Supreme Court

Case: 11-0024    
11-0024
01/14/2011
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
IN THE MATTER OF THE MARRIAGE OF J.B. AND H.B. 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/27/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Postcards addressed to members of the Court received.
07/06/2015Motion for RehearingPetitioner's motion for rehearing of cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of J.B.
06/30/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Postcards addressed to members of the Court received.
05/20/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letters received.
05/20/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Postcards received via email to members of the Court.
04/22/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letters received via email to members of the Court.
04/16/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letters received via USPS.  
04/15/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letters received via email to members of the Court.
04/08/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letters received via USPS.
04/08/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letter in support of affirming the Fifth Court of Appeals decision filed on behalf of Mrs. Betty Perley.
09/03/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of American Civil Liberties submitted by Kenneth Upton, Lambda Legal Defense And Education Fund, 3500 Oak Lawn Ave., Ste. 500, Dallas, TX 75219-6722, Tel: (214) 219-8585.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/06/2013Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of J.B. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/29/2013Brief on the MeritsRespondentSupplemental Response Brief Addressing Recent U.S. Supreme Court Decisions filed on behalf of the State of Texas.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/17/2013Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Supplemental Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of J.B. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/06/2011Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)E-FILED  Brief Amici Curiae of Texas State Representative Warren Chisum and the Honorable Todd Staples in Support of the State of Texas.  Submitted by Kelly J. Shackelford of Liberty Institute; 2001 W. Plano Parkway Suite 1600, Plano Texas 75075, (972) 941-4444. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/10/2011Reply BriefPetitionerE-FILED  Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits. On behalf of J.B.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
09/26/2011Brief on the MeritsRespondentE-FILED  Brief on the Merits of Respondent the State of Texas. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/06/2011Brief on the MeritsPetitionerE-FILED: Petitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of J.B. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/13/2011Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus curiae brief of Texas State Rep. Warren Chisum and The Honorable Todd Staples in support of petition filed by The State of Texas, submitted by Mr. Kelly J. Shackelford, Liberty Institute, 2001 W. Plano Pwy., Suite 1600, Plano, TX.  75075, Phone (972) 941-4444. (orig & 11)
03/21/2011Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to petition for review filed on behalf of The State of Texas.  (orig & 11)
02/17/2011Appendix FiledPetitionerattached to petition
02/17/2011Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of J.B.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/2015Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
09/11/2015Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied with Justice not sitting. 
07/27/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Postcards addressed to members of the Court received.
07/06/2015Case forwarded to Court  
07/06/2015Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of J.B.
06/30/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Postcards addressed to members of the Court received.
06/19/2015Petition for Review disposedDismissed 
06/19/2015Motion to dismiss disposedFiling granted in partPetitioner's Motion to Dismiss granted in part
05/20/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letters received.
05/20/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Postcards received via email to members of the Court.
05/01/2015Response to Motion filed Response to Petitioner's Motion to Dismiss. On behal of State of Texas.
04/28/2015Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Response to Motion to Dismiss requested. Response is due May 4, 2015.
04/22/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letters received via email to members of the Court.
04/17/2015Motion to dismiss Motion to Dismiss filed on behalf of Petitioner J.B.
04/16/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letters received via USPS.  
04/15/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letters received via email to members of the Court.
04/08/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letters received via USPS.
04/08/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letter in support of affirming the Fifth Court of Appeals decision filed on behalf of Mrs. Betty Perley.
01/05/2015Designation of Lead Counsel  Lead Counsel for State of Texas: Michael P. Murphy, Assistant Solicitor General, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059), Austin, Texas 78711-2548, Tel.: (512) 936-2995, Fax: (512) 474-2697, michaelp.murphy@texasattorneygeneral.gov
11/05/2013Oral argument  argued on behalf of petitioner/relators by James J. Scheske; argued on behalf of respondent/real party in interest by James D. Blacklock (Justice Lehrmann not sitting)
10/22/2013Letter Filed Letter designating order of argument. Mr. Jody Scheske, presenting argument for Petitioner J.B. and Respondents/Real Parties in Interest Naylor and Daly will argue first and will reserve five minutes for rebuttal. Mr. James D. Blacklock will argue second on behalf of the State of Texas.
09/25/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument wil be presented by James J. Scheske on behalf of J.B.
09/23/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by James D. Blacklock on behalf of the State of Texas.
09/03/2013Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of American Civil Liberties submitted by Kenneth Upton, Lambda Legal Defense And Education Fund, 3500 Oak Lawn Ave., Ste. 500, Dallas, TX 75219-6722, Tel: (214) 219-8585.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/27/2013Address Change  2nd Notice of Change of Address for Petitioner's Co-Counsel, Mr. Jason Steed. On behalf of J.B.
08/23/2013Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentConsolidated for oral argument with 11-0114 & 11-0222; Set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., November 5, 2013; Time allotted to argue: 25/25 minutes. (Justice Lehrmann not sitting)
08/23/2013Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
08/23/2013Petition for Review granted  
08/06/2013Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of J.B. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/29/2013Brief on the Merits Supplemental Response Brief Addressing Recent U.S. Supreme Court Decisions filed on behalf of the State of Texas.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/17/2013Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Supplemental Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of J.B. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/03/2013Brief on the Merits Requested The Court requests that you file supplemental briefs addressing what legal impact, if any, you believe the United States Supreme Court’s recent decisions in United States v. Windsor and Hollingsworth v. Perry have on the issues raised in the petition for review in this case. Please refer to Tex. R. App. P. 55 for the requirements of petitioners’ and respondents’ briefs. The briefing schedule is outlined below. See Tex. R. App. P. 55.7.

Petitioner/s shall file their brief July 18, 2013.
Respondent/s shall file their brief July 29, 2013.
Petitioner/s shall file any reply brief August 6, 2013.
03/25/2013Notice from Counsel of a change in address Petitioner J.B. filed a Notice to inform the Court that Jason P. Steed, one of the attorneys of record, changes addresses.
07/26/2012Notice from Counsel of a change in address Change of address for Mr. Scheske:  James J. Scheske, PLLC, 5501-A Balcones Dr., #109, Austin, Texas 78731, Telephone: 512.371.1790, Facsimile: 512.323.2260, Email: jscheske@austin.rr.com.
12/06/2011Amicus Curiae Brief received E-FILED  Brief Amici Curiae of Texas State Representative Warren Chisum and the Honorable Todd Staples in Support of the State of Texas.  Submitted by Kelly J. Shackelford of Liberty Institute; 2001 W. Plano Parkway Suite 1600, Plano Texas 75075, (972) 941-4444. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/10/2011Reply Brief E-FILED  Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits. On behalf of J.B.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
09/26/2011Brief on the Merits E-FILED  Brief on the Merits of Respondent the State of Texas. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/06/2011Brief on the Merits E-FILED: Petitioner Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of J.B. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/19/2011Case Record Filed  CLKS REC (1) VOL, SUPP CLKS REC (5) VOLS, 05-09-01208-CV ANTS CONDITIONAL PET FOR WRIT OF MAND-W/DISK, 05-09-01208-CV APES REAL PARTY IN INT OF J. B.'S RESP TO COND PET FOR WRIT OF MAND, 05-09-01208-CV APES SUPP MAND REC, ANTS REPLY BR, ANTS BR ANTS AMEND BR, APES BR, ANTS REPLY BR, AM CUR OF REP CHISUM & HON STAPLES IN SUPPORT OF STATE, AM CUR OF PROF PAULSEN QUESTION SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, APES LTR BR, ANTS LTR BR  AUTH (2) COPIES, APES LTR BR AUTH (3) COPIES, APES MO/RE EN BANC,  
08/05/2011Record Requested in Petition for Review  
08/05/2011Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 9/6/11; Response brief due 9/26/11; Reply brief due 10/11/11; mailbox rule does not apply.  
05/23/2011Description of document returned to Supreme Court Letter of H.B. returned.  Contacted pet's atty office and they had the same address that we have in CM.
05/16/2011Address Change  Notice of change of address from petitioner (J.B.) attorney, Mr. James J. Scheske. (orig)
05/13/2011Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus curiae brief of Texas State Rep. Warren Chisum and The Honorable Todd Staples in support of petition filed by The State of Texas, submitted by Mr. Kelly J. Shackelford, Liberty Institute, 2001 W. Plano Pwy., Suite 1600, Plano, TX.  75075, Phone (972) 941-4444. (orig & 11)
05/12/2011Referral to Pro Bono Program - Letter sent to All Counsel of Record and Program Liason Referral to Pro Bono Program letter sent to pro se, counsel of record, and program liason (Michael Truesdale).
03/22/2011Case forwarded to Court  
03/21/2011Response to Petition Response to petition for review filed on behalf of The State of Texas.  (orig & 11)
02/17/2011Appendix Filed attached to petition
02/17/2011Petition for Review Petition appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of J.B.
01/21/2011Phone call from Clerk's Office Left message for attorney Scheske to inform whether he is representing H.B.
01/20/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition is due February 18, 2011.
01/14/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed On behalf of the Marriage of J.B. and H.B.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/03/2016Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 14 G-4 (3 vols)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J.B.PetitionerMr. Jason P. Steed
Mr. James J. Scheske
Mr. Peter Andrew Schulte
Mr. J. Carl Cecere
American Civil Liberties Union of TexasAmicus CuriaeMr. Kenneth D. Upton Jr.
The State of TexasRespondentMr. James D. Blacklock
Mr. Charles E. Roy
Mr. James C. Ho
Mr. David S. Morales
Mr. Scott A. Keller
Attorney General Warren Kenneth Paxton Jr.
Mr. Jonathan F. Mitchell
Mr. William J. "Bill" Cobb III
Mr. Daniel T. Hodge
Attorney General Greg W. Abbott
Mr. Michael P. Murphy
Mr. C. Andrew Weber
Mr. Cleve Doty
Perley, Betty Amicus CuriaeMrs. Betty Perley
B., H.Other interested party H. B.
Chisum, WarrenAmicus CuriaeMr. Kelly J. Shackelford
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed & Remanded 
326 SW3d 654, 08-31-10 
5th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Kerry P. FitzGerald 
Trial Court Information
302nd District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Tena Toye Callahan 
DF-09-1074 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site