Tenth Court of Appeals

Case: 10-17-00176-CR    
10-17-00176-CR
05/30/2017
Theft of Livestock
Reid Austin Gathings 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/17/2017Anders brief filed 
10/09/2017Anders brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/04/2017Set for submission on briefs 
11/30/2017Case ready to be set 
10/17/2017Anders brief filedAttorney provided for record.
10/17/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
10/09/2017Notice filed 
10/09/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
10/09/2017Anders brief filed 
10/09/2017Notice filed 
10/07/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
08/31/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/08/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
08/02/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/06/2017Reporters record filed 
06/13/2017Clerks record filed 
06/05/2017Docketing statement filed 
05/30/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
05/09/2017Sentence imposed in the trial court 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/09/2017MotionMotion to withdraw as attorney
12/27/2017SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasKathryn J. Gilliam
John G. Redington
Gathings, Reid AustinCriminal - AppellantStan Schwieger
Reid Austin Gathings
Trial Court Information
82nd District Court 
Falls 
Honorable Robert M. Stem 
9750 
Judith G. Werlinger 
5yrs 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site