Supreme Court

Case: 11-0226
03/28/2011
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
LASALLE PIPELINE, LP 
DONNELL LANDS, L.P. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/10/2013Reply to Motion for Rehearing filedPetitionerReply to Response to Motion for Rehearing. On behalf of Donnell Lands, LP.
06/14/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter Brief filed on behalf of Interstate Natural Gas Associaiton of America.  Submitted by Kelly Noel Higgason, Assistant General Counsel, Kinder Morgan, Inc., 1001 Louisiana Street, Houston, TX 77002. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/12/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of StarMex Midstream, LLC submitted by Vance P. Freeman, State Bar. 24078161, 2020 Bill Owens Pkwy., Ste. 200, Longview, Texas 75604, (903) 295-7200
06/12/2013Response to Motion for RehearingRespondentResponse to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Donnell Lands, L.P.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
04/01/2013Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter Brief of Texas Pipeline Association. Submitted by Marnie A. McCormick of Duggins Wren Mann & Romero LLP of Austin, Texas. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/28/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Texas Farm Bureau on Motion for Rehearing.  Submitted by Andy McSwain, Fulbright Winniford PC, P.O. Box 445, Waco, Texas 76703-0445, (254) 776-6000.
03/19/2013Motion for Rehearing - FiledRehearing filed in Petition for ReviewMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of LaSalle Pipeline, LP.
03/28/2012Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of Texas Pipeline Association.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)

01/13/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Texas Land and Mineral Owners Association.  Submitted by William Christian, Graves, Dougherty, Hearon & Moody, P.C., 401 Congress Ave, Ste 2200, Austin, Texas 78701, (512) 480-5682.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/19/2011Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)E-FILED  Amicus Letter Brief filed on behalf of Energy Transfer Partners, LP.  Submitted by Jim Wright, Deputy General Counsel, Deputy General Counsel, Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., 711 Louisiana Street, Ste. 900, Houston, Texas 77002, (832) 668-1000. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/18/2011Reply brief filedPetitionerE-FILED  Petitioner LaSalle Pipeline, LP's Reply Brief on the Merits. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/30/2011Brief filedRespondentE-FILED  Respondent Donnell Lands, LP's Brief on the Merits.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
08/30/2011Brief filedPetitionerPetitioner LaSalle Pipeline LP's Brief on the Merits. (12)
05/12/2011Reply filedPetitionerReply in support of petition for review (12) filed on behalf of LaSalle Pipeline LP.
04/27/2011Response to Petition for Review filedRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Donnell Lands, L.P. (12)
03/28/2011Appendix FiledPetitionerattached to petition
03/28/2011Petition for Review filedPetitionerPetition appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of LaSalle Pipeline, LP.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionRemarksDocument
05/16/2014Case Stored - stored case location updated  Row 10 H-5
09/20/2013Case Stored  Row 22 G-3
08/26/2013Notice sent to Court of AppealsMotion for Rehearing  
08/23/2013Motion for Rehearing - DisposedIndicates filing of Petition for ReviewDenied 
07/10/2013Reply to Motion for Rehearing filedPetitioner Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing. On behalf of Donnell Lands, LP.
06/14/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus Letter Brief filed on behalf of Interstate Natural Gas Associaiton of America.  Submitted by Kelly Noel Higgason, Assistant General Counsel, Kinder Morgan, Inc., 1001 Louisiana Street, Houston, TX 77002. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/12/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus Brief of StarMex Midstream, LLC submitted by Vance P. Freeman, State Bar. 24078161, 2020 Bill Owens Pkwy., Ste. 200, Longview, Texas 75604, (903) 295-7200
06/12/2013Response to Motion for RehearingRespondent Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Donnell Lands, L.P.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
04/30/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedRespondentFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Response is due June 12, 2013.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
04/30/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseRespondent Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Donnell Lands, LP.
04/26/2013Supreme Court of Texas Requested ResponseIndicates Motion for Rehearing Requested response to motion for rehearing due no later than May 13, 2013.
04/01/2013Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus Letter Brief of Texas Pipeline Association. Submitted by Marnie A. McCormick of Duggins Wren Mann & Romero LLP of Austin, Texas. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/28/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus Brief of Texas Farm Bureau on Motion for Rehearing.  Submitted by Andy McSwain, Fulbright Winniford PC, P.O. Box 445, Waco, Texas 76703-0445, (254) 776-6000.
03/26/2013Case forwarded to Court   
03/19/2013Motion for Rehearing - FiledRehearing filed in Petition for Review Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of LaSalle Pipeline, LP.
02/28/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedPetitionerFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing is Granted.  Motion for Rehearing is due March 19, 2013.
02/28/2013Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for RehearingPetitioner Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of LaSalle Pipeline, LP.
02/15/2013Petition for Review disposedIndicates filing of Petition for ReviewDenied 
03/28/2012Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed) Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of Texas Pipeline Association.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)

01/13/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae  Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Texas Land and Mineral Owners Association.  Submitted by William Christian, Graves, Dougherty, Hearon & Moody, P.C., 401 Congress Ave, Ste 2200, Austin, Texas 78701, (512) 480-5682.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/19/2011Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed) E-FILED  Amicus Letter Brief filed on behalf of Energy Transfer Partners, LP.  Submitted by Jim Wright, Deputy General Counsel, Deputy General Counsel, Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., 711 Louisiana Street, Ste. 900, Houston, Texas 77002, (832) 668-1000. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/18/2011Reply brief filedPetitioner E-FILED  Petitioner LaSalle Pipeline, LP's Reply Brief on the Merits. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/30/2011Brief filedRespondent E-FILED  Respondent Donnell Lands, LP's Brief on the Merits.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
09/09/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed.RespondentFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Brief on the Merits granted.  Response brief due 10/3/11; Reply brief due 10/18/11.  Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.
09/08/2011Call receivedPetitioner Mr. Burget's office to inform the Court that they are NOT opposed to resp's m/e/t after all.
09/07/2011Phone call from Clerk's OfficePetitioner Ms. Burgert informed the Court that the motion is opposed, but no response will be filed.
09/07/2011Motion for extension of time to file brief.Respondent E-FILED  Opposed motion for extension of time to file brief on the merits filed on behalf of Donnell Lands, LP. (HC REC'D)
09/02/2011Additional Copies receivedPetitioner Received signed copy of Petitioner's Brief on the Merits.  Backdated to Aug 30, 2011.
09/01/2011Phone call from Clerk's OfficePetitioner called twice to Mr. Zabel's Assistant, Amy, to request a signed copy of petitioner's brief pursuant TRAP 9.1.
08/30/2011Brief filedPetitioner Petitioner LaSalle Pipeline LP's Brief on the Merits. (12)
07/29/2011Case Record Filed Clerk of the Court of Appeals CLKS REC (2) VOLS, REPS REC (7) VOLS, ANTS BR, APES BR, ANTS REPLY BR, ANTS MO/RE, ANTS EN BANC RECON, MISC FOLDERS (2), JUDGEMENT, OPINION (AF AS MOD) OPINION ON MO/RE'S-DENIED
07/28/2011Record Requested in Petition for Review   
07/28/2011Brief on the Merits RequestedIndicates filing of Petition for Review Brief on the Merits Requested: Petitioner's Brief due 08/29/11; Response Brief due 09/19/11; Reply Brief due 10/04/11; mailbox rule does not apply
05/12/2011Reply filedPetitioner Reply in support of petition for review (12) filed on behalf of LaSalle Pipeline LP.
05/03/2011Case forwarded to Court   
04/27/2011Response to Petition for Review filedRespondent Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Donnell Lands, L.P. (12)
03/28/2011Phone call from Clerk's OfficePetitioner Requested electronic copy of appendix.
03/28/2011Appendix FiledPetitioner attached to petition
03/28/2011Petition for Review filedPetitioner Petition appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of LaSalle Pipeline, LP.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/16/2014Case StoredCase stored.Row 10 H-5
09/20/2013Case StoredCase stored.Row 22 G-3
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Interstate Natural Gas Association of AmericaAmicus CuriaeKelly Noel Higgason  
Texas Pipeline Assoc'nAmicus CuriaeMs. Marnie Ann McCormick
StarMex Midstream, LLCAmicus CuriaeMr. Vance P. Freeman
Texas Land and Mineral Owners AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. William Gerow Christian
Donnell Lands, L.P.RespondentMr. Corbin Lee Snow Jr.
Ms. Nissa M. Dunn
Mr. Corbin Snow III
Energy Transfer Partners, L.P.Amicus CuriaeMr. James Marion Wright Jr.
LaSalle Pipeline, LPPetitionerMs. Amy Marlyse Burgert
Ms. Nancy Hahn Elliott
Mr. James Andrew Freeman
Mr. Thomas A. Zabel
Texas Farm BureauAmicus CuriaeMr. Andy McSwain
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed as Modified 
336 SW3d 306, 12-15-10 
4th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Karen A. Angelini 
Trial Court Information
36th District Court 
McMullen 
Honorable Joel B. Johnson 
M-09-0005-ED-A 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site