Case: 10-17-00336-CV    
10-17-00336-CV
10/19/2017
Mandamus
In re Johnathan Womack and Gena Taylor-Wagner 
 
Yes 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/20/2018Petition for writ of mandamus filed 
12/11/2017Post submission brief filedReal party in interest
10/19/2017Petition for writ of mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/20/2018Petition for writ of mandamus filed 
02/14/2018Motion for rehearing deniedMotion or Writ Denied
02/14/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied
02/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedGrant motion
02/01/2018Response filed 
01/30/2018Response filed 
01/22/2018Response filed 
01/11/2018Motion for rehearing filed 
01/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
01/11/2018Appearance of counsel 
01/02/2018Order received from trial court 
12/27/2017Opinion issuedGrant motion
12/27/2017Bill of costs 
12/27/2017Retention time case file will be retained 
12/27/2017Judgment Issued 
12/12/2017Response filed 
12/11/2017Submitted 
12/11/2017Post submission brief filed 
11/30/2017Set for submission on oral argument 
11/06/2017Response filed 
10/26/2017Appearance of counsel 
10/23/2017Response requested by the court 
10/19/2017Petition for writ of mandamus filed 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/16/2018StatusStrip file 60 days after final disposition
10/19/2017Original ProceedingsOriginal proceeding
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
ChildrenReal party in interestE. Alan Bennett
Kathy Cline
Texas Dept of Family and Protective ServicesReal party in interestLori Johnston
Mark T. Zuniga
Taylor-Wagner, GenaRelatorRay Thomas Jr.
Delaney, JohnRespondentHon. John M. Delaney
Womack, JohnathanRelatorRay Thomas Jr.
Trial Court Information
85th District Court 
Brazos 
Honorable John M. Delaney 
17-001284-CV-85 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site