit Mary Kostel Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of the Episcopal Church.
03/08/2012Brief filedAppellee in case Response Brief filed on behalf of the Local Episcopal Parties and Congregations.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/08/2012Brief filedAppellee in case Brief filed on behalf of The Episcopal Church.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/08/2012Pro hac vice motion filedAppellee in case Unopposed Motion to Admit David Beers pro hac vice on behalf of appellee The Episcopal Church.
03/08/2012Pro hac vice motion filedAppellee in case Unopposed Motion to Admit Mary Kostel pro hac vice on behalf of appellee The Episcopal Church.
03/07/2012Letter FiledReceived (instead of filed) Letter includes Non-Resident Acknowledgment letter from the Board of Law Examiners for Mr. Lunceford.
03/05/2012Designation of Lead Counsel Appellee in case Designation of Frank Gilstrap as Lead Counsel filed on behalf of the Local Episcopal Congregations.
02/27/2012Phone call from Clerk's OfficeAmicus Curiae  to Mr. West, and spoke with his legal secretary, Vickey.  Requested the payment letter from BLE.
02/27/2012Pro hac vice motion filedAmicus Curiae  E-FILED  In-State Attorney Mr. David West's Motion in Support of Motion to Admit Lloyd J. Lunceford Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Presbyterian Lay Committee. (HARD COPY REC'D)
02/27/2012Pro hac vice motion filedAmicus Curiae  E-FILED  Motion to Admit Lloyd J. Lunceford Pro Hac vice on behalf of Amicus Curiae the Presbyterian Lay Committee (HARD COPY REC'D)
02/27/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed) E-FILED  Amicus Brief of The Presbyterian Lay Committee. Submitted by David B. West of COX SMITHMATTHEWS, 112 East Pecan Street Suite 1800, San Antonio TX 78205, (210) 554-5500 AND Lloyd J. Lunceford, TAYLOR, PORTER, BROOKS & PHILLIPS, L.L.P., P.O. Box 2471, Baton Rouge LA 70821, (225) 387-3221.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/23/2012Motion for Extension of Time disposed.RespondentFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Respondent's Brief is due March 8, 2012; Reply Brief is due March 23, 2012.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
02/22/2012Motion for Extension of Time disposed.RespondentFiling grantedMotion for extension of time to file Appellee the Episcopal Church's Response Brief on the Merits granted. Ape's Brief is due March 8, 2012; Ant's Reply Brief is due March 23, 2012. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED
02/21/2012Letter FiledAppellant in case Letter informs the Court that the Cross-Appellant's Brief will not be filed on their behalf.  However, they will be filing a response to the the Appellant's Brief.
02/21/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief.Appellee in case Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Appellee's Brief filed on behalf of The Local Episcopal Parties, et al.
02/21/2012Phone call from Clerk's OfficeAppellant in case Mr. Leatherbury informed the Court that The Local Episcopal Parties will not be filing an Appellant's Brief.  He will file a letter to inform the Court in writing.
02/21/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief.Appellee in case E-FILED  Unopposed motion for extension of time to file Appellee the Episcopal Church's Response Brief on the Merits
02/10/2012Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. Filing grantedJoint motion to supplement and to designate official appellate record granted
02/06/2012Brief filedAppellant in case Appellant's Brief filed on behalf of The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.   (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/03/2012CD Filed Appellee in case ELECTRONIC COPY Original Clerk's Record and Three Supplemental Clerk's Record referenced in the Joint Motion to Supplement and Designate Official Appellate Record. Submitted by Local Episcopal Parties.
02/03/2012Miscellaneous motion filed. Joint motion filed Joint Motion to Supplement and to Designate Official Appellate Record filed on behalf of Episcopal Chruch, et al. and The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.
01/20/2012Letter FiledAppellee in case E-FILED  Copy of Letter sent to Tarrant County District Clerk requesting to "Supplement the Clerk's Record." On behalf of Local Episcopal Parties.
01/06/2012Brief on the Merits RequestedDirect Appeal  
01/06/2012Direct Appeal Grant   
01/06/2012Direct Appeal disposed Jurisdiction noted in Direct Appeal. 
01/06/2012Direct Appeal Grant   
01/06/2012Direct Appeal disposed Jurisdiction noted in Direct Appeal. 
01/06/2012Motion to Amend disposed Filing granted Motion for Leave to File Amended Reply on Statement of Jurisdiction granted
08/04/2011CD Filed Appellant in case Clerk's Record corrected to include page numbers.
06/27/2011Motion to Amend FiledAppellant in case E-FILED  Appellant #1 The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Reply on Statement of Jurisdiction. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/27/2011Amended Brief filedAppellant in case E-FILED  Appellant #1 The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.'s Amended Reply on Statement of Jurisdiction. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/22/2011Supplement to Clerk's/Reporter's Record** See Remarks Second Supplemental Clerk's Record (Vol 1 of 1) -- Received from Tarrant County District Clerk.  (1)
06/20/2011Reply filedAppellant in case E-FILED  Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.'s Reply on State of Jurisdiction. (HARD COPIES RECEIVED)
06/17/2011Letter FiledAppellant in case Letter requests the Clerk's record in electronic format, and pays the $300 fee.
06/16/2011Response to brief filedAppellee in case E-FILED  Appellees Local Episcopal Parties, et al.'s Response to Diocese's Statement of Jurisdiction. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/14/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed. Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Appellants' Statement of Jurisdiction granted.  Statement of Jurisdiction due 6/16/11.
06/13/2011Motion for Extension of Time filedAppellee in case E-FILED: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Apellants' Statement of Jurisdiction filed on behalf of Local Episcopal, et al.
06/06/2011Supplement to Clerk's/Reporter's Record  First Supplemental Clerk's Record (Vol 1 of 1) - Contains Order Granting Def's Motion to Sever and Stay Proceedings 4/5/11
06/03/2011CD Filed ** See Remarks Received CD from Tarrant County that contains: Clerk's Record Vols 1-32.  All files are in TIF format.
06/02/2011Statement of JurisidictionAppellant in case E-FILED  Statement of Jurisdiction of the Local Episcopal Parties, et al., Appellant #2. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/02/2011Call received  Call received from Zach Smith to inquire about due date of Statement of Jurisdiction.  He expressed concerns because of the inability to see the Clerk's record (hard copy).  Informed him that if he was concerned about not getting the Statement in by the due date, a motion for extension of time can be filed with the Statement.  
06/01/2011Statement of JurisidictionAppellant in case E-FILED  Statement of Jurisdiction filed on behalf of Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED
05/20/2011Phone call from Clerk's Office  BH spoke to court coordinator for 141st, Sidney. Sidney said Sandy is the appellate clerk and would be the person to talk to about the record.
05/20/2011Phone call from Clerk's Office  YT and BH called trial court to request record in electronic format.
05/18/2011Clerk's Record filedDirect Appeal Clerk's Record Vols 1-32 filed by Tarrant County District Clerk. The record is placed inside of (8) red ropes.
05/12/2011CD Filed   Reporter's Record Vols. I - III, also, in an electronic form.  CD attached on the back of the folder.
05/12/2011Supplement to Clerk's/Reporter's Record  Received Supplmental Reporter's Record (Vols. I - III, incorporated) from 141st District Court in Tarrant County. (1)
05/11/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed. Filing grantedThe Episcopal Church's Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Statement of Jurisdiction granted.  Statement of Jurisdiction due 15 days after record is filed.
05/11/2011Corrected Notice sent to all counsel  Per call received 5/9/11, a corrected letter will go out granting Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Statement of Jurisdiction filed 5/2/11.  Statement of Jurisdiction will be due 15 days after record filed.  
05/10/2011Motion for Extension of Time filedAppellee in case E-FILED: Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Statement of Jurisdiction filed on behalf of The Episcopal Church, et al.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED
05/09/2011Call received  Call received from Scott Brister's office regarding grant of motion for extension of time to file statement of jurisdiction.  Party asked to file statement of jurisdiction be filed 15 days after clerk's record.  Clerk's record has yet to be filed.  Calendar will be updated once Clerk's record is filed to reflect 15 day extension.  
05/04/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed. Filing grantedAppellant's motion for extension to file statement of jurisdiction granted.  Statement of Jurisdiction due 5/16/11
05/03/2011Document filed (see remarks)Appellant in case E-FILED  Copy of Cross-Appeallants' Request for inclusion of additional items in Clerk's Record (INCORPORATED w/Joint Notice of CROSS-Appeal).  This request is addressed to 141st Disctrict Court Tarrant County. On behalf of The Local Episcopal Parties and The Local Episcopal Congregations.
05/03/2011Document filed (see remarks)Appellant in case E-FILED:  Copy of Cross-Appeallants' Request for the preparation of Supplement to Reporter's Record (INCORPORATED w/Joint Notice of CROSS-Appeal).  This request is addressed to Ms. Fett, Court Reporter of the 141st Disctrict Court Tarrant County. On behalf of The Local Episcopal Parties and The Local Episcopal Congregations.
05/03/2011Docketing statement filedAppellant in case E-FILED:  Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement (INCORPORATED w/Joint Notice of CROSS-Appeal).  On behalf of The Local Episcopal Parties and The Local Episcopal Congregations.
05/03/2011Direct Appeal filedAppellant in case E-FILED:  Joint Notice of CROSS-Appeal (INCORPORATED w/Docketing Statement, Request for Supplement to Reporter's Record & Request for inclusion of add'l items in Clerk's Record) filed on behalf of The Local Episcopal Parties and The Local Episcopal Congregations. (HARD COPIES RE'C)
05/02/2011Motion for Extension of Time filedAppellant in case E-FILED: Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Statement of Jurisdiction filed on behalf of The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al. (hard copies received)
04/29/2011CD Filed   Reporter's Record Vols. I - IV, also, in an electronic form.  CD attached on the back of the folder.
04/29/2011Court reporter/recorder's record  Received Reporter's Record (Vols. I - IV, incorporated) from 141st District Court in Tarrant County.
04/13/2011Document filed (see remarks)Appellant in case E-FILED  Document listing all the parties that are filing this Notice of Appeal (incorporated w/Notice of Appeal) filed on behalf of The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.
04/13/2011Order from Lower Court filedAppellant in case E-FILED  Amended Order on Summary Judgment dated 02-08-11 (incorporated w/Notice of Appeal) filed on behalf of The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.
04/13/2011Docketing statement filedAppellant in case E-FILED  Docketing Statement (incorporated w/Notice of Appeal) filed on behalf of The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.
04/13/2011Notice of Appeal filedAppellant in case E-FILED  Notice of Appeal filed on behalf of The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/09/2014Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 14 A-1 (vols. 1-7) & A-2 (vols. 8-11)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Radner, Eprhaim Amicus CuriaeThe Rev. Dr. Eprhaim Radner
Local Episcopal CongregationsAppelleeMr. Frank Gilstrap
Mr. Frank Hill
Presbyterian Lay CommitteeAmicus CuriaeMr. David B. West
Mr. Lloyd J. Lunceford
Anglican Communion Institute, Inc.Amicus CuriaeMr. Richard R. Hayslett
The Episcopal Diocese of Fort WorthAppellantMr. Scott A. Brister
Mr. Gavin Burke Justiss
Mr. R. David Weaver
Mr. Kendall M. Gray
Mr. J. Shelby Sharpe
Liberty InstituteAmicus CuriaeMr. Kelly J. Shackelford
Local Episcopal PartiesAppelleeMr. Jonathan D.F. Nelson
Mr. Daniel Tobey  
Mr. William D. Sims Jr.
Mr. Thomas S. Leatherbury
Ms. Kathleen Wells
The Episcopal ChurchAppelleeMs. Sandra Cockran Liser
Ms. Mary Kostel
Mr. David Beers
Court of Appeals Information:
 
 
 
 
Trial Court Information
141st District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable John Parrish Chupp 
141-252083-11 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site