Case: 10-17-00250-CV    
10-17-00250-CV
08/07/2017
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of W.R.C., H.J.C., and A.J.C., Children 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/08/2017Appendix filedAppellant
11/07/2017Reply brief filedAppellee
11/01/2017Reply brief filedAppellant
10/11/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
10/02/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/13/2017Submitted 
11/20/2017Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
11/08/2017Appendix filed 
11/07/2017Reply brief filed 
11/02/2017Letter received 
11/01/2017Motion to strike filed 
11/01/2017Reply brief filed 
10/27/2017Letter received 
10/25/2017Order entered 
10/19/2017Letter issued by the court 
10/17/2017Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/12/2017Case ready to be set 
10/11/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
10/06/2017Motion filed 
10/02/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
09/19/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion granted; no further extensions of time will be entertained
09/18/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/28/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/28/2017Reporters record filed 
08/17/2017Appearance of counsel 
08/17/2017Appearance of counsel 
08/16/2017Fee paid 
08/16/2017Clerks record filed 
08/07/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
08/04/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
08/04/2017Case began in court of appeals 
07/21/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/01/2017MotionMotion to strike
12/13/2017SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Kieffer, AmandaAppelleeRuth A. Kollman
Andrea L. James
Chamberlin, EricAppellantSean Kipp
Trial Court Information
85th District Court 
Brazos 
Honorable Hon. Kyle Hawthorne 
16-000454-cV-85 
Paula K. Frederick 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site