Case: 10-17-00336-CV    
10-17-00336-CV
10/19/2017
Mandamus
In re Johnathan Womack and Gena Taylor-Wagner 
 
Yes 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/20/2018Petition for writ of mandamus filed 
12/11/2017Post submission brief filedReal party in interest
10/19/2017Petition for writ of mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/28/2018Petition for writ of mandamus disposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/20/2018Petition for writ of mandamus filed 
02/14/2018Case stored 
02/14/2018Motion for rehearing deniedMotion or Writ Denied
02/14/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied
02/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedGrant motion
02/01/2018Response filed 
01/30/2018Response filed 
01/22/2018Response filed 
01/11/2018Motion for rehearing filed 
01/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
01/11/2018Appearance of counsel 
01/02/2018Order received from trial court 
12/27/2017Opinion issuedGrant motion
12/27/2017Bill of costs 
12/27/2017Retention time case file will be retained 
12/27/2017Judgment Issued 
12/12/2017Response filed 
12/11/2017Submitted 
12/11/2017Post submission brief filed 
11/30/2017Set for submission on oral argument 
11/06/2017Response filed 
10/26/2017Appearance of counsel 
10/23/2017Response requested by the court 
10/19/2017Petition for writ of mandamus filed 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/16/2024Case StoredDestroy 6 yrs after date of final disposition
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
ChildrenReal party in interestE. Alan Bennett
Kathy Cline
Texas Dept of Family and Protective ServicesReal party in interestLori Johnston
Mark T. Zuniga
Taylor-Wagner, GenaRelatorRay Thomas Jr.
Delaney, JohnRespondentHon. John M. Delaney
Womack, JohnathanRelatorRay Thomas Jr.
Trial Court Information
85th District Court 
Brazos 
Honorable John M. Delaney 
17-001284-CV-85 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site