Supreme Court

Case: 11-0114    
11-0114
02/15/2011
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
STATE OF TEXAS 
ANGELIQUE NAYLOR AND SABINA DALY 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/27/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Postcards addressed to members of the Court received.
06/30/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Postcards received to members of the Court.
05/20/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letters received.
05/20/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Postcards received via email to members of the Court.
04/22/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letters received via email to members of the Court.
04/16/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letters received via USPS.  
04/15/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letters received via email to members of the Court.
04/08/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letters received via USPS.  
08/06/2013Supplemental Brief filedPetitionerPetitioner's Supplemental Reply Brief Addressing Recent U.S. Supreme Court Decisions filed on behalf of State of Texas.
08/06/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Brief of The Honorable Daniel H. Branch as Amicus Curiae.  Submitted on behalf of Daniel H. Branch.
07/29/2013Supplemental Brief filedRespondentSupplemental Response on Windsor and Perry filed on behalf of Angelique S. Naylor and Sabina Daly.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/18/2013Supplemental Brief filedPetitionerPetitioner's Supplemental Briefing Addressing Recent U.S. Supreme Court Decisions filed on behalf of State of Texas.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/06/2011Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)E-FILED  Brief Amici Curiae of Texas State Representative Warren Chisum and the Honorable Todd Staples in Support of the State of Texas.  Submitted by Kelly J. Shackelford of Liberty Institute; 2001 W. Plano Parkway Suite 1600, Plano Texas 75075, (972) 941-4444.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/01/2011Reply BriefPetitionerE-FILED  Petitioner State of Texas' Reply Brief on the Merits. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/17/2011Brief on the MeritsRespondentE-FILED  Respondents Angelique Naylor and Sabina Daly's Brief on the Merits. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/19/2011Brief on the MeritsPetitionerE-FILED  Petitioner State of Texas' Brief on the Merits. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/27/2011Response to PetitionRespondentE-FILED  Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Angelique Naylor and Sabina Daly. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/13/2011Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus curiae brief of Texas State Rep. Warren Chisum and the Honorable Todd Staples in support of petition for review filed by the State of Texas, submitted by Kelly J. Shackelford, Liberty Institute, 2001 W. Plano Pwy., Suite 1600, Plano, TX.  75075, Phone (972) 941-4444. (oirg & 11)
03/21/2011Appendix FiledPetitionerattached to petition
03/21/2011Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of State of Texas.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/20/2015Case Stored G02 Row 14 H-2
07/30/2015Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
07/27/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Postcards addressed to members of the Court received.
06/30/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Postcards received to members of the Court.
06/19/2015Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
06/19/2015Dissenting opinion issued.IssuedJustice Devine delivered a dissenting opinion.
06/19/2015Dissenting opinion issued.IssuedJustice Willett delivered a dissenting opinion, in which Justice Guzman and Justice Devine joined.
06/19/2015Concurring Opinion issued.IssuedJustice Boyd delivered a concurring opinion.
06/19/2015Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment affirmedThe Court affirms the court of appeals' judgment.  Justice Brown delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Chief Justice Hecht, Justice Green, Justice Johnson, and Justice Boyd joined. (Justice Lehrmann not sitting)
(6/19/2015 8:40:36 AM) 11-0114.jmt.pdf, 110114d2.pdf, 110114d1.pdf, 110114c.pdf, 110114.pdf
05/20/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letters received.
05/20/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Postcards received via email to members of the Court.
04/22/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letters received via email to members of the Court.
04/16/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letters received via USPS.  
04/15/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letters received via email to members of the Court.
04/08/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letters received via USPS.  
01/05/2015Designation of Lead Counsel  Lead Counsel for State of Texas: Michael P. Murphy, Assistant Solicitor General, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059), Austin, Texas 78711-2548, Tel.: (512) 936-2995, Fax: (512) 474-2697, michaelp.murphy@texasattorneygeneral.gov
11/05/2013Oral argument  argued on behalf of petitioner/relators by James J. Scheske; argued on behalf of respondent/real party in interest by James D. Blacklock (Justice Lehrmann not sitting)
10/22/2013Letter Filed Letter designating order of argument. Mr. Jody Scheske, presenting argument for Petitioner J.B. and Respondents/Real Parties in Interest Naylor and Daly will argue first and will reserve five minutes for rebuttal. Mr. James D. Blacklock will argue second on behalf of the State of Texas.
09/25/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by James J. Scheske on behalf of Angelique Naylor.
09/23/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by James D. Blacklock on behalf of the State of Texas.
08/27/2013Notice from Counsel of a change in address Change of address for respondent Angelique S. Naylor attorney Jason P. Steed:
Bell Nunnally & Martin LLP
3232 McKinney Avenue, Suite 1400
Dallas, Texas 75204
08/23/2013Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentConsolidated for oral argument with 11-0024 & 11-0222; Set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., November 5, 2013; Time allotted to argue: 25/25 minutes (Justice Lehrmann not sitting)
08/23/2013Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
08/23/2013Petition for Review granted  
08/06/2013Supplemental Brief filed Petitioner's Supplemental Reply Brief Addressing Recent U.S. Supreme Court Decisions filed on behalf of State of Texas.
08/06/2013Amicus Curiae Brief received Brief of The Honorable Daniel H. Branch as Amicus Curiae.  Submitted on behalf of Daniel H. Branch.
07/29/2013Supplemental Brief filed Supplemental Response on Windsor and Perry filed on behalf of Angelique S. Naylor and Sabina Daly.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/18/2013Supplemental Brief filed Petitioner's Supplemental Briefing Addressing Recent U.S. Supreme Court Decisions filed on behalf of State of Texas.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/03/2013Brief on the Merits Requested The Court requests that you file supplemental briefs addressing what legal impact, if any, you believe the United States Supreme Court’s recent decisions in United States v. Windsor and Hollingsworth v. Perry have on the issues raised in the petition for review in this case. Please refer to Tex. R. App. P. 55 for the requirements of petitioners’ and respondents’ briefs. The briefing schedule is outlined below. See Tex. R. App. P. 55.7.

Petitioner/s shall file their brief July 18, 2013.
Respondent/s shall file their brief July 29, 2013.
Petitioner/s shall file any reply brief August 6, 2013.
03/25/2013Notice from Counsel of a change in address Respondent Angelique Naylor filed a Notice to inform the Court that Jason P. Steed, one of the attorneys of record, changes addresses.
07/26/2012Notice from Counsel of a change in address Change of address for Mr. Scheske:  James J. Scheske, PLLC, 5501-A Balcones Dr., #109, Austin, Texas 78731, Telephone: 512.371.1790, Facsimile: 512.323.2260, Email: jscheske@austin.rr.com.
02/03/2012Phone call from Clerk's Office Mr. Robert Luther's asst. came by and hand-delivered a vacation notice for him.  We informed her that they would need to efile that.
12/06/2011Amicus Curiae Brief received E-FILED  Brief Amici Curiae of Texas State Representative Warren Chisum and the Honorable Todd Staples in Support of the State of Texas.  Submitted by Kelly J. Shackelford of Liberty Institute; 2001 W. Plano Parkway Suite 1600, Plano Texas 75075, (972) 941-4444.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/08/2011Case Record Filed  11/8/11 - rec'd CD with COA briefs from the 3rd COA
11/01/2011Reply Brief E-FILED  Petitioner State of Texas' Reply Brief on the Merits. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/17/2011Brief on the Merits E-FILED  Respondents Angelique Naylor and Sabina Daly's Brief on the Merits. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/06/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedResponse brief due 10/17/11, Reply brief due 11/01/11; FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WILL BE DISFAVORED
10/03/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed E-FILED  Respondents Angelique Naylor and Sabina Daly's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits.
09/19/2011Brief on the Merits E-FILED  Petitioner State of Texas' Brief on the Merits. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/22/2011Case Record Filed  Clerk's record (1V), reporter's record (4V), misc. folder (agreed m/e/t, notice of appearnce, docketing statement & notice of appeal), judgment, opinion  
08/19/2011Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 9/19/11; Response brief due 10/10/11; Reply brief due 10/25/11; mailbox rule does not apply
08/19/2011Record Requested in Petition for Review  
06/27/2011Response to Petition E-FILED  Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Angelique Naylor and Sabina Daly. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/26/2011Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 6/27/11; mailbox rule does not apply
05/16/2011Address Change  Notice of change of address on behalf of attorney (James Scheske) for respondent, Angelique Naylor and Sabina Daly.  
05/13/2011Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus curiae brief of Texas State Rep. Warren Chisum and the Honorable Todd Staples in support of petition for review filed by the State of Texas, submitted by Kelly J. Shackelford, Liberty Institute, 2001 W. Plano Pwy., Suite 1600, Plano, TX.  75075, Phone (972) 941-4444. (oirg & 11)
04/26/2011Case forwarded to Court  
04/25/2011Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates From respondent (Sabina Daly) atty, Mr. Robert Luther to inform the Court of his vacation, out-of-town or at a seminar dates.  (Orig & 1)
04/20/2011Response Waiver filed Respondent (Sabina Daly) response waiver to petition for review.  (orig & 4)
04/18/2011Response Waiver filed Response waiver to petition for review filed on behalf of Angelique Naylor.  (orig & 1)
03/21/2011Appendix Filed attached to petition
03/21/2011Petition for Review Petition appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of State of Texas.
02/18/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition is due on March 21, 2011.
02/15/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Review filed on behalf of the State of Texas. (2)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/20/2015Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 14 H-2
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Chisum, WarrenAmicus CuriaeMr. Kelly J. Shackelford
Branch, Daniel H.Amicus CuriaeDaniel H. Branch  
Daly, SabinaRespondentMr. Robert B. Luther
Naylor, Angelique S.RespondentMs. Jennifer Renee Cochran-Green
Mr. James J. Scheske
Mr. Jason P. Steed
State of TexasPetitionerMr. Jonathan F. Mitchell
Mr. Cleve W. Doty
Mr. David C. Mattax
Mr. Michael P. Murphy
Mr. Daniel T. Hodge
Attorney General Greg W. Abbott
Mr. James D. Blacklock
Mr. William J. "Bill" Cobb III
Court of Appeals Information:
Dismissed - WOJ 
330 SW3d 434, 01-07-11 
3rd Court of Appeals 
Honorable Diane M. Henson 
Trial Court Information
126th District Court 
Travis 
Honorable Scott H. Jenkins 
D-1-FM-09-000050 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site