Case: 10-17-00176-CR    
10-17-00176-CR
05/30/2017
Theft of Livestock
Reid Austin Gathings 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/17/2017Anders brief filed 
10/09/2017Anders brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/02/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
12/27/2017Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
12/27/2017Retention time case file will be retained 
12/27/2017Judgment Issued 
12/27/2017Submitted 
12/27/2017Motion to withdraw attorney disposedGrant motion
12/04/2017Set for submission on briefs 
11/30/2017Case ready to be set 
10/17/2017Anders brief filedAttorney provided for record.
10/17/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
10/09/2017Notice filed 
10/09/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
10/09/2017Anders brief filed 
10/09/2017Notice filed 
10/07/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
08/31/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/08/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
08/02/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/06/2017Reporters record filed 
06/13/2017Clerks record filed 
06/05/2017Docketing statement filed 
05/30/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
05/09/2017Sentence imposed in the trial court 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/20/2018StatusMandate to Issue
02/26/2018StatusRelease to publisher
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasKathryn J. Gilliam
John G. Redington
Gathings, Reid AustinCriminal - AppellantReid Austin Gathings
Trial Court Information
82nd District Court 
Falls 
Honorable Robert M. Stem 
9750 
Judith G. Werlinger 
5yrs 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site