Case: 10-17-00250-CV    
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of W.R.C., H.J.C., and A.J.C., Children 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/08/2017Appendix filedAppellant
11/07/2017Reply brief filedAppellee
11/01/2017Reply brief filedAppellant
10/11/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
10/02/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/20/2018Mandate issued 
02/20/2018Bill of costs 
12/20/2017Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
12/20/2017Retention time case file will be retained 
12/20/2017Judgment Issued 
11/20/2017Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
11/08/2017Appendix filed 
11/07/2017Reply brief filed 
11/02/2017Letter received 
11/01/2017Motion to strike filed 
11/01/2017Reply brief filed 
10/27/2017Letter received 
10/25/2017Order entered 
10/19/2017Letter issued by the court 
10/17/2017Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/12/2017Case ready to be set 
10/11/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
10/06/2017Motion filed 
10/02/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
09/19/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion granted; no further extensions of time will be entertained
09/18/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/28/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/28/2017Reporters record filed 
08/17/2017Appearance of counsel 
08/17/2017Appearance of counsel 
08/16/2017Fee paid 
08/16/2017Clerks record filed 
08/07/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
08/04/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
08/04/2017Case began in court of appeals 
07/21/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/23/2018StatusStrip file 60 days after final disposition
11/01/2017MotionMotion to strike
Kieffer, AmandaAppelleeRuth A. Kollman
Andrea L. James
Chamberlin, EricAppellantSean Kipp
Trial Court Information
85th District Court 
Honorable Hon. Kyle Hawthorne 
Paula K. Frederick 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site